NATTIEL v. WEEKS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00150
District Judge William Terrell Hodges, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 11:45 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLIE NATTIEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #110

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN +1 239 994 0381 raemi@eagleglennlaw.com
v.
No Logo Bloom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SEAN WILLIAM GELLIS +1 850 717 3607 Sean.Gellis@fdc.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Department of Environmental Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 william.gwaltney@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Department of Environmental Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 william.gwaltney@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo GERALD MONTGOMERY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SEAN WILLIAM GELLIS +1 850 717 3607 Sean.Gellis@fdc.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Department of Environmental Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 william.gwaltney@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo KIMBERLY WEEKS, Defendant
No Logo LOTT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Agency for Health Care Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SEAN WILLIAM GELLIS +1 850 717 3607 Sean.Gellis@fdc.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Department of Environmental Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 william.gwaltney@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Martin, Frank S., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SEAN WILLIAM GELLIS +1 850 717 3607 Sean.Gellis@fdc.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Department of Environmental Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 william.gwaltney@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo MILTON HICKS, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT DRIGGERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SEAN WILLIAM GELLIS +1 850 717 3607 Sean.Gellis@fdc.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Department of Environmental Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 william.gwaltney@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Stone, Defendant
No Logo Tomlinson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SEAN WILLIAM GELLIS +1 850 717 3607 Sean.Gellis@fdc.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Kverne +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Erik.Kverne@myfloridalegal.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING 70 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by William Terrell Hodges on 11/27/2017. This case is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (kdm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER ADOPTING 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING 81 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by William Terrell Hodges on 11/27/2017. The Clerk should terminate Ms. Tomlinson as a defendant but should not enter judgment at this time. (kdm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to William Terrell Hodges for all further proceedings. SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL no longer assigned to case. Signed by William Terrell Hodges on 1/12/2017. (kjw) **Please use the new judge's initials for future filings - 1:15cv150-WTH/GRJ. (Entered: 01/13/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/26/16. Discovery due by 1/13/2017. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/3/2017. All other provisions set forth in the Court's original case management and scheduling order, ECF No. 28 , remain operative in this case. (bkp) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE /Joint Status Report of Planning Meeting by CHARLIE NATTIEL (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER re 63 Third Amended Complaint. (JOINT Status Report due by 11/3/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/13/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 70 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Formal Grievance, # 2 Exhibit B - Emergency Grievance, # 3 Exhibit C - Formal Grievance, # 4 Exhibit D - Formal Grievance, # 5 Exhibit E - Inmate Request, # 6 Exhibit F - Inspector Gen. Report, # 7 Exhibit G - Discp. Hearing Report, # 8 Exhibit H - Inmate Request, # 9 Exhibit I - Inmate Sick Call Request, # 10 Exhibit J - Inmate Sick Call Request) (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (KVERNE, ERIK) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER to 63 Amended Complaint by BLOOM, ROBERT DRIGGERS, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON. (KVERNE, ERIK) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK DEWITT KVERNE on behalf of ROBERT DRIGGERS, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TOMLINSON (KVERNE, ERIK) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (GWALTNEY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Julie Jones) served on 8/24/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Summons Issued as to Julie Jones, Secretary FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (kdm) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 62 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Complaint. (Notify Chambers on 9/6/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/16/2016. The Clerk shall complete a summons form and a USM 285 form for service upon Julie Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order, the USM 285 form, the summons, and a service copy of the Complaint to the USM. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the Magistrate Judge, with the case number written on it. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLOOM, ROBERT DRIGGERS, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                First MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Complaint by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER granting 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Discovery due by 9/2/2016., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/22/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/19/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ORDER re 57 NOTICE of Dropping Party Defendant. STONE terminated. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/5/2016. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Officer Stone are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Officer Stone as a party. (kdm) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER denying 56 First MOTION for Attorney Fees /COSTS from Bench and Bar Fund. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/5/2016. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiffs Motion for Reimbursement From Courts Bench and Bar Fund for Attorney Costs, ECF No. 56 , to the Clerk of Court, United States District Court, United States Courthouse, 25 W Government Street, 2nd Floor, Pensacola, Florida 32502. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Dropping Party Defendant by CHARLIE NATTIEL (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            First MOTION for Attorney Fees /COSTS from Bench and Bar Fund by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM WARREN GWALTNEY on behalf of BLOOM, ROBERT DRIGGERS, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY (GWALTNEY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ORDER granting 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Discovery due by 6/13/2016., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/3/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/16/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint, with defenses/affirmative defenses by ROBERT DRIGGERS. (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BLOOM, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON. (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER re 48 Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Plaintiff shall provide the Court with a current address for Defendant Officer Stone - by 4/7/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/8/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER denying as moot 44 MOTION to Compel release of medical records, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (sole and limited extension of time to take Mr. Nattiel's deposition); WITHDRAWING 45 Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/7/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted as to STONE. (Moved from address in January 2016 - No forwarding address given.) (kdm) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel (ECF No. 44) based on appearance of counsel for Plaintiff (ECF No. 46) by BLOOM, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON re 44 MOTION to Compel release of medical records MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (sole and limited extension of time to take Mr. Nattiel's deposition) (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN on behalf of CHARLIE NATTIEL (EAGLE-GLENN, RAEMI) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ** WITHDRAWN PER 49 ORDER *** -- ORDER granting 44 MOTION to Compel release of medical records, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (sole and limited extension of time to take Mr. Nattiel's deposition). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/25/2016. Defendants are permitted to depose Plaintiff thirty (30) days after the Court enters an order on Defendants motion to compel. (kdm) Modified on 3/7/2016 to add text (kdm). (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Compel release of medical records, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (sole and limited extension of time to take Mr. Nattiel's deposition) by BLOOM, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - February 2, 2016 Letter and Refusal, # 2 Exhibit B - February 23, 2016 Letter and Refusal) (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request To WAIVE SERVICE Of A Summons. ROBERT DRIGGERS waiver sent on 2/1/2016, answer due 3/2/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER granting 41 MOTION to Take Deposition from Plaintiff Charlie Nattiel, DC# 093914. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/28/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Take Deposition from Plaintiff Charlie Nattiel, DC# 093914 by BLOOM, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON. (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER denying 34 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel and granting with respect to posting a notice of inquiry. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/25/2016. The Clerk is directed to send notice to all members of the Court's bar, and publish on the Court's website, an announcement pertaining to this case regarding Plaintiff's request for the assistance of counsel. The Clerk shall notify chambers if a notice of appearance of counsel is filed, or if thirty days have elapsed from the date of the announcement, and no notice of appearance has been filed. (Forwarded to IT staff for processing.) (kdm) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ORDER re 22 Department of Corrections' NOTICE To Court Regarding Service of Process For Defendants'. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/25/2016. The Clerk shall prepare a USM-285 form and USM-1 waiver of service form for Defendant Robert Driggers and Defendant Officer Stone and forward the same to the USMS, along with copies of the completed summonses and complaint. The clerk shall refer this file to the undersigned if the waiver form is returned for insufficient address or for similar reason, if service on Defendant Robert Driggers or Defendant Officer Stone is returned unexecuted, or if the USMS has filed a statement of costs incurred for making personal service. Defendant Robert Driggers and Defendant Officer Stone shall have sixty (60) days after service in which to file a response to the complaint. (Forwarded as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK DEWITT KVERNE on behalf of BLOOM, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON (KVERNE, ERIK) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by CHARLIE NATTIEL to DESOTO CI, 13617 SE HIGHWAY 70, ARCADIA, FLORIDA 34266-7800 (tss) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION in Support Of Plaintiff's 34 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM Of Law in Support Of Plaintiff's 34 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION For Appointment of Counsel by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          FINANCIAL REFERRAL AND ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/5/2016. (atm) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ORDER granting 30 MOTION For Courtesy Copy of 26 ANSWER and Notice of Attorney Appearance. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/31/2015. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of Defendants Answers and Affirmative Defenses, ECF No. 26 . (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 16.00, receipt number DOC B122915 (kdm) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION For Courtesy Copy of 26 ANSWER and Notice of Attorney Appearance by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (New address: CHARLIE NATTIEL, 093914, DESOTO CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 13617 SE HIGHWAY 70, ARCADIA, FL 34266-7800.) (Address updated.) (kdm) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/15/2015. Discovery and Return file to Chambers due by 3/14/2016., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/4/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed. TOMLINSON served on 12/2/2015, answer due 2/2/2016. (kdm) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint, by BLOOM, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON. (GELLIS, SEAN) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          PARTIAL Filing fee - Balance paid in full: $ 335.33, receipt number 1-2717. (kdm) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Summons Reissued as to TOMLINSON. (kdm) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER OF SPECIAL APPOINTMENT; SERVICE OF PROCESS UPONDEFENDANT; AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF re 22 Department of Corrections' NOTICE To Court Regarding Service of Process For Defendants', re 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (If service is returned unexecuted, or if a return is not filed notify Chambers - by 12/15/2015., Notify Chambers on 2/23/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/25/2015. The Clerk shall print a service copy of the Complaint and prepare and issue the summons, indicating that Defendant Nurse Tomlinson has sixty (60) days following service in which to file a response to the Complaint, and shall refer the summons to the United States Marshal, along with the service copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the Magistrate Judge, with the case number written on it. (Mailed and forwarded as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Department of Corrections' NOTICE To Court Regarding Service of Process For Defendants' as to TOMLINSON re 20 Order. (kdm) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Summons Reissued as to ROBERT DRIGGERS, STONE, TOMLINSON. (kdm) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER re 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted. (General Counsel shall (1) inform the USMS office in Gainesville in confidence of the last known addresses of Defendants or (2) enter an appearance on behalf of Defendants; or (3) advise the Court that neither alternative is possible - by 11/29/2015). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/29/2015. The Clerk shall issue summonses for Defendant Officer Robert Driggers, Defendant Officer Stone, and Defendant Ms. Tomlinson, R.N., indicating that they have 60 days in which to file a response to the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall send the summons, copies of this order, and copies of the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11 ), to Alexandria Williams, Assistant General Counsel for the Department of Corrections, 501 S. Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ROBERT DRIGGERS, STONE, TOMLINSON. (kdm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed. GERALD MONTGOMERY served on 10/16/2015, answer due 12/16/2015. (kdm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed. MARTIN FRANKS served on 10/13/2015, answer due 12/13/2015. (kdm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed. LOTT served on 10/13/2015, answer due 12/13/2015. (kdm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed. BLOOM served on 10/21/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (kdm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE To Court (titled: Attn: Office of the Clerk) by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to BLOOM, ROBERT DRIGGERS, MARTIN FRANKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, STONE, TOMLINSON. (kdm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF SPECIAL APPOINTMENT; SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANTS; AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF re 11 Second Amended Complaint. ( Ifservice is returned unexecuted, or if a return is not filed - by 10/28/2015., Return file to Chambers on 1/7/2016). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/8/2015. The docket shall reflect that there are seven Defendants: Officer Robert Drigger, Sergeant Gerald Montgomery, Captain Lott, Ms. Tomlinson (R.N.), Officer Bloom, Officer Stone, and Officer Franks. The Clerk shall prepare and issue the summonses, indicating that Defendants have sixty (60) days following service in which to file a response to the Complaint, and shall refer the summons to the United States Marshal, along with the service copies of Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 13 ) and this Order. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the Magistrate Judge, with the case number written on it. (Forwarded and mailed as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT DRIGGERS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON, filed by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (No service copies received) (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Notice of Lawsuit and Request For Waiver of Service of Process, # 2 (Proposed) Waiver of Service of Process) (Parties will be updated only after the court has reviewed the amended complaint and specifically directed the Clerk to add the additional parties reflected in the amended complaint.) (kdm) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 14.67, receipt number 1-2669. (kdm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to CUSTODIAN OF INMATE ACCOUNTS, re 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments. (kdm) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of CHARLIE NATTIEL. Plaintiff's 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay $14.67 as initial partial filing fee, however, Plaintiff is assessed the total $350.00 filing fee. Clerk directed to send a copy of this Order by certified mail to: CUSTODIAN OF INMATE ACCOUNTS, DESOTO CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 13617 SOUTHEAST HIGHWAY 70, ARCADIA, FL 34266-7800. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis(Fee due by 10/5/2015.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/3/2015. (jws)(Order sent as directed.) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT DRIGGERS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON, filed by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (No service copies received.) (Parties will be updated only after the court has reviewed the amended complaint and specifically directed the Clerk to add the additional parties reflected in the amended complaint.) (kdm) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER 1 Complaint; denying 3 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel. (FIRST Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2015., Identical Service Copies due by 8/26/2015). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 7/27/2015. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form for prisoner litigants for actions arising under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and the forms necessary to seek leave to proceed as a pauper. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: CHARLIE NATTIEL, 093914, DESOTO CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 13617 SOUTHEAST HIGHWAY 70, ARCADIA, FL 34266-7800. (kdm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION For Appointment of Counsel by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (kdm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (Not on court forms) (kdm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against ROBERT DRIGGERS, MILTON HICKS, LOTT, GERALD MONTGOMERY, TOMLINSON, KIMBERLY WEEKS, filed by CHARLIE NATTIEL. (No service copies received, no fee paid, motion for IFP received.) (kdm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?