Maury v. Pfister
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00486

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 19, 2019 at 5:29 PM EDT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Attorney Representation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Opinion, the habeas petition 1 is denied and no certificate of appealability shall issue. A separate AO-450 judgment shall be entered. Status hearing of 12/15/2017 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Emailed and mailed notice(slb, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Seal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?