DOSS v. U.S. PROBATION OFFICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00093

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 3:57 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ANGEL PASTOR DOSS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ANGEL PASTOR DOSS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANGEL PASTOR DOSS
v.
No Logo AL FRANKEN, Defendant
No Logo AMY KOLBUCHAR, Defendant
No Logo BERNIE SANDERS, Defendant
No Logo BOB CORKER, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES R. SIMPSON, Defendant
No Logo DICK DURBIN, Defendant
No Logo KAREN K. CALDWEL, Defendant
No Logo KATHERINE POLK FAILLA, Defendant
No Logo Lamar, Alexander, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "MITCH MCCONNELL"
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Rand, Paul, Defendant
No Logo TAMMY DUCKWORTH, Defendant
No Logo TANYA WALTON PRATT, Defendant
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION DISMISSING complaint without prejudice. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/12/2017. (lckbj1)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Civil Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Civil Statement (Averment of Malice, Intent Knowledge and Other Conditions of the Mind from Plaintiff. (td) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANGEL PASTOR DOSS. Case related to Case No. U.S. District Court for Lexington, KY (case no.: not given). (td) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                COMPLAINT against LAMAR ALEXANDER, KAREN K. CALDWEL, BOB CORKER, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, DICK DURBIN, KATHERINE POLK FAILLA, AL FRANKEN, AMY KOLBUCHAR, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL, TANYA WALTON PRATT, PAUL RYAN, BERNIE SANDERS, CHARLES R. SIMPSON, U.S. PROBATION OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616082486) with Jury Demand filed by ANGEL PASTOR DOSS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 16 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?