Phointeda Yvetta Perry
Bankruptcy Case Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-33382
District Judge Dwight H. Williams Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 7:41 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bankruptcy Administrator, Bankruptcy Admin.
No Logo Curtis C. Reding, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis-LW Reding +1 334 262 8371
No Logo Phointeda Yvetta Perry, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Shinbaum & Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Shinbaum +1 334 269 4440
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (DH, ) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SUBMISSION ERROR--DUPLICATE ENTRY--Notice of Change of Address Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (DH, ) Modified on 3/27/2007 (DH, ). (Entered: 03/26/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Bankruptcy Case Closed (Non-Image Entry). (DH, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Order Discharging Standing Trustee,Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case: It appearing to the Court that the trustee in this case has performed all of the duties required of him in the administration of this case; that he has made distribution by order of this Court, and has rendered a full and complete account thereof, and no adverse interest being represented; It is therefore ORDERED that the Ch 12/13 trustee be discharged and relieved of his trust, and that he and the sureties on this bond be released from further liability thereunder; It is further Ordered that this case be, and the same is hereby CLOSED. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry). (DH, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BNC Certificate of Service - Order of Discharge - (RE: related document(s)55 Order Discharging Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan). No. of Notices: 33. Service Date 03/14/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order Discharging Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan Entered On 3/12/2007 (RE: related document(s)53 Final Report and Final Account of Ch 13 Trustee (Payments to Creditors) and Motion to Discharge Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan). (JI, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Trustee's Order Releasing Wages. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Final Report and Final Account of Ch 13 Trustee (Payments to Creditors) and Motion to Discharge Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)51 Order on Objection to Claim). No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 11/02/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Order Sustaining Objection to Claim (Order Reduces Claim(s) #2 Drive Financial Services) Entered On 10/31/2006 (RE: related document(s)50 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding). (JC, ) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Trustee's Objection to Claim # 2 Drive Financial Services Filed by Curtis-SR Reding on behalf of Curtis C. Reding. Responses due by 10/30/2006. (Reding, Curtis-SR) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)48 Order on Motion to Incur Debt). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 05/26/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/27/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Order Granting Motion To Incur Debt (Related Doc # 43) Entered On 5/24/2006. (JC, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)46 Order On Rule 9007-1 Motion). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 05/14/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Order Granting Rule 9007-1 Motion TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT. (Related Doc # 42) Entered On 5/12/2006. (JV, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - (RE: related document(s)44 Hearing (Bk)). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 04/20/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)43 Motion to Incur Debt. Hearing scheduled for 5/1/2006 at 09:15 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JV, ) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Debtor's Motion to Incur Debt TO PURCHASE VEHICLE Filed by Richard D. Shinbaum on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (Shinbaum, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Rule 9007-1 Motion: TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT Filed by Richard D. Shinbaum on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. Responses due by 5/10/2006. (Shinbaum, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice is hereby given that the first page of the referenced motion, notice or objection did not contain or feature prominently the notice legend required by the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the Middle District of Alabama. PLEASE FILE THE MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT OF PROPERTY DAMAGE USING THE NEGATIVE LANGUAGE. PLEASE USE BK>MOTIONS/APPLICATIONS>RULE 9007-1. ALSO, FILE THE MOTION TO INCUR DEBT AS A SEPARATE MOTION. Failure to cure the deficiency within 7 days shall subject the motion, notice or objection to dismissal without further notice. (RE: related document(s)40 Generic Application). Incomplete Filings due by 4/20/2006. (RLW, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Debtor's Application to approve a property settlemetn claim Filed by Richard D. Shinbaum on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (Shinbaum, Richard) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Claim Reduction on Claim Number(s) 20. Filed by Curtis-LW Reding on behalf of Curtis C. Reding. (Reding, Curtis-LW) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Trustee's Income Withholding Order. (Reding, Curtis-BH) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Trustee's Order Releasing Wages. (Reding, Curtis-BH) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)35 Order On Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte), Order On Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte)). No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 06/11/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/12/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Order Denying Trustee's Motion To Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte) Entered On 6/9/2005 (RE: related document(s)26 Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte), 27 Objection filed by Debtor Phointeda Yvetta Perry). (JC, ) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)32 Order to Continue/Reschedule Hearing, ). No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 04/01/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/02/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Amended Trustee's Income Withholding Order. