Smart Options, LLC v. Ticket2Final, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00164
District Judge Barbara B. Crabb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 11:41 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smart Options, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dowell Baker PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Andrew Baker +1 708 707 8778 geoffb@optionit.com
v.
No Logo Ticket2Final USA LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R David Donoghue PHV +1 312 263 3600 +1 312 578 6666 david.donoghue@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Eric Jedlinski +1 312 263 3600 steven.jedlinski@hklaw.com
No Logo Ticket2final Ltd., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' motion to extend their deadline to May 15 (dkt. 9 ) is granted based on their representations to the court. There will be no additional extensions of this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/7/14. (krj) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Letter To Judge Stephen L. Crocker by Defendant Ticket2Final USA LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Donoghue, R.) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. There shall be no further extensions of this deadline. Ticket2Final USA LLC answer due 5/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/18/14. (krj) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Eric Jedlinski for Defendant Ticket2Final USA LLC (Jedlinski, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Appearance filed by R. David Donoghue for Defendant Ticket2Final USA LLC (Donoghue, R.) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Baker, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/19/2014. (lak) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Ticket2Final USA LLC served on 3/3/2014, answer due 3/24/2014. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (krj) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued as to Ticket2Final, Ltd. (main document), Ticket2Final USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Ticket2Final USA LLC) (krj) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      PATENT COMPLAINT against Ticket2Final, Ltd., Ticket2Final USA LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-1305450) filed by Smart Options, LLC. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7313539, issued 12/25/2007, held by Smart Options, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action AO 120, # 3 Summons to T2F, # 4 Summons to T2FU, # 5 Exhibit A - USPN 7313539, # 6 Exhibit B - TM Reg. No. 3776177, # 7 Exhibit C - T2F FAQ, # 8 Exhibit D - T2F Pat App, # 9 Exhibit E - T2F Purchase Page) (Baker, Geoffrey) Modified docket text on 2/28/2014. (arw) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Space Space

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 15 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?