Industrial Print Technologies LLC v. O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01104
District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 2:37 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Industrial Print Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitch Even Tabin & Flannery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Nicole L. Little +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 nlittle@fitcheven.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Alison Aubry Richards +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 arichards@fitcheven.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Steven C. Schroer +1 303 402 6966 +1 303 402 6970 Scschr@fitcheven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 02/10/2016, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted David A Gosse +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 dgosse@fitcheven.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Timothy Paul Maloney +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 tim@fitcheven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016, Bar Status: Not Admitted Jared E Hedman +1 630 756 3100 +1 630 756 3101 jhedman@irwinip.com
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing M. Brett Johnson +1 214 747 5070 johnson@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Audrey L Maness +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511 audrey.maness@weil.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Andrew Louis Perito +1 650 802 3993 +1 650 802 3100 andrew.perito@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo O'Neil Data Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Audrey L Maness +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511 audrey.maness@weil.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Andrew Louis Perito +1 650 802 3993 +1 650 802 3100 andrew.perito@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo Industrial Print Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitch Even Tabin & Flannery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Nicole L. Little +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 nlittle@fitcheven.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Alison Aubry Richards +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 arichards@fitcheven.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Steven C. Schroer +1 303 402 6966 +1 303 402 6970 Scschr@fitcheven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 02/10/2016, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Timothy Paul Maloney +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 tim@fitcheven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016, Bar Status: Not Admitted Jared E Hedman +1 630 756 3100 +1 630 756 3101 jhedman@irwinip.com
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Respondent
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing M. Brett Johnson +1 214 747 5070 johnson@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Michael Robert Rueckheim - PHV +1 713 654 5343 +1 713 652 0109 mhr@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Audrey L Maness +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511 audrey.maness@weil.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Andrew Louis Perito +1 650 802 3993 +1 650 802 3100 andrew.perito@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo O'Neil Data Systems, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Michael Robert Rueckheim - PHV +1 713 654 5343 +1 713 652 0109 mhr@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Audrey L Maness +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511 audrey.maness@weil.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2015, Bar Status: Not Admitted Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Andrew Louis Perito +1 650 802 3993 +1 650 802 3100 andrew.perito@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo Special Master, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the details of Mr. Woloson's time incurred for his services and related expenses through 2/18/2016. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS payment to be promptly made to Mr. Woloson as follows: Plaintiff: $33,806.24 Defendants: $33,806.24. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/24/2016) (bdb) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/12/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is ORDERED that S. Brannon Latimer is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Industrial Print Technologies LLC in Civil Action Nos. 3:15-cv-00165 and 3:15-cv-01104. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/10/2016) (sss) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney S. Brannon Latimer filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC's 30 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel: It is ORDERED that Jared E. Hedman be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/8/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Rueckheim on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Memorandum Opinion and Order denying (64 in 3:15-cv-00165-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett Packard Company, Cenveo Inc, (155 in 3:15-cv-01100-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Quad/Graphics, Inc., Hewlett Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems Inc, (73 in 3:15-cv-01101-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems Inc, (50 in 3:15-cv-01103-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Quad/Graphics Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, (51 in 3:15-cv-01104-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, (53 in 3:15-cv-01106-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Vistaprint USA Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, (68 in 3:15-cv-01195-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Fort Dearborn Company, Hewlett-Packard Company. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/7/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Brett Johnson on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, M) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint STATUS REPORT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    AGREED JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/28/2015) (axm) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER. In light of the parties' Stipulations, the Court ORDERS the following deadlines: Parties exchange citations to intrinsic and documentary extrinsic evidence, and identify claim terms for which they expect to offer expert opinions due by August 25. Meet and confer regarding Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement submission on or before August 26-28. Parties submit final Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement to Court due by August 31. Parties exchange expert reports on claim construction due by September 8. No additional expert reports on claim construction will be permitted. All other deadlines set forth in the Court's Preliminary Patent Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/27/2015) (axm) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Agreed STIPULATION Regarding Claim Construction Schedule by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Gosse, David) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Sur-reply filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC re: 51 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER GRANTING IPT'S 57 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLEADINGS TO ADD ACACIA RESEARCH GROUP, LLC AS A COUNTER-DEFENDANT: IPT may file its Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant, in the form attached to its Motion. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/20/2015) (bdb) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING 55 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS TO ADD ACACIA RESEARCH GROUP, LLC AS A COUNTER-DEFENDANT: Defendants may file under seal their Reply In Support of Their Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/20/2015) (bdb) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File IPT's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add ARG As a Counterclaim Defendant filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 IPT's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add ARG As a Counterclaim Defendant) (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    (Document Restricted) CORRECTED SEALED Reply in support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend [55-2] (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Perito, Andrew) Removed gavel per DJ chambers on 8/20/2015 (bdb). (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      (Document Restricted) SEALED Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in support of Motion for Leave to Amend (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order SEALED Proposed Order Re Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 SEALED Reply in support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend, # 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. R) (Perito, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2015. The Court held a telephone conference to discuss Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in 3:15cv1101, Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings, and scheduling matters. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Alison Richards, Nicole Little, Tim Maloney, Steven Schroer; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness, Andrew Perito. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (axm) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          (Document Restricted) Sealed Opposition to 51 Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (axm) Modified filed date on 8/6/2015 (axm). (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/4/2015) (axm) Modified filed date on 8/6/2015 (axm). (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (aaa) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                (Document Restricted) IPT's Opposed Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - IPT's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant, # 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Sonal N. Mehta is hereby removed as an attorney of record in this matter. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/25/2015) (aaa) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sonal N. Mehta filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      PRELIMINARY PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/27/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2015. Claim construction discovery due by 9/30/2015. Markman Hearing set for 11/14/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/22/2015) (twd) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: Before the Court is the Notice of Agreement for Technical Advisor and for Agreed Tasks and Activities to be Performed by the Technical Advisor, jointly filed by the Parties. Having reviewed the parties' recommendation for a technical advisor, the Court hereby appoints Scott Woloson as technical advisor to the Court, with his fees and costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendant, and to be timely paid as billed, at the rate of $340 per hour. The parties are ordered to send courtesy copies of claim construction briefs, exhibits, and technology tutorials no later than one business day after their filing: (1) in PDF form to scott@scottwolosonlaw.com; and (2) in paper form, double-sided, in a 3-ring binder, with tabbed exhibits to the Law Office of Scott Woloson, P.C., 1431 Wirt Road #141, Houston, TX 77055. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/13/2015) (bdb) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Agreement for Technical Advisor and For Agreed Tasks and Activities to be Performed by the Technical Advisor filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Amend. Defendant may file under seal their Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings, as well as the Amended Answers and Counterclaims and excerpts from the 12/11/2015 Deposition Transcript of Cristin Wagner, which are attached as exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings. The foregoing documents will be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/8/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: The Court Orders that the parties' respective Amended Infringement and Amended Invalidity Contentions are deemed served as of May 11 and June 12, 2015, respectively. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/7/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Amend (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit(s) SEALED Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant, # 3 Exhibit(s) A (Sealed), # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D, # 7 Exhibit(s) E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F, # 9 Exhibit(s) G, # 10 Exhibit(s) H, # 11 Exhibit(s) I, # 12 Exhibit(s) J, # 13 Exhibit(s) K, # 14 Exhibit(s) L, # 15 Exhibit(s) M, # 16 Exhibit(s) N, # 17 Exhibit(s) O, # 18 Exhibit(s) P, # 19 Exhibit(s) Q, # 20 Proposed Order on SEALED Motion for Leave to Amend) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Joint STIPULATION Regarding Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by Hewlett-Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    AGREED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY: This order supplements all other discovery rules and orders. It streamlines Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") production to promote a "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of this action, as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/30/2015) (axm) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Status Conference held on 6/22/2015. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Tim Maloney, Nicole Little, Tom Cecil; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (axm) Modified time in court on 6/25/2015 (axm). (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Perito on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Perito, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Redline of Previously-Agreed PO) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: In light of the parties' Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that Defendants Cenveo, Inc., Fort Dearborn Co., Quad/Graphics, Inc., Vistaprint U.S.A., Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company have until 6/12/2015 to serve Initial Invalidity Contentions in Case No. 3:15-cv-00165-M, Case No. 3:15-cv- 01106-M, and Case No. 3:15-cv-01195-M; and Defendants O'Neil Data Systems, Inc., Quad/Graphics, Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company have until 6/12/2015, to provide IPT with proposed Amended Invalidity Contentions in Case No. 3:15-cv- 01100-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01101-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01103-M, and Case No. 3:15-cv-01104-M. The parties are ORDERED to thereafter meet and confer regarding their respective proposed amendments prior to presenting the Court with any motions for leave to amend. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/2/2015) (twd) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Joint STIPULATION Regarding Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Motion is GRANTED, and Evan N. Budaj is hereby removed as an attorney of record in this matter. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Mr. Budajs name from the list of persons authorized to receive notices of electronic filings. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/15/2015) (aaa) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Evan N. Budaj filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 28 Defendants' MOTION to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/12/2015) (jrr) (Main Document 32 replaced to correct format on 5/12/2015) (ali). (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. re: 28 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 29 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Replies due by 5/8/15. Responses due by 5/6/15. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/1/2015) NOTE: Originally entered in Master Case 3:15-md-2614 (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' 28 Motion to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference filed by Edward Reines with Brief/Memorandum in Support. NOTE: Originally filed in Master Case 3:15-md-2614 (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Defendants' MOTION to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference[Opposed] with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s)) NOTE: Originally filed in Master case 3:15-md-2614 (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: 26 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: Motion to Stay, 3:15-MD-2614-M, Dkt. No. 005 (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven C Schroer on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schroer, Steven) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy P Maloney on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared E Hedman on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hedman, Jared) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Gosse on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Gosse, David) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole L Little on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison Aubry Richards on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER regarding pretrial proceedings in MDL Master Docket 3:15-md-2614 and individual cases. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2015 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. A default agenda routinely used in patent cases before Judge Lynn is included as Exhibit A. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/27/2015) (gmg) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (bdb) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:15-cv-00020. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MDL TRANSFER ORDER; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of Texas are transferred to the Northern District of Texas and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Barbara M.G. Lynn for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the action pending there. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that transfer of the actions listed on Schedule B is denied. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair on 4/7/15. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/13/2015. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Audrey L Maness on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Maness, Audrey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan N Budaj on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Budaj, Evan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sonal N Mehta on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Company for Hewlett-Packard Company. (Reines, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Industrial Print Technologies LLC by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Reines, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Data Analysis, Inc. for O'Neil Data Systems, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Industrial Print Technologies LLC by O'Neil Data Systems, Inc..(Reines, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. (Reines, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Entry of Agreed Consolidated Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. of Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation Re Motion to Transfer and Supporting Documents (Reines, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Hewlett-Packard Company, (Attachments: # 1 O'Neil Data Systems Inc)(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Paul Maloney on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Hewlett-Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5003755.), filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Maloney, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 4/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?