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Order to Continue Hearing Order Increasing Payments Entered On 3/30/2005 (RE: related document(s)27 Objection filed by Debtor Phointeda Yvetta Perry, 26 Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte)). Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2005 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - (RE: related document(s)28 Hearing (Bk)). No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 03/10/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Trustee's Income Withholding Order. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Trustee's Order Releasing Wages. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s) 27 Objection to TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2005 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JV, ) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Objection to TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry (RE: related document(s)26 Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte)). (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte). Responses due by 03/14/2005. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)24 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). No. of Notices: 6. Service Date 10/20/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Homecomings Financial Network, Inc.) (Related Doc # 21) Entered On 10/18/2004. (JC, ) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Affidavit Re: Filed by Susannah R. Walker on behalf of Homecomings (RE: related document(s)21 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Homecomings). (Walker, Susannah) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(03-33382) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00) filing fee. Receipt number 1127B1069638, amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $150. Filed by Susannah R. Walker on behalf of Homecomings. Responses due by 10/18/2004. (Walker, Susannah) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 03/06/2004. (Related Doc # 19) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/07/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Order Allowing Withdrawing of Motion For Relief From Stay (Homecomings Financial Network, Inc.) (Related Doc # 14) Entered On 3/4/2004. (JV, ) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Trustee's Claim Audit Action Request on Claim Number(s) #09 creditor is Capital One Bank not Bruce Trippe (Non-Image Entry) Filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding. (Reding, Curtis-LW) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Affidavit Re: Filed by Susannah R Walker on behalf of Homecomings (RE: related document(s)14 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Homecomings). (Walker, Susannah) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 02/01/2004. (Related Doc # 15) (Admin.) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)14 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2004 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (GW, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Motion for Relief from Stay. Receipt Number CC04000835, Fee Amount $150. Filed by Susannah R Walker on behalf of Homecomings. (Walker, Susannah) Modified receipt on 1/29/2004 (JI, ). (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Service - Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan - No. of Notices: 30. Service Date 01/09/2004. (Related Doc # 12) (Admin.) (Entered: 01/10/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Certificate of Service will be filed within 5 days) Entered On 1/7/2004 (RE: related document(s)11 Trustee's Summary of Confirmed Ch 13 Plan, 7 Proceeding Memo, filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding). (DW, ) (Entered: 01/07/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Trustee's Summary of Confirmed Ch 13 Plan and Request for Order Confirming Plan. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Proceeding Memo - Hearing Held (Non-Image Entry) Filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding (RE: related document(s) 7 Proceeding Memo, filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding). (Reding, Curtis-MM) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Trustee's Income Withholding Order. (Reding, Curtis-BH) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Amended Schedules. D and F Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (Attachments: 1 Cumulative Statement of Amendment) (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Proceeding Memo - Continuance. (Non-Image Entry) Filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding (RE: related document(s) 3 Mtg of Creditors Chapter 13 and Notice of Confirmation Hrg, ). Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/11/2003 at 02:30PM at Courtroom 4E, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. Confirmation hearing to be held on 1/5/2004 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (Reding, Curtis-MM) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Debtor's Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Richard D. Shinbaum on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry (RE: related document(s)2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Phointeda Yvetta Perry). (Attachments: 1 Cumulative Statement of Amendments)(Shinbaum, Richard) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Susannah R Walker Filed by Susannah R Walker on behalf of Homecomings. (Walker, Susannah) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Trustee's Certificate of Service for 341 Notice and Deadlines. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 and Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Non-Image Entry). Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/4/2003 at 11:00AM at Courtroom 4E, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/15/2003 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (LB, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Richard D. Shinbaum on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (Shinbaum, Richard) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number cc03-9022, Fee Amount $185. Filed by Richard D. Shinbaum on behalf of Phointeda Yvetta Perry. (Attachments: 1 Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Petitions and Schedules) (Shinbaum, Richard) Modified receipt on 11/3/2003 (LO, ). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?