Unknown
Bankruptcy Case Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 9:08 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Unknown Document Type
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 Final Report and Account (Chapter 13)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Notice to Deposit Funds
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 Certificate of Mailing
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Order Discharging Debtor
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/17/2000
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 Notice of Filing of Claim (Court Use ONLY)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of Filing of Claim (Court Use ONLY)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Notice of Filing of Claim (Court Use ONLY)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 Unknown Document Type
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 Unknown Document Type
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Hearing held;
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/16/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Certificate of service
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996 Hearing held;
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Objection
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Hearing held;
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 ~Motion (Generic)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Unknown Document Type
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 7 Case (By Debtor/Creditor/Trustee)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/19/1996 Objection to Confirmation of Plan
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996 Unknown Document Type
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 Amended Chapter 13 Plan
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix (Including D,E,F) (Fee Required)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Hearing held;
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 Confirmation Report, Witness and Exhibit List
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 Hearing held;
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Comment
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/3/1995 Objection to Claim (Without Objection Language)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 Notice of Appearance By Attorney
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix (Including D,E,F) (Fee Required)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Notice of Appearance By Attorney
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Notice of Appearance By Attorney
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995 Chapter 13 Plan
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995 Voluntary Petition (generic)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?