Jackson v. Edwards
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00126

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 12:28 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/12/2017. Case DISMISSED for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Entries of default as to defendants Crawford, Edwards, Storms, Nichols, Winters VACATED. 14 Defendant Barnes' MOTION for extension of time to file answer DENIED AS MOOT. 22 Defendant Barnes' MOTION to dismiss DENIED AS MOOT. 17 Plaintiff's MOTION to strike defendant Edwards' consent/refusal DENIED AS MOOT. 18 Plaintiff's MOTION to enlarge time to serve defendants DENIED AS MOOT. 25 Plaintiff's MOTION to strike defendant Barnes' motion to dismiss DENIED AS MOOT. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Jeanine Jackson)(cb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Service by Publication
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Service by Publication
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Strike
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Enlarge
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Refusal to Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Disclosure Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Refusal to Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Complaint - Pro Se
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?