Beattie et al v. Line Mountain School District

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 4:13-cv-02655
District Judge Matthew W. Brann, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Matthew W. Brann
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 4:15 AM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Angie Beattie, Plaintiff

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Cohen +1 856 382 2240 +1 856 661 1919 jeff.cohen@flastergreenberg.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abbe F. Fletman +1 215 279 9388 abbe.fletman@flastergreenberg.com

Represented by WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry L. Fromson +1 215 928 9801 +1 215 928 9848 tfromson@womenslawproject.org
No Logo Brian Beattie, Plaintiff

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Cohen +1 856 382 2240 +1 856 661 1919 jeff.cohen@flastergreenberg.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abbe F. Fletman +1 215 279 9388 abbe.fletman@flastergreenberg.com

Represented by WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry L. Fromson +1 215 928 9801 +1 215 928 9848 tfromson@womenslawproject.org
v.
No Logo Line Mountain School District, Defendant

Represented by 100 Corporate Center Drive

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole M. Ehrhart +1 717 651 3512 nmehrhart@mdwcg.com

Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER J. CONRAD +1 717 651 3531 cjconrad@mdwcg.com
Other Parties
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA WRESTLING CLUB, INC., Intervenor Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence M. Otter +1 267 261 2948 larryotter@hotmail.com

