USA v. RODRIGUEZ-RIOS
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cr-00163
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 28, 2017 at 12:36 AM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Carmen D. Hernandez +1 240 472 3391 +1 202 628 2881 chernan7@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 550

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment David Walker Bos +1 202 208 7500 +1 202 208 7515 david_bos@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Gov Mot in Limine to Admit Co-Conspirator Statements and Foreign Language Transcripts by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE Expert Notice of Forensic Analyst Nicole Beiter by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of Nicole Beiter, # 2 Exhibit Forensic Analysis)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE Expert Notice of DEA Forensic Chemist Lauren Munoz by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of DEA Forensic Chemist Lauren Munoz, # 2 Exhibit Lab Report)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE Gov Notice Regarding Prior Conviction Evidence Under Rule 609 by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING the Government's 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Notices. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/27/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE by JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS re 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Expert Notices (Hernandez, Carmen) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              First MOTION in Limine to Admit Other Crimes Evidence by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cohen, Emily) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Expert Notices by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE Expert Notice of Ion Scan Expert Noel Moloney by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of Noel Moloney, # 2 Exhibit Ion Scan, Jan. 30, 2014, # 3 Exhibit Ion Scan, Feb. 18, 2014, # 4 Exhibit Ion Scan, July 9, 2014, # 5 Exhibit Ion Scan, July 28, 2014)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE Expert Notice of Forensic Chemist Maureen Craig by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of Maureen Craig, # 2 Exhibit Lab Report 1, # 3 Exhibit Lab Report 2, # 4 Exhibit Lab Report 3)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE Expert Notice of Lt. Frank DiGregorio by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of Frank DiGregorio)(Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS: Regarding the procedures to obtain interim payments during the course of representation in this matter. Signed by District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly and Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh on 3/3/17. (dot) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE Gov Notice of Volume of Transcripts by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion for Approval of Case-Related Travel Expenses. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/2/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Approval of Travel Expenses by JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Carmen) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Approval of Interim Compensation by JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Carmen) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion to Unseal Transcript of Status Hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/1/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER DENYING Defendant's 21 Motion to Modify. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/27/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to Unseal Transcript of February 22, 2017 by JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Carmen) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Modify ORDER REGARDING PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION by JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Carmen) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER that the Rappahannock Regional Jail conduct, FORTHWITH, a blood test for a toxicology screening as to the presence of any drugs, prescribed or otherwise, in Defendant's system. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order overnight to Rappahannock Regional Jail, Attn: Medical Staff, 1745 Jefferson Davis Hwy, Stafford, Virginia, 22554. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/22/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/22/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER committing Defendant Julian Rodriguez-Rios for thirty days to the custody of the Attorney General who is ordered to FORTHWITH transport Mr. Rodriguez-Rios to a suitable facility at which Mr. Rodriguez-Rios' psychological state can be fully evaluated. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/22/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule by USA as to JULIAN RODRIGUEZ-RIOS (Sola, Stephen) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Regarding Pre-Trial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/23/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Emily Rachel Cohen appearing for USA. (Cohen, Emily) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Space Space

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?