District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Washington Western District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

State of Washington v. Trump.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00141-JLR
District Judge James L. Robart, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 12, 2018 at 8:59 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse M. Boodoo +1 617 963 2592 jesse.boodoo@state.ma.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth N. Dewar +1 617 963 2204 bessie.dewar@state.ma.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Genevieve Clair Nadeau genevieve.nadeau@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M Melody +1 206 464 7744 colleenm1@atg.wa.gov
No Logo Jewish Federation Of Greater Seattle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Phineas Bergman +1 206 957 9510 matt@bergmanlegal.com
No Logo State of California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the California Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra Robert Gordon +1 415 703 5509 +1 415 703 1234 alexandra.robertgordon@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M Melody +1 206 464 7744 colleenm1@atg.wa.gov
No Logo State of Maryland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Sullivan +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6955 ssullivan@oag.state.md.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M Melody +1 206 464 7744 colleenm1@atg.wa.gov
No Logo State of Minnesota, Plaintiff
No Logo State of New York, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40111-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha J. Chien +1 206 464 7744 marshac@atg.wa.gov
Space Robert W. Ferguson +1 206 464 7744 +1 206 646 6451 chamenew@atg.wa.gov
Space Patricio A. Marquez +1 206 442 4495 PatricioM@atg.wa.gov
Space Colleen M Melody +1 206 464 7744 colleenm1@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Washington Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Elizabeth Egeler +1 360 753 7085 annee1@atg.wa.gov
Space Noah Guzzo Purcell +1 360 664 0869 noahp@atg.wa.gov
v.
No Logo Donald J. Drumpf, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as President of the United States Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as President of the United States Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as President of the United States Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as President of the United States John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo John F. Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
Tillerson, Rex W. Tillerson, Rex W., Defendant
Officially listed as "Rex Tillerson"
ExxonMobil Corporation Officer/Director, ExxonMobil Corporation
No Logo Tom Shannon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of State
TERMINATED: 03/16/2017 Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of State Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of State Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of State
TERMINATED: 03/16/2017 Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of State
TERMINATED: 03/16/2017 John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of State John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
Space Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
Space Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
Space Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
Space Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Amicus
No Logo American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU), Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily Chiang +1 206 624 2184 echiang@aclu-wa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacifica Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kymberly K. Evanson +1 206 245 1725 kymberly.evanson@pacificalawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Lawrence +1 206 245 1700 paul.lawrence@pacificalawgroup.com
No Logo Americans United For Church and State, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Girard +1 202 466 3234 girard@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B. Katskee +1 202 466 3234 katskee@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Nellis +1 202 466 3234 nellis@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly M Percival +1 202 466 3234 percival@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Rothschild +1 202 466 3234 rothschild@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin W Silverman +1 206 407 2214 kristins@calfoeakes.com
No Logo Americans United For Separation of Church and State, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Girard +1 202 466 3234 girard@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B. Katskee +1 202 466 3234 katskee@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Nellis +1 202 466 3234 nellis@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly M Percival +1 202 466 3234 percival@au.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Rothschild +1 202 466 3234 rothschild@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin W Silverman +1 206 407 2214 kristins@calfoeakes.com
City of Chicago City of Chicago, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
City of Chicago Department of Law, Appeals Division
30 N. LaSalle Street
Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60602
312-744-7764 Benna Ruth Solomon +1 312 744 7764 benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Seattle City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
City of Chicago Department of Law, Appeals Division
30 N. LaSalle Street
Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60602
312-744-7764 Carlton Wm Seu +1 206 733 9390 carlton.seu@seattle.gov
No Logo Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Seattle University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Seungchul Chang +1 206 398 4025 +1 206 398 4261 changro@seattleu.edu
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa R Lee +1 206 464 0838 leeme@seattleu.edu
No Logo Harry E. Ries, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Harry E. Ries

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry E. Ries
No Logo International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle L. Maley +1 206 459 3308 MMaley@perkinscoie.com
Space Joseph Michael McMillan +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 JMcMillan@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael McMillan +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 JMcMillan@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandra Day O' Connor College Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron X. Fellmeth +1 480 727 8575 aaron.fellmeth@asu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Seton Hall University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Hafetz +1 917 355 6896 jonathan.hafetz@shu.edu
No Logo Law Professors, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany Scott Connors +1 206 223 7267 +1 206 223 7107 connorst@lanepowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Loebs Davis +1 206 223 7060 +1 206 223 7107 davisc@lanepowell.com
Todd Aagaard, Robin Kundis Craig, Lincoln L. Davies, Noah Hall, F. Andrew Hessick, Zygmunt J. B. Plater, Alexander T. Skibine, Lisa Grow Sun, Joseh P. Tomain, Amy J. Wildermuth Jessica Norelle Walder walderj@lanepowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Norelle Walder walderj@lanepowell.com
New York University New York University, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Sieh Smith & Goodfriend

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M Goodfriend +1 206 624 0974 howard@washingtonappeals.com

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel And Secretary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrance J. Nolan +1 212 998 2257 +1 212 995 3048 terrance.nolan@nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard M Goodfriend

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Wright Smith +1 206 624 0974 +1 206 624 0809 cate@washingtonappeals.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven E. Obus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E. Obus +1 212 969 3525 +1 212 969 2900 sobus@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth D. Fiur +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sfiur@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany M. Woo +1 212 969 3223 +1 212 969 2900 twoo@proskauer.com
No Logo Northern Cheyenne Nation, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by SILVER CLOUD MUSAFIR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Northern Cheyenne Nation
No Logo Sec Am Tek Tek Tribe, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by SILVER CLOUD MUSAFUR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sec Am Tek Tek Tribe
No Logo Service Employees International Union, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Volk +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 7292 andrew@hbsslaw.com
No Logo Victor Williams, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Victor Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor Williams +1 301 951 9045
No Logo Washington State Labor Council, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHWERIN CAMPBELL BARNARD IGLITZIN & LAVITT LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Phair Barnard +1 206 285 2828 +1378413 +13 378 4132 barnard@workerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dmitri Iglitzin +1 206 285 2828 +1378413 +13 378 4132 Iglitzin@workerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Robbins +1 206 285 2828 +1 206 378 4132 robbins@workerlaw.com
Space Jennifer Robbins +1 206 285 2828 +1 206 378 4132 robbins@workerlaw.com
No Logo Washitaw Nation, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by SILVER CLOUD MUSAFUR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Washitaw Nation
No Logo Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by SILVER CLOUD MUSAFUR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation
No Logo Ann Dawson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ann Dawson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Dawson
No Logo David A Golden, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by David A Golden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Golden
No Logo Kareem Salessi, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by DISCLOSURE REALTY COMPANY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kareem Salessi +1 949 783 0165
No Logo Lamar C Chapman, III, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lamar C Chapman, III +1 814 472 4140
No Logo Rick Satcher, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rick Satcher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rick Satcher
No Logo James J O'Hagan, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by James J O'Hagan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J O'Hagan +1 360 267 7911
No Logo Mikki the Mime, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by P01102062

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mikki the Mime
No Logo Mikki the Mine, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by P01102062

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mikki the Mine
No Logo State Of Oregon, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott J Kaplan +1 971 673 1880 scott.kaplan@doj.state.or.us
Office Seattle
Filed 1/30/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County King
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (221) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 215 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Arjun Garg for Defendants Elaine C. Duke, John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
    LREF
    Legal Document 214 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying non-party Rick Satcher's 212 Motion for Reconsideration of the court's order denying him both intervention as of right and permissive intervention in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Rick Satcher via first class mail (Entered: 02/26/2018)
      LREF
      Legal Document 213 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Not at this address) re: Motion for Leave to Intervene and copy of 174 Order Denying Motions to Intervene addressed to Rick Satcher. Clerk's note: Mr. Satcher is at Lewis County Jail. Clerk updated address on docket. (PM) Modified on 2/26/2018: documents re-mailed to Mr. Satcher at Lewis County Jail (PM). (Entered: 02/26/2018)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Movant Rick Satcher. Noted by Clerk for 2/16/2018. Clerk's note: Address updated to address on envelope although it appears as though Mr. Satcher is in Lewis County Jail. (PM) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 211 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Appeal Remark
          Appeal Remark (17-35105) re 53 Notice of Appeal, Notice from Supreme Court of the United States (17-5424) The Court today entered the following order in the above entitled case: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SG) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Stricken Hearing
            NOTICE of Stricken TRO Motion hearing set for 10/30/2017. (AD) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 209 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER Staying Decision of Plaintiffs' 195 Third Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; The court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove the motion from its calendar, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                LREF
                Legal Document 208 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 207 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' deadline to respond to the Third Amended Complaint until 14 days after the Court enters an order resolving both Plaintiffs' TRO motion and any subsequent preliminary injunction motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 206 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Third Amended Complaint by parties (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 205 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE, by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, to 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER re 203 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert A Scott for Plaintiff State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 203 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert A. Scott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5059914 (Chien, Marsha) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Lodging Additional Declarations re 198 Amended Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Updated Imdex of Declarations in Support of Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Decl of Negin Ingbrigtsen, # 3 2nd Decl of Sadaf Amin, # 4 Decl of Janet Billups, # 5 Decl of Janet Camp, # 6 Decl of Susan Capalbo, # 7 2nd Decl of Margaret Everett, # 8 Decl of Anke Schennink, # 9 2nd Decl of Lovely A. Warren, # 10 Decl of Wim Wiewel, # 11 Decl of Lydia Wood, # 12 Decl of Joseph E. Fahey, # 13 2nd Decl of Aaron O. Lavine, # 14 2nd Decl of Eric Scherzer, # 15 3rd Decl of Eric Scherzer)(Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the TRO hearing on 10/30/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (AD) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 200 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE re 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Plaintiