Courthouse News Service v. David Yamasaki

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:17-cv-00126
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 19, 2021 at 1:41 PM EST (3.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Courthouse News Service, Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Keating +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 katherine.keating@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Goli Mahdavi +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 goli.mahdavi@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 rachel.matteo-boehm@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo David Yamasaki, Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Naeve +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 rnaeve@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaclyn B Stahl +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 jstahl@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Ellsworth Stewart +1 415 626 3939 +1 415 875 5700 cestewart@jonesday.com
Other Parties
No Logo Family Violence Appellate Project, Movant

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary-Christine Sungaila +1 949 202 3000 mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
No Logo Legal Aid of Orange County, Movant

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary-Christine Sungaila +1 949 202 3000 mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
No Logo Orange County Bar Association, Movant

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary-Christine Sungaila +1 949 202 3000 mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
No Logo Public Law Center, Movant

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary-Christine Sungaila +1 949 202 3000 mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
No Logo Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Movant

Represented by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Townsend KatieLynn +1 202 795 9300 ktownsend@rcfp.org
No Logo Veterans Legal Institute, Movant

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary-Christine Sungaila +1 949 202 3000 mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (157) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/19/2021, Entered: None Dismissing Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/20/2021, Entered: None Dismiss Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Settlement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Reassignment of Case Upon Receipt of Mandate (A-4)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Reassignment of Case Upon Receipt of Mandate (A-4)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing with html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Exceed Page Limitation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Objection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Objection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None In Limine - Preclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing with html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Objection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Amicus Brief (Leave to File)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Amicus Brief (Leave to File)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56331 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 58 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (car) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 9/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief 56 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20451122.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 09/04/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request to Publish re: Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief 56 (Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford denying 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and granting 22 APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief. (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES (lb) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held: Discovery cut-off 3/1/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 at 8:30 am. Bench Trial set for 5/29/2018 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lb) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION to Continue OCSC's discovery responses due date from June 5, 2017 to July 10, 2017; CNS discovery responses due date from June 21, 2017 to July 26, 2017 from OCSC: June 5, 2017 ; CNS June 21, 2017 to OCSC: July 10, 2017; CNS: July 26, 2017 filed by Defendant David Yamasaki. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re STIPULATION STAYING PROCEEDINGS THROUGH JUNE 8, 2017 AND CONTINUING DISCOVERY RESPONSE DATES)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
[IN CHAMBERS]SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 5/22/2017 at 9:00 am is continued to 6/12/2017 at 9:00 am.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John W Amberg on behalf of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Attorney John W Amberg added to party Courthouse News Service(pty:pla))(Amberg, John) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan G Fetterly on behalf of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Attorney Jonathan G Fetterly added to party Courthouse News Service(pty:pla))(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Unavailability of Counsel filed by Defendant David Yamasaki. (Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 13 Other Media Organizations 41 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/15/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Brief in Response to March 22 Order filed by Defendant David Yamasaki. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Matson ISO Supplemental Brief)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief (Leave to File)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Withdrawal of Errata, 38 filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant David Yamasaki.(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES RE: Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11 held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Tentative Ruling provided. Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lwag) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nancy Burnett at nancy.burnett@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant David Yamasaki for Court Reporter. Court will contact Frances Pham at fpham@jonesday.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine A Keating on behalf of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Attorney Katherine A Keating added to party Courthouse News Service(pty:pla))(Keating, Katherine) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Objection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief (Leave to File)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. upon David Yamasaki waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/26/2017, answer due 3/27/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Jeff Wertheimer. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Granting Stipulation Continuing Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 15 . Deadline for filing opposition to motion for preliminary injunction February 20, 2017. Deadline for filing reply in support of motion for preliminary injunction March 6, 2017. Motion Hearing continued to 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mt) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction from February 27, 2017 to March 20, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion 11 filed by Defendant David Yamasaki. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. NAEVE IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)(Attorney Robert A Naeve added to party David Yamasaki(pty:dft))(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion 11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Prelininary Injunction (previously filed Proposed Order attached to Motion was incomplete) 13 , Request for Judicial Notice, 12 served on January 30, 2017. (Mahdavi, Golareh) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant David Yamasaki. (car) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Related Case(s): 2:11-CV-08083 SJO (FFMx); 9th Cir. Appeal Nos. 16-55977, 16-56714, 16-56862 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Related Case(s): 2:11-CV-08083 SJO (FFMx) (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, identifying William Girdner. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19244606 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Rachel E Matteo-Boehm added to party Courthouse News Service(pty:pla))(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 93 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?