Neal v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00022

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 4:34 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Curtis Neal, Plaintiff
v.
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp
Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 227
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Appear
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Response
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Designation of Mediator
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Lift Stay
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Lift Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 34 Unopposed Motion to Extend Stay through September 7, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/9/2018. (jaw)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay -Extension of Time to Extend Temp Stay of this Action by Synchrony Bank. Responses due by 7/19/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Stepanyan, Julieta)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Stay through July 5, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/25/2018. (jaw)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay - Extension of Time to Extend Temporation Stay of this Action by Synchrony Bank. Responses due by 7/6/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Stepanyan, Julieta)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Terminating Stay previously imposed in doc# 25 and staying this matter for sixty (60) days, subject to an early termination of the stay upon the resolution of the motions to transfer in Mott and Campbell. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/24/2018. (jaw)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Marcos D. Sasso by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Stepanyan, Julieta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 26 MOTION to Lift Stay re 25 Order on Motion to Stay, ( Telephone Conference set for 4/23/2018 03:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) Additional instructions will be provided to counsel by email. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/19/2018. (jaw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of availability of counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant for a telephonic status conference by Curtis Neal (Radbil, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION to Lift Stay re 25 Order on Motion to Stay, by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Slater, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Lift Stay re 25 Order on Motion to Stay, by Curtis Neal. Responses due by 4/12/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Radbil, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay. All requirements, deadlines (including responsive pleading deadlines), and further proceedings in this action before this Court are stayed pending ruling by the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals in ACA International. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/9/17. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Radbil, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Stay [Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay the Claims of Plaintiff Curtis Neal] by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Sasso, Marcos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Stay by Curtis Neal. Replies due by 5/12/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Radbil, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Julieta Stepanyan for Synchrony Bank,Julieta Stepanyan for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/25/2017. (eef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Marcos D. Sasso for Synchrony Bank,Marcos D. Sasso for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/25/2017. (eef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Julia B. Strickland for Synchrony Bank,and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/25/2017. (eef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Slater, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Allen Slater on behalf of Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Slater, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by Synchrony Bank.(DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Stay by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Amended Petition for Review, # 3 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet for ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission)(DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Responses due by 5/5/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Bank (DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Julieta Stepanyan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3304074. by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stepanyan Bar Admissions, # 2 Proposed Order)(DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marcos D. Sasso Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3304073. by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sasso Bar Admissions, # 2 Proposed Order)(DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Julia B. Strickland Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3304064. by Synchrony Bank, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Strickland Bar Admissions, # 2 Proposed Order)(DeFrank, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Neal. Synchrony Bank served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. (Radbil, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued Electronically as to Synchrony Bank. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Synchrony Bank, filed by Curtis Neal.(Radbil, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Aaron D. Radbil for Curtis Neal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/8/2017. (eef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Aaron D. Radbil Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3258130. by Curtis Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Radbil, # 2 Certificate of good standing for Aaron Radbil, # 3 Declaration of Curtis Neal)(White, Wesley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curtis Neal. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 2/17/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (White, Wesley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued Electronically as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (jlk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., d/b/a Walmart with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3212318), filed by Curtis Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(White, Wesley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?