Represented by elionlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Shipman +1 570 326 2443 +3261 326 326 1585 dshipman@elionlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: In accordance with the MEMORANDUM of this same date, separate docket entry no. 66, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees 62 is GRANTED, and Defendant must pay attorneys fees and costs as follows: To Flaster/Greenberg PC, Defendants must pay $22,852.50 in attorney's fees. To the Womens Law Project, Defendant must pay $6,040 in attorneys fees.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/16/14 (km) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/16/14. (km) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION - Withdrawal and Entry of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Abbe F. Fletman terminated. Attorney Jeffrey A. Cohen for Angie Beattie,Jeffrey A. Cohen for Brian Beattie added. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 62 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Kelley Declaration)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 62 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Line Mountain School District.(Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Memo, # 2 Exhibit(s) Table of Contents of Exhibits to Motion, # 3 Exhibit(s) Fletman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s) Fromson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s), # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: As all outstanding matters have been resolved in this case, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/10/14. (km) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum of this same date, docketed as separate docket entry no. 59, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED, and Defendant must pay attorneys fees and costs to the following parties in the following amounts: 1. To Flaster Greenberg PC, Defendants must pay $47,882.50 in attorneys fees and $1,198.28 in costs, for a total amount of $49,080.78. 2. To the Women's Law Project, Defendant must pay $21,530 in attorneys fees and $338.11 in costs, for a total amount of $21,868.11. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/10/14 (km) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) - RE Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees 47 . Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/10/14. (km) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT DECREE ENTERED. (See Decree for details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/2/14. (km) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie re 47 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Brian Beattie. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie re 47 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Joanne M. Kelley. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Order by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. 53 Letter . (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Abbe Fletman re: Proposed Consent Decree. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 47 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Certificate of Word Limit, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 47 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Line Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Certification of Word Count)(Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Non-Concurrence by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie re 47 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: GRANTING 48 Joint Motion to Stay and an Extension of Case Management Deadlines; adjourning the case management conference scheduled for 2/11/2014; STAYING the matter for 45 days from the date of this Order; defendant shall have until 3/13/2014 to respond to plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees; telephonic status conference set for 3/26/2014 1:30 p.m. w/plaintiffs' counsel initiating the call.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/7/14 (km) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Stay and Extend Deadlines by Line Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Table of Contents of Exhibits to Motion, # 3 Exhibit(s) A - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit(s) A - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit(s) B, # 6 Exhibit(s) C, # 7 Exhibit(s) D, # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Word Count, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2014 10:00 AM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for details.)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/21/14. (km) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry ECF No. 44 - It is ORDERED that: Plaintiffs's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 5] is GRANTED. The Defendant, Line Mountain School District and its officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and all those who are in active concert or participation with them, who receive actual notice of this injunction by personal service or otherwise are preliminarily ENJOINED from taking any action that would interfere with A.B.'s efforts to participate on the Line Mountain wrestling team on the same terms as males. Plaintiff shall not be required to give security, because compliance with this Order raises no risk of monetary loss to the Defendant.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/13/14. (km) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)- re Plaintiffs's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 5].Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/13/14. (km) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re 42 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Findings of Fact by Line Mountain School District. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: GRANTING the joint motion 38 to extend the page limit; the parties each shall be permitted to file up to 25 pages for their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/6/13 (km) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 38 Joint MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation filed by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie.(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Lori A. Fausnaught, RMR/CRR of preliminary injunction before Judge Matthew W. Brann on November 20, 2013. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Matthew W. Brann on November 20, 2013. By s/ Lori A. Fausnaught, RMR/CRR. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (cr6, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, preliminary injunction held on November 20, 2013, before Judge Matthew W. Brann. Court Reporter Lori A. Fausnaught, RMR/CRR, Telephone number 570.323.6704. Tape Number: Lori_Fausnaught@pamd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2014. (cr6, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: After hearing on the Plaintiffs' 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, it is ORDERED that the Court Reporter transcribe the transcript for the Court; Plaintiffs' proposed findings of fact/conclusions of law due before close of business 12/9/2013; Defendants' proposed findings of fact/conclusions of law due by close of businesss 12/16/2013; if Plaintiffs deem a reply brief is necessary, such reply due by the close of the day 12/23/2013. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/21/13. (km) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Receipt of Original Exhibits re Evidentiary Hearing held 11/20/2013 RECEIVED from Defendant's Counsel. (km) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendant's Exhibit List (Evidentiary hearing held 11/20/13 re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction] (km) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of original exhibits from the evidentiary hearing held 11/20/2013 RECEIVED from plaintiffs' counsel. (km) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Evidentiary hearing held 11/20/13 re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction] (km) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Terry L. Fromson. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/20/13. (lg) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER denying 25 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/20/13 (lg) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Denying Motion to Intevene (doc 15) by Pennsylvania Wrestling Club. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/20/13. (lg) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by PENNSYLVANIA WRESTLING CLUB, INC. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/20/13. (lg) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Stay ruling on preliminary injunction by PENNSYLVANIA WRESTLING CLUB, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Otter, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBIT by Line Mountain School District re 23 Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 2, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3, # 3 Exhibit(s) 4, # 4 Exhibit(s) 5, # 5 Exhibit(s) 6, # 6 Exhibit(s) 7, # 7 Exhibit(s) 8, # 8 Exhibit(s) 9, # 9 Exhibit(s) 10, # 10 Exhibit(s) 11)(Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibit List by Line Mountain School District.. (Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Witness List by Line Mountain School District. (Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Service of Witness List, Exhibit List and Exhibits Relating to Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Scheduled for November 20, 2013 by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie re 20 Exhibit List, 19 Witness List . (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibit List and Exhibits by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Witness List by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Shipman on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA WRESTLING CLUB, INC.. (Shipman, David) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Certificate of Word Count, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Intervene by PENNSYLVANIA WRESTLING CLUB, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE, # 2 PROPOSED COMPLAINT)(Otter, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Pre-Hearing Conference set for 11/14/2013 03:30 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for details.)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/13. (km) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Line Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F)(Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Line Mountain School District.(Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER from Court to Counsel - Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/7/13. (km) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher J. Conrad (Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Christopher J. Conrad on October 29, 2013, filed by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction/ MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for 11/20/2013 10:00 AM in Williamsport - Courtroom 3 before Honorable Matthew W. Brann.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/1/13. (see order for further details)(lg) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Ehrhart on behalf of Line Mountain School District (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Angie Beattie, Brian Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of A.B. in Support of Motion, # 3 Declaration of Brian Beattie in Support of Motion, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian Beattie in Support of Motion, # 5 Declaration of Angie Beattie in Support of Motion, # 6 Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion, # 7 Table of Contents of Exhibits to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion, # 9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion, # 10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion, # 11 Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause, # 12 Proposed Form of Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 13 Certificate of Service)(Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
  • Attachment 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 2 Declaration of A.B. in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 3 Declaration of Brian Beattie in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian Beattie in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 5 Declaration of Angie Beattie in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 6 Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 7 Table of Contents of Exhibits to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of
  • Attachment 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Terry L. Fromson in Support of Motion
  • Attachment 11 Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause
  • Attachment 12 Proposed Form of Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction
  • Attachment 13 Certificate of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Conrad on behalf of Line Mountain School District (Conrad, Christopher) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Abbe F. Fletman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Terry Fromson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2922062.. (Fletman, Abbe) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Line Mountain School District and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ch1) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Line Mountain School District ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 2921135), filed by Brian Beattie, Angie Beattie. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s))(ch1) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 18 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?