Grace Cannata, et al v. Lowe's Home Center, Incorporat
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 11-2688

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:29 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00701661439 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 12/08/2011 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6357788-2] [6357788] [11-2688] (FP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER re: Plaintiff-appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal, filed on 12/8/11. This appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). As a result, it is unnecessary to rule on appellee's motion to dismiss. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [13] [6357783] [11-2688] (FP)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Motion filed by Appellant Grace M. Cannata in 11-2688 to dismiss case. [6357609] [11-2688, 09-2754] (Cannata, Sam)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed Reply by Appellee Doris J. Masters in 11-2688 in support of motion to dismiss appeal. [12][6338235] [11-2688, 09-2754] (Doherty, Richard)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed Response in Opposition by Appellant Grace M. Cannata in 11-2688 to Plaintiff-Appellee's Motion to Dismiss. [11][6336346] [11-2688] (Cannata, Sam)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notification of Circuit Rule 33 conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Thursday, September 29, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. RJS [10] [6335656] [11-2688] (JLC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Motion filed by Appellee Doris J. Masters to dismiss case. [6334189] [11-2688] (Doherty, Richard)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing in this appeal is SUSPENDED pending further court order. A notice of Circuit Rule 33 Settlement Conference will issue shortly and be posted separately to the docket. [8] JNS [6333281] [11-2688] (JLC)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Attorney Marc W. Parker for Doris J. Masters in 09-2754 and Doris J. Masters in 11-2688 terminated and added Attorney(s) Richard J. Doherty for party(s) Appellee Doris J. Masters, in case 09-2754 Attorney(s) Richard J. Doherty for party(s) Appellee Doris J. Masters, in case 11-2688 per disclosure statement. Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard J. Doherty for Appellee Doris J. Masters in 11-2688, 09-2754. [7] [6329531] [11-2688, 09-2754]--[Edited 08/12/2011 by SM to reflect terminated and added attorney.] (Doherty, Richard)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kathleen B. Barry for Appellee Lowe's Home Center, Incorporated. [6] [6327055] [11-2688] (Barry, Kathleen)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimball R. Anderson for Appellee Lowe's Home Center, Incorporated. [5] [6326879] [11-2688] (Anderson, Kimball)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Docketing statement filed by Appellant Grace M. Cannata in 11-2688. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. [4] [6326753] [11-2688] [4] [6326753] [11-2688] (Cannata, Sam)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Grace M. Cannata in 11-2688. [3] [6326287] [11-2688, 09-2754] (Cannata, Sam)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sam P. Cannata for Appellant Grace M. Cannata in 11-2688. [2] [6326284] [11-2688] (Cannata, Sam)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Grace M. Cannata by 08/01/2011. Transcript information sheet due by 08/08/2011. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/06/2011 for Grace M. Cannata. [1] [6324945] [11-2688] (CD)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?