National Federation Of The Blind v. The City Of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-06018
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 11:11 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joyce Carrico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Goldstein & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Elia +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 AElia@browngold.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Frank Goldstein +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 dfg@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Emmanuel Packrone +1 212 644 8644 spackrone@dralegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2216

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Anne Caiola +1 212 644 8644 +1 212 644 8636 mcaiola@dralegal.org
No Logo Mindy Jacobsen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Goldstein & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Elia +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 AElia@browngold.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Frank Goldstein +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 dfg@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Emmanuel Packrone +1 212 644 8644 spackrone@dralegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2216

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Anne Caiola +1 212 644 8644 +1 212 644 8636 mcaiola@dralegal.org
No Logo National Federation Of The Blind, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Goldstein & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Elia +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 AElia@browngold.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Frank Goldstein +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 dfg@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Anne Caiola +1 212 644 8644 +1 212 644 8636 mcaiola@dralegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Emmanuel Packrone +1 212 644 8644 spackrone@dralegal.org
No Logo Nihal Erkan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Goldstein & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Elia +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 AElia@browngold.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Frank Goldstein +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 dfg@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Disability Rights Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Emmanuel Packrone +1 212 644 8644 spackrone@dralegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2216

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Anne Caiola +1 212 644 8644 +1 212 644 8636 mcaiola@dralegal.org
v.
No Logo Anne Roest, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Citybridge, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com
New York City Department Of Information Technology & Telecommunications New York City Department Of Information Technology & Telecommunications, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12188
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within forty-five days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within forty-five days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/17/2017) (mro) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Joshua A. Stein dated January 13, 2017 re: parties have reached a substantive agreement and, therefore, respctfully request that the court stall all existing deadlines. Document filed by City Of New York, CityBridge LLC, New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications, Anne Roest.(Stein, Joshua) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting 31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Time to answer or move extended to January 13, 2017. December 8 conference adjourned to Jan. 27, 2017 at 11:15 a.m. City Of New York answer due 1/13/2017; CityBridge LLC answer due 1/13/2017; New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications answer due 1/13/2017; Anne Roest answer due 1/13/2017. (Initial Conference set for 1/27/2017 at 11:15 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Joshua A. Stein dated November 28, 2016., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Joshua A. Stein dated November 28, 2016. Document filed by City Of New York, CityBridge LLC, New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications, Anne Roest.(Stein, Joshua) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Adam Stein on behalf of City Of New York, New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications, Anne Roest. (Stein, Joshua) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 28 Letter, filed by Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, Joyce Carrico, National Federation Of The Blind re: Request for Withdrawal by the court of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Extension for filing responsive motions or pleadings. ENDORSEMENT: OK. OK. Application granted. Conference adjourned to Dec. 8, 2016 at 10:30 am. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/2/2016. Initial Conference set for 12/8/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/3/2016) (kko) (Main Document 29 replaced on 10/5/2016) (kko). Modified on 10/5/2016 (kko). (Entered: 10/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michelle Caiola dated September 30, 2016 re: Request for Withdrawal by the court of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Extension for filing responsive motions or pleadings. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind.(Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer, to respond to Motion and to postpone Pretrial Conference. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to November 4, 2016 at 10:45 am. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 10/14/2016. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/17/2016) (kko) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of City Of New York, New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications, Anne Roest. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer, to respond to Motion and to postpone Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michelle Caiola dated August 17, 2016. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind.(Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Adam Stein on behalf of CityBridge LLC. (Stein, Joshua) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. CityBridge LLC served on 8/9/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. Service was accepted by Alison Hoffman. Document filed by National Federation Of The Blind; Nihal Erkan; Joyce Carrico; Mindy Jacobsen. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Anne Roest served on 8/9/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. Service was accepted by Chad Rosenthal. Document filed by National Federation Of The Blind; Nihal Erkan; Joyce Carrico; Mindy Jacobsen. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications served on 8/9/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. Service was accepted by Chad Rosenthal. Document filed by National Federation Of The Blind; Nihal Erkan; Joyce Carrico; Mindy Jacobsen. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. City Of New York served on 8/9/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by National Federation Of The Blind; Nihal Erkan; Joyce Carrico; Mindy Jacobsen. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 15 Motion for Daniel Frank Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting 14 Motion for Albert Elia to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind.(Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Daniel Frank Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12605378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Albert Elia to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12605203. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elia, Albert) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/2/2016) (kko) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CityBridge LLC. (dgo) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anne Roest. (dgo) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications. (dgo) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (dgo) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Emmanuel Packrone on behalf of Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Packrone, Seth) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CityBridge LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anne Roest, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joyce Carrico, Nihal Erkan, Mindy Jacobsen, National Federation Of The Blind. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Federation Of The Blind.(Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    COMPLAINT against CityBridge LLC, New York City Department of Information Technology and Telecommunications, Anne Roest, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12586353)Document filed by National Federation Of The Blind, Nihal Erkan, Joyce Carrico, Mindy Jacobsen.(Caiola, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?