Rum v. DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:12-cv-00366
District Judge Deborah K. Chasanow, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Deborah K. Chasanow
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 2:23 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Debra A. Rum, Plaintiff

Represented by Calverton Office Park

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Michele Chambers +1 301 486 1200 +1 301 486 0835 SChambers@hartelkane.com
v.
No Logo DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H Henderson +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 chenderson@mhlawyers.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Terminate Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER "REOPENING" Case for the Limited Purpose of Adjudicating the Request to Confirm Arbitration Award; "GRANTING" Request to Confirm and Enforce Arbitration Award; "ENTERING" Judgment in favor or Defendant DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc., and against Plaintiff Debra A. Rum on all claims; and "DIRECTING" the Clerk to Close this Case. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/31/2013. (rds, Chambers) Modified on 12/31/2013 - Text enhanced (td, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/31/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Response
RESPONSE re 13 Notice (Other), 14 Notice (Other), 12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Stay,, Notice of Results of Arbitration filed by Debra A. Rum. (Chambers, Sharon) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 ~Notice (other)
PAPERLESS NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Defendant has filed a notice containing the results of arbitration and requesting confirmation of the decision, finding in favor of Defendant on all claims submitted. Plaintiff is directed to respond to the request by December 27, 2013, indicating whether all claims were resolved by the arbitration and whether she objects to confirmation of the decision. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc. Results of Arbitration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 4 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to stay action pending arbitration, DIRECTING that arbitration between the parties BE INITIATED, STAYING these proceedings pending arbitration, ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING this case, subject to reopening upon the completion of arbitration at the request of either party, and DIRECTING counsel to notify the court promptly of the results. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/10/12. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Memorandum OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/10/12. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 reply to response to motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Debra A. Rum. Replies due by 3/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Order)(Chambers, Sharon) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to 4 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to stay action pending arbitration is now due 2/29/12. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/21/12. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay by Debra A. Rum Responses due by 3/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chambers, Sharon) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Court Filing
StandingORDER Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/8/2012. (nss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc. (nss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration by DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc. Responses due by 2/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(nss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Summons issued
Summons Issued 30 days as to DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc. (nss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc., filed by Debra A. Rum.(nss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Notice of Removal
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court of Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL11-37733 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637018584), filed by DARCARS of New Carrollton, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 27 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?