Hanley v. Zucker et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-05958
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 12:47 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Blumkin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AYTAN YEHOSHUA BELLIN +1 914 358 5345 +1 212 571 0284 aytan.bellin@bellinlaw.com
No Logo Sylvia Hanley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AYTAN YEHOSHUA BELLIN +1 914 358 5345 +1 212 571 0284 aytan.bellin@bellinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nina Keilin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina Keilin +1 212 302 7760
v.
No Logo M.D., J.D. Howard A. Zucker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rene Frances Hertzog +1 212 416 8645 +1 212 416 6009 rene.hertzog@ag.ny.gov
No Logo Steven Banks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Agnetha Elizabeth Jacob +1 212 356 0881 +1 212 788 0940 ajacob@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have failed to file oppositions to defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' motions to dismiss at ECF Nos. 51 and 53 are therefore GRANTED as unopposed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 51 and 53. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/07/2016) (ama) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: The above-captioned cases have been designated as related. It is hereby ORDERED that: Lead counsel for all parties shall appear for a conference on Tuesday, January 10, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. All counsel in receipt of this order shall notify all other parties (or, if known, their attorneys) of the conference by serving each of them with a copy of this order and with a copy of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Counsel shall file proof of such service with the Court. In Garcia v. Banks, case No. 16-cv-8370, the Court notes that defendant's deadline to answer or move against the complaint is November 18, 2016. If defendant moves against the complaint, plaintiff shall respond not later than December 9, 2016, and plaintiff shall reply not later than December 23, 2016. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 12/9/2016, Replies due by 12/23/2016., Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/10/2016) (ama) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated 10/19/2016 re: Camaiore Affirmation and the Current Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 59 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 53 MOTION to Dismiss 46 Second Amended Complaint., 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. So ordered. (The parties are nonetheless required to notify the Court immediately as to their positions on the conversion issue the Court raised in its order of October 13, 2016). (Responses due by 11/21/2016 Replies due by 12/21/2016.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/19/2016) (cla) Modified on 11/3/2016 (cla). (Entered: 10/19/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., 53 MOTION to Dismiss 46 Second Amended Complaint. addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated October 19, 2016. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: The Court has reviewed the affirmation of Marguerite Camaiore in support of defendant banks' motion to dismiss. (ECF No. 55.) The Court views the materials attached to the Camaiore affirmation as integral to plaintiffs' complaint, and therefore appropriate to consider on deciding the instant motions to dismiss. Plaintiffs should let the Court know if they disagree by October 19, 2016. If plaintiffs disagree, the Court will convert the motions to dismiss to motions for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/13/2016) (cla) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 50 Motion to Seal Document. So ordered. Agreed. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/12/2016) (cla) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIRMATION of Marguerite Camaiore in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss 46 Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Steven Banks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter re: submission of exhibits via email instead of ECF due to pending request to file exhibits under seal)(Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss 46 Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Banks. (Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Dismiss 46 Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Steven Banks.(Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Howard A. Zucker. (Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Agnetha E. Jacob dated 10/06/2016. Document filed by Steven Banks.(Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint until October 6, 2016. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/1/2016) (cla) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 46 Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Agnetha E. Jacob dated 8/31/2016. Document filed by Steven Banks.(Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Rene F. Hertzog dated August 31, 2016. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 8 Amended Complaint against Steven Banks, Howard A. Zucker.Document filed by Sylvia Hanley, Alan Blumkin. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      OPINION & ORDER re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay. filed by Howard A. Zucker, 20 MOTION to Dismiss 8 the Amended Complaint. filed by Steven Banks. The Court has considered the parties' other arguments and finds that they are without merit. For the reasons stated above, defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. The Court will allow plaintiffs one opportunity to replead their complaint consistent with the above not later than August 22, 2016. (As further set forth in this order), ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2016.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/21/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Rene F. Hertzog dated June 21, 2016 re: Response to Plaintiffs' June 15, 2016 Letter. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated June 15, 2016 re: Issuance of Immediate Needs Regulations by the New York State Department of Health. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/4/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2016 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Rene F. Hertzog dated March 2, 2016 re: Enclosing Notice of Revised Rule Making. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: The oral argument currently scheduled for February 26, 2016 has been rescheduled for Friday, March 4, 2016, at 12:00 p.m. (Oral Argument set for 3/4/2016 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/22/2015) (cf) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 37 Letter to adjourn oral arugment, filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley. ENDORSEMENT: Of course. Oral argument is rescheduled to 2/26/16 at 2pm. ( Oral Argument set for 2/26/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/16/2015) (cdo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated December 14, 2015 re: Request for Adjournment of January 28, 2016 Oral Argument Date on the Pending Motions to Dismiss and Stay. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: Before the Court are defendants' motions to dismiss. The Court has scheduled oral argument for Thursday, January 28, 2016, at 2 p.m. ( Oral Argument set for 1/28/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/9/2015) (mro) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss 8 the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Banks. (Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay. . Document filed by Howard A. Zucker. (Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              DECLARATION of Aytan Y. Bellin in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay., 20 MOTION to Dismiss 8 the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley. (Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay., 20 MOTION to Dismiss 8 the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley. (Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Before the Court is the question of whether discovery should be stayed pending the resolution of defendants' motions to dismiss. The issue was raised in the state defendant's brief in support of its motion to dismiss and discussed by the parties at the initial pretrial conference on October 28, 2015. Accordingly, all discovery in this action is STAYED until the Court issues further instructions after it reviews the full briefing on the motions to dismiss. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/12/2015) (kko) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated November 11, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Amended Reply Letter in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Request Concerning Discovery and in Opposition to Defendants' Request for a Stay. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 11/11/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated November 11, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Letter in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Request Concerning Discovery and in Reply to Defendants' Request for a Stay. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 11/11/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Agnetha E. Jacob dated 11/9/2015 re: 24 Plaintiffs' Request to Conduct Discovery. Document filed by Steven Banks.(Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Rene F. Hertzog dated 11/9/2015 re: Stay of Discovery. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Pretrial Conference proceeding held on 10/28/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/2015 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mary Greco, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2016.(ca) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Aytan Y. Bellin dated November 2, 2015 re: Discovery Stay. Document filed by Alan Blumkin, Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nina Keilin on behalf of Sylvia Hanley. (Keilin, Nina) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: The Court held an initial pretrial conference in this action on October 28, 2015. As stated at the conference, not later than November 2, 2015, plaintiff shall submit proposed narrow written discovery to the Court as an attachment to a letter not to exceed five single-spaced pages regarding the stay of discovery proposed by defendants. Defendants shall submit any opposition not later than November 9, 2015, either in two separate five single-spaced pages or a joint ten-page submission. Plaintiff shall submit any reply (three pages single spaced) not later than November 11, 2015. Plaintiff shall also oppose the pending motions to dismiss in accordance with the Local Rules. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/29/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss 8 the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Banks. (Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 8 the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Steven Banks.(Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jane McCloskey in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay.. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay. . Document filed by Howard A. Zucker. (Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, For a Stay. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Agnetha Elizabeth Jacob on behalf of Steven Banks. (Jacob, Agnetha) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part 13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted only in part. The claim here is of undue delay -- so it behooves us to move this along. The Court grants an extension only to October 27 to move or answer -- not longer. The status conference shall proceed as scheduled. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/9/2015) (lmb) Modified on 10/14/2015 (lmb). (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the First Amended Complaint and to Adjourn the Pre-Trial Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Rene F. Hertzog dated October 8, 2015. Document filed by Howard A. Zucker.(Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rene Frances Hertzog on behalf of Howard A. Zucker. (Hertzog, Rene) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. 1. Extension to respond to complaint granted to 10/14/15. 2. Initial conference adjourned to 10/28 at 1 pm. ( Initial Conference set for 10/28/2015 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/3/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Stephen Kitzinger dated September 3, 2015., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Stephen Kitzinger dated September 3, 2015. Document filed by Steven Banks.(Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of Steven Banks. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Steven Banks, Howard A. Zucker.Document filed by Sylvia Hanley, Alan Blumkin. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Steven Banks served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. Service was accepted by Ms. Booth, Clerk. Document filed by Sylvia Hanley. (Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Howard A. Zucker served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. Service was accepted by Kerry-Ann Lawrence, Senior Attorney. Document filed by Sylvia Hanley. (Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2015 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/4/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Banks, Howard A. Zucker. (rch) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Howard A. Zucker, M.D., J.D, Steven Banks, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Sylvia Hanley. (Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Steven Banks, Howard A. Zucker. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11214592)Document filed by Sylvia Hanley.(Bellin, Aytan) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?