Elliott v. First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00042

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated Today at 5:29 PM (3.2 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order of Sale
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Order of Sale (Motion for)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Expedite
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order of Sale
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order of Sale (Motion for)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Vacate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Order of Sale (Motion for)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER: Defendant has agreed to withdraw its pending Motion for Summary Judgment 42 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Defendant's Motion from the pending motions list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 12, 2018. (jlk)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File; denying 24 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 9, 2018. (jlk)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 36 Motion to File Document Under Seal and granting 38 Motion for Reconsideration. If it is possible to do so, Defendant is ORDERED to file on the public docket redacted copies of these exhibits Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 1, 2018. (jlk)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 31, 2018. (jlk) Modified relationship and text on 2/1/2018 (jlk).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Notice Setting Mediation
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/8/2017. (agm)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?