Simmons v. Hankins
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-04013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 24, 2021 at 12:30 AM EST (5.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (163) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/24/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/22/2021, Entered: None Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/22/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/22/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/13/2021, Entered: None In Limine
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/13/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None In Limine
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/6/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None Writ Issued - Personal Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/20/2021, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Writ Issued
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Writ Issued
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Request Counsel
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Notice Rule 56 entered
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Response (NOT to a motion/petition)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/23/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Response (NOT to a motion/petition)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Prisoner Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Notice Rule 56 entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Judgment on Partial Findings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Video Writ Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Reply (NOT related to a motion/petition)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None HIPAA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MERIT REVIEW OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/1/2017. The Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis is granted 3 . Pursuant to a review of the Complaint, the Court finds that the Plaintiff states a plausible constituti onal claim for indifference to his need for a handicapped accessible cell and a possible claim under the Americans with Disabilities Act, 42 U.S.C. § 12111, et seq., and the Rehabilitation Act, 29 U.S.C. § 794, et seq. This case is now in the process of service. HIPAA Order to enter. (SEE WRITTEN MERIT REVIEW OPINION) (MAS, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None NOTICE OF CASE OPENING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?