TAYLOR v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-00491
District Judge MARK E WALKER, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 3:44 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR
v.
No Logo Amy kirkland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE OLD ROBB & STUCKY BLDG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016 Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
No Logo ANDREW SMITH, Defendant
No Logo Block, Defendant
No Logo CHOLSTON, Defendant
No Logo CORIZON LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE OLD ROBB & STUCKY BLDG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
No Logo D SWEENEY, Defendant
No Logo F LYNCH, Defendant
No Logo F MCQUIRE, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo H COKER, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Brown, Defendant
No Logo JESSICA CHUNN, Defendant
No Logo M LINDSAY, Defendant
No Logo M TAYLOR, Defendant
No Logo P TODD, Defendant
No Logo R MEUTH, Defendant
No Logo S SMITH, Defendant
No Logo V HUGGINS, Defendant
No Logo W WIMES, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. The motion to dismiss filed by the Department of Corrections, ECF No. 11 , and the motion to dismiss by Corizon, ECF No. 4 , are GRANTED. Plaintiffs amended complaint, ECF No. 13 , is DISMISSED. However, Plaintiff is permitted to file a second amended complaint in compliance with the Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff must file his second amended complaint on or before 5/10/2017, or this cause will be dismissed. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/10/2017. (vkm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR (vkm) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER denying 22 Motion requesting summons. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/6/2016. (vkm) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 13 First Amended Complaint - 3 Service Copies Received. (vkm) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION REQUESTING SUMMONS (filed as "Summons in a Civil Action") by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (vkm) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER - Plaintiff's motion requesting leave to file his responses out of time, ECF No. 20 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall return this file after docketing for consideration in due course of the pending motions and Plaintiff's responsive memoranda. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/17/2016. (vkm) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to File Responsive Memorandum Out of Time, re: 18 Plaintiff's RESPONSIVE Memorandum in Opposition to Corizon Health's MOTION to Dismiss and 19 Plaintiff's Reply to Florida Department of Corrections 11 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (kjw) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Plaintiff's Reply to Florida Department of Corrections 11 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (kjw) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Plaintiff's RESPONSIVE Memorandum in Opposition to Corizon Health's 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (kjw) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, ECF No. 16 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Responses to 4 & 11 Motions due by 10/31/2016 (Notify Chambers on 10/31/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 10/13/2016. (vkm) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Extension of Time Re: 12 Order by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (vkm) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Change of Address FROM Hamilton Annex Correctional Institution TO APALACHEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION K-154 35 APALACHEE DRIVE SNEADS, FLORIDA 32460 by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR (vkm) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE to the Court Regarding Plaintiff's Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS re 12 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (KVERNE, ERIK) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (docketed per 12 Order) against JERRY BROWN, CHOLSTON, JESSICA CHUNN, H COKER, CORIZON LLC, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, V HUGGINS, M LINDSAY, B LOCK, F LYNCH, F MCQUIRE, R MEUTH, ANDREW SMITH, S SMITH, D SWEENEY, M TAYLOR, P TODD, W WIMES, filed by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (vkm) Modified on 10/4/2016 (vkm). (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall separate the Plaintiff's amended complaint from the state court record and separately file it as Plaintiff's amended complaint on the docket in this case. (Memorandum in opposition to 4 Motion due by 10/5/2016. Memorandum in opposition to 11 Motion due by 10/31/2016. Notify Chambers on 10/31/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 10/3/2016. (vkm) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (KVERNE, ERIK) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to remand, ECF No. 7 , is DENIED. Response to 4 MOTION due by 10/5/2016. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS answer due 9/28/2016 (Notify Chambers on 10/5/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/13/2016. (vkm) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REFERRAL AND ORDER granting 8 DEFENDANT CORIZON, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Response to 7 Motion due by 9/21/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/12/2016. (vkm) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Unopposed) by CORIZON LLC. (TOOMEY, GREGG) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Remand to State Court by LEONARD WAYNE TAYLOR. (vkm) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal by Amy kirkland re 5 Notice of Appearance (TOOMEY, GREGG) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG A TOOMEY on behalf of Amy kirkland (TOOMEY, GREGG) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Dismiss by CORIZON LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/29/2016). (TOOMEY, GREGG) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY GREGG TOOMEY: Re 1 Notice of Removal - The parties named in the above-referenced document were added to the docket incorrectly and have been corrected by the clerk. For future reference, please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide." (Both are available on the clerk's website at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on CM/ECF link and they are available under General Info.) (kjw) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TOOMEY, GREGG) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corizon, LLC from 2nd Judicial Circuit, Leon County, case number 2014-CA-002461. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3646797.), filed by Corizon, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, part 1 - State Court file, # 2 Exhibit 1, part 2 - State Court file) (TOOMEY, GREGG) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?