WEBSTER v. CREWS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00114
District Judge Robert L. Hinkle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 2:45 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREDERICK WEBSTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDERICK WEBSTER
v.
No Logo C BROWN, Defendant
No Logo DOE, Defendant
No Logo EVAN BROWN, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL D CREWS, Defendant
No Logo NAN JEFFCOAT, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER of USCA as to 12 Notice of Appeal. USCA # 14-12605-D (tdl) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MANDATE of USCA - The enclosed copy of this Court's Order of Dismissal is issued as the mandate of this court as to 12 Notice of Appeal. USCA # 14-12605-D. (tdl) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 12 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 14-12605-D. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (tdl) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        USCA Case Number 14-12605-D for 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (tdl) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER DENYING 15 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/16/2014. (tdl) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by FREDERICK WEBSTER. (tdl) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 12 Notice of Appeal. (tdl) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Appeal Instructions re: 12 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. (tdl) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 10 Order & 11 Clerk's Judgment. Electronic Availability of ROA due by 7/21/2014. (tdl) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CLERK'S JUDGMENT, entered pursuant to 10 Order. (tdl) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The 8 report and recommendation is ACCEPTED and adopted as the court's opinion. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)." The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/31/2014. (tdl) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        OBJECTION to 8 Report and Recommendations by FREDERICK WEBSTER. (tdl) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's amended complaint, doc. 7 , be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2), and that the order adopting this report and recommendation direct the Clerk of Court to note on the docket that this cause was dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and that Plaintiff has now accumulated three strikes under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 5/6/2014. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/3/2014.) (tdl) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against C BROWN, EVAN BROWN, MICHAEL D CREWS, DOE, NAN JEFFCOAT, filed by FREDERICK WEBSTER. (tdl)**No Service Copies (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to forward to Plaintiff a § 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as explained above. (Amended Complaint due by 4/28/2014.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/27/2014.**Complaint forwarded as Instructed (tdl) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                INITIAL PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 12.93, receipt number 4-21678 (tdl) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee. The clerk of court shall assess Plaintiff $12.93 based on his monthly deposits for the preceding six months and as provided in Title 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1)(A). The clerk of court shall MAIL a copy of this Order, with the appropriate cover letter, to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. (Fee due by 4/5/2014.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/5/2014. (tdl)**DOCUMENTS MAILED AS INSTRUCTED** (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice to Pro Se (tdl) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FREDERICK WEBSTER. (tdl) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT against MICHAEL D CREWS, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by FREDERICK WEBSTER. (tdl) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?