Wagner v. Berryhill
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00036

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 1:32 AM EST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's 16 Order dated 3/16/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 3/16/2018. (maf)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; the Defendant's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED; and this case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/16/2018. (maf)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Administrative Record - Social Security Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?