Sunoco, Inc. v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 17-1402

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 2:57 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF FILED for Appellant Sunoco, Inc. [18]. Number of Pages: 48. Service: 03/23/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/31/2017. Appellee United States brief is due 05/02/2017. [418591]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    TENDERED from Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 03/23/2017 by email. [418582]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 03/22/2017 by email. [418163]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION of Appellant Sunoco, Inc. to extend the time to 03/23/2017 at 11:59 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/07/2017 by email. [405415]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Docketing Statement for the Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/19/2017 by email. [400524]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 01/13/2017 by email. [399148]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Entry of appearance for Judith A. Hagley as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 01/05/2017 by email. [396408]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Entry of appearance for Elana Nightingale Dawson as of counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email. [396290]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Entry of appearance for Benjamin W. Snyder as of counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email. [396287]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Entry of appearance for Gregory G. Garre as of counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email. [396284]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Entry of appearance for Eric M. Biscopink as of counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email. [396182]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Entry of appearance for Kathryn E. Rimpfel as of counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email. [396176]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Entry of appearance for Vivek A. Patel as of counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email. [396023]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Sunoco, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 01/04/2017 by email, US mail. [396008]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email, US mail. [396007]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Entry of appearance for George M. Clarke, III as principal counsel for Appellant Sunoco, Inc.. Service: 01/04/2017 by email, US mail. [396005]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Appeal docketed. Received: 12/22/2016. [393792]Entry of Appearance due 01/05/2017. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/05/2017. Docketing Statement due 01/23/2017. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 02/21/2017.
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?