Lennon Image Technologies LLC v. Mary Kay Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00551
District Judge Ed Kinkeade, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 4:16 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Niknaz Bukovcan +1 214 466 1278 +1 214 635 1831 niky.bukovcan@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Brian Andrew Carpenter +1 214 466 1273 +1 214 635 1829 brian.carpenter@BJCIPlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com
Mary Kay, Inc. Mary Kay, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Richard Gregory Frenkel +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 rick.frenkel@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Lisa K Nguyen +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 lisa.nguyen@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John T. Cox, III +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 tcox@lynnllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Christopher John Schwegmann +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 cschwegmann@lynnllp.com
v.
Mary Kay, Inc. Mary Kay, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Richard Gregory Frenkel +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 rick.frenkel@lw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Lisa K Nguyen +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 lisa.nguyen@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John T. Cox, III +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 tcox@lynnllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Christopher John Schwegmann +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 cschwegmann@lynnllp.com
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Niknaz Bukovcan +1 214 466 1278 +1 214 635 1831 niky.bukovcan@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Brian Andrew Carpenter +1 214 466 1273 +1 214 635 1829 brian.carpenter@BJCIPlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REEXAMINATION filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Mary Kay Inc. (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Order Granting Motion to Stay. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Order) (jrr) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 19 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination. This case is stayed pending further order of the Court. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report with the Court on or before 1/7/2016, or within twenty-one (21) days of final resolution of the ex parte re-examination, whichever is earlier. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/30/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed on June 15, 2015. The Court does not schedule cases or set deadlines pendant upon future dates such as the date of the Court's claim construction ruling or other future events of an uncertain time frame. Therefore, the Parties shall file an Amended Joint Report containing all proposed deadlines as a date certain. The proposed deadlines that need to be submitted are any deadlines in the current Joint Report that are pendant on the Court's claim construction ruling. The parties must confer and submit their Amended Joint Report including a date certain for each of these deadlines within 10 days after the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/17/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Mary Kay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Kay Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Mary Kay Holding Corporation for Mary Kay Inc, Mary Kay Inc. (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appendix in Support filed by Mary Kay Inc re 29 Reply in Support of Motion to Stay (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY filed by Mary Kay Inc re: 19 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Service of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC re: 19 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Proposed Order) (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Related document: 17 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Responses due by 5/28/2015. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/19/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 19 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER IN PATENT CASES: The Joint Report shall be filed no later than 25 days from the date of the scheduling conference, shall include the following in separate numbered paragraphs, but not in the format of a proposed order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/30/2015) (ran) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Appendix in Support filed by Mary Kay Inc re 19 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) App 1-66, # 2 Additional Page(s) App 67-70, # 3 Additional Page(s) App 71-89) (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Mary Kay Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Kay Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Mary Kay Holding Corporation for Mary Kay Inc, Mary Kay Inc. (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mary Kay Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies LLC filed by Mary Kay Inc (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Nguyen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/26/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard G. Fenkel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/26/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lisa Ngyuen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6687724) filed by Mary Kay Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Proposed Order) (Cox, John) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard G. Fenkel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6687708) filed by Mary Kay Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Proposed Order) (Cox, John) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Mary Kay Inc answer or response due 4/30/2015. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/17/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mary Kay Inc (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mary Kay Inc; served on 3/2/2015. (tln) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Summons Issued as to Mary Kay Inc. (tln) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (tln) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Boyle. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric W Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Mary Kay Inc. filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6605142) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - 6,624,843 Patent, # 2 Cover Sheet) (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?