SLUSS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00064

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2020 at 2:30 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R 52455-037

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Fox/Neal Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Order Directing Prisoner Payment (initial payment)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?