USA v. Krasniqi et al
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00464
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2017 at 1:42 AM EDT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elton Sejdaris, Defendant (3)

Toggle Switch Represented by Emdin & Russell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Royce Russell +1 212 683 3995 +1 212 683 4032 rsquare@emdin-russell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 515 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE as to Elton Sejdaris. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court arc subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/17/2017)(ft) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Helen Parsonage to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13540630. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elton Sejdaris. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Applicant, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Parsonage, Helen) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Gina Marie Castellano appearing for USA. (Castellano, Gina) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jennifer Eileen Burns appearing for USA. (Burns, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Elton Sejdaris re: 401 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, USCA Case Number 12-1397-cr(L), 12-2620-cr(con). Upon due consideration, it is hereby Ordered, Adjudged, and Decreed that the judgments entered on March 28, 2012 with respect to Parid Gjoka and June 19, 2012 with respect to Elton Sejdaris are AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 06/27/2013. (nd) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 419 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 418 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Elton Sejdaris held on 6/15/2012 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (ja) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER: As to Elton Sejdaris addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Joseph A. Bondy dated 7/2/2012 re: I respectfully request that the Court recommend to the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) that Mr. Sejdaras be held at the MDC Brooklyn for a period of thirty days from today, to afford counsel the opportunity to meet with him for purposes of perfecting his appeal of the Court's sentence. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/2/2012)(dnd) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 409 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 406 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 405 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 402 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Elton Sejdaris from 398 Judgment. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 465401041807. (nd) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 399 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  FILED JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Elton Sejdaris (3), Count(s) 1, 1s, 2, 2s, 4, 4s, 5, 5s, Underlying Counts are dismissed on the motion of the US; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years.;Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 2ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years.; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 3ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years.; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 4ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years.; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 5ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years.; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 6ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years.; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 7ss, Imprisonment for a total term of One Hundred (100) Months. Supervised release for a term of Six (6) Years. The Court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: It is recommended that the defendant be housed at FCI Milan in Michigan. The defendant shall not illegally possess a controlled substance. Special Assessment of $700 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/19/12)(jw) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 381 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER as to Elton Sejdaris: Sentencing set for 6/15/2012 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Sentencing submissions from defendant are due 6/1/2012. Government submissions are due 6/8/2012. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/29/2012) (ab) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER as to Elton Sejdaris: Sentencing set for 6/1/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Sentencing submissions from defendant are due 5/18/2012. Government submissions are due 5/25/2012. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/29/2012) (ab) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest, from Avi Weitzman, AUSA, dated 2/21/2012, re: Now that the cooperation of Sejdaris and Sula is publicly known, the Government requests that the proceedings and transcripts of their guilty pleas be unsealed nunc pro tunc. -- Judge endorsed: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/21/2012)(ja) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi, to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge Richard J. Holwell no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 340 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 339 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi held on December 1, 5, 6 2011 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (jab) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 326 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 325 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 321 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 320 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 319 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 312 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 309 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 308 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 304 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi re 282 MOTION in Limine Re: Ballistic Expert Testimony and Seeking Daubert Hearing.. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Lamarque, Natalie) Modified on 10/5/2011 (ka). (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ian Patrick McGinley appearing for USA. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing Curcio. Document filed by USA as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. Return Date set for 9/12/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Lamarque, Natalie) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Natalie Lamarque appearing for USA. (Lamarque, Natalie) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 263 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 240 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 230 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 224 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 213 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 210 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jennifer Gillum Rodgers appearing for USA. (Rodgers, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Argument) as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi held on 2/15/2011 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (ja) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi held on February 15, 2011 10:20 a.m. before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (ajc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi., as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. RICHARD J. HOLWELL, District Judge: Oral argument on the outstanding motions for Bills of Particulars and other relief will be held on March 25, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. IN CONNECTION WITH THE TRIAL OF THE NON-RICO DEFENDANTS, the following schedule is set: 1. Motions in limine shall be filed on or before April 29, 2011. 2. Opposition to motions in limine, if any, shall be filed by May 6, 2011. 3. The parties are directed to submit to the Court by May 6, 2011 proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions. 4. A final pretrial conference shall be held on Friday, May 13, 2011, at 2:30 p.m. in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. 5. Trial shall start on Monday, May 23, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. IN CONNECTION WITH THE TRIAL OF THE RICO DEFENDANTS, the following schedule is set: 1. Motions in limine shall be filed on or before September 23, 2011. 2. Opposition to motions in limine, if any, shall be filed by September 30, 2011. 3. The parties are directed to submit to the Court by September 30, 2011 proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions. 4. A final pretrial conference shall be held on Friday, October 7, 2011, at 2:30 p.m. in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. 5. Trial shall start on Monday, October 24, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/25/2011)(bw) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Arianna Rebecca Berg appearing for USA. (Berg, Arianna) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Chi T. Steve Kwok appearing for USA. (Kwok, Chi) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 158 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi re 134 MOTION to Sever Defendant., 124 MOTION to Sever Defendant Berisha., 144 MOTION to Sever Defendant Almir Rrapo., 123 FIRST MOTION to Sever Defendant., 126 MOTION to Sever Defendant., 136 FIRST MOTION to Sever Defendant Balidemaj.. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi held on 12/15/2010 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (mbe) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIRMATION of Kelley J. Sharkey in Support by Bruno Krasniqi as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi re 151 MOTION for Disclosure. MOTION for Discovery. MOTION for Release of Brady Materials. MOTION Misc... (Sharkey, Kelley) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Disclosure., MOTION for Discovery., MOTION for Release of Brady Materials., MOTION Misc.. Document filed by Bruno Krasniqi as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Sharkey, Kelley) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Lori Cohen in Support by Shkelzen Balidemaj as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi re 136 FIRST MOTION to Sever Defendant Balidemaj.. (Cohen, Lori) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Sever Defendant Balidemaj. Document filed by Shkelzen Balidemaj as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Cohen, Lori) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Sever Defendant Shkelzen Balidemaj. Document filed by Shkelzen Balidemaj as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lori COhen affirmation)(Cohen, Lori) Modified on 12/22/2010 (ka). (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Sever Defendant. Document filed by Albert Tamali as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Greenfield, David) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. The PTC scheduled for December 10, 2010 is rescheduled to December 15, 2010 at 11 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/1/2010)(ja) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Sever Defendant Berisha. Document filed by Gjovalin Berisha as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Kornberg, Marvyn) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Sever Defendant Berisha. Document filed by Gjovalin Berisha as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Kornberg, Marvyn) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to (S4-10-Cr-464-03) Elton Sejdaris. WHEREAS, with the defendant's consent, his guilty plea allocution was taken before United States Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV, on August 06, 2010;... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant's guilty plea is accepted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/7/2010)(bw) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Elton Sejdaris held on 8/6/2010 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (jw) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to (10-Cr-464-00 ALL) Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. The pretrial status conference scheduled for September 16, 2010 is rescheduled to September 14, 2010 at 2:30 p.m., in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/24/2010)(bw) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Unseal Indictment as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo, Florian Veshi. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Fifth Superseding Indictment and all arrest warrants in the above-captioned action be unsealed as all of the defendants have now been apprehended in the US or elsewhere and several must be extradited to this District. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 8/23/2010)(jw) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: As to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo. The pretrial status conference scheduled for September 16, 2010 is rescheduled to September 14, 2010 at 2:30 p.m., in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17-B, 500 Pearl Street. New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/24/2010)(dnd) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Motion for Detention of Florian Veshi and Almir Rrapo by USA as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Elton Sejdaris. (dnd) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Elton Sejdaris. (dnd) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    (S4) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Elton Sejdaris (3) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss. (dnd) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick Francis Broderick appearing for Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo. Nazih Nasser (Broderick, Patrick) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Gentian Nikolli held on 6/8/2010 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (ja) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            (S3) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Bruno Krasniqi (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, Saimir Krasniqi (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, Elton Sejdaris (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, Erkliant Sula (4) count(s) 3s, Shkelzen Balidemaj (5) count(s) 3s, Plaurent Cela (6) count(s) 3s, 6s, Skender Cakoni (7) count(s) 3s, 6s, Gjovalin Berisha (8) count(s) 3s, Dukajin Nikollaj (9) count(s) 3s, Nazih Nasser (10) count(s) 3s, Gentian Nikolli (11) count(s) 3s, VISI LNU (12) count(s) 3s, 6s, Gentian Cara (13) count(s) 3s, Albert Tamali (14) count(s) 3s, Joanna Pakulski (15) count(s) 3s, Marjan Tamali (16) count(s) 3s, Almir Rrapo (17) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s. (jw) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Unseal Indictment as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Third Superseding Indictment and all arrest warrants in the above-captioned action be unsealed as all of the defendants have now been apprehended in the United States or elsewhere and some must be extradited tothis District. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 7/21/2010)(jw) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali, Almir Rrapo held on June 15, 2010 12:35 p.m. before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (ajc) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Bruno Krasniqi, Saimir Krasniqi, Elton Sejdaris, Erkliant Sula, Shkelzen Balidemaj, Plaurent Cela, Skender Cakoni, Gjovalin Berisha, Dukajin Nikollaj, Nazih Nasser, Gentian Nikolli, VISI LNU, Gentian Cara, Albert Tamali, Joanna Pakulski, Marjan Tamali addressed to Judge Holwell from Michael Ferrara dated 6/16/2010 re I apologize for my error and respectfully ask the Court to order the deletion of docket entry 38 and its associated filing...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/16/2010)(jw) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Vacate Bail Order and Detain Defendant Pending Trial re Bond Hearing,,,. Document filed by USA as to Elton Sejdaris. (Ferrara, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 20 as to Elton Sejdaris: Appointment of Attorney Royce Russell for Elton Sejdaris. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/17/10) CJA Office has mailed the original and sent a copy to the file.(sac) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by (10-Cr-464-03) Elton Sejdaris. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein); Attorney Royce Russell. (bw) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Aaron Bondy appearing for (10-Cr-464-03) Elton Sejdaris. (bw) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/8/2010 as to Elton Sejdaris. (jw) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4, Sealed Defendant 5, Sealed Defendant 6, Sealed Defendant 7, Sealed Defendant 8, Sealed Defendant 9, Sealed Defendant 10, Sealed Defendant 11.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/8/10)(jm) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 5, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 3, Sealed Defendant 5 (5) count(s) 3, Sealed Defendant 6 (6) count(s) 3, 6, Sealed Defendant 7 (7) count(s) 3, 6, Sealed Defendant 8 (8) count(s) 3, Sealed Defendant 9 (9) count(s) 3, Sealed Defendant 10 (10) count(s) 3, Sealed Defendant 11 (11) count(s) 3. (jm) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 414 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?