Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. 310 South Bar & Grill Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00014

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 6:57 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2018. (jak)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: Unless a party requests some relief before 8/6/2018, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2018. (jak)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 18 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?