Federal National Mortgage Asso v. Leftridge
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-2523

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 3:53 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3230 - Real Property: Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1573261] [15-2523] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:51 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1573244] [15-2523] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:36 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/06/2015, RECEIVED.[1573240] [15-2523] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:33 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Vernon James Leftridge, Jr., FILED. [1573218] [15-2523] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:22 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 35 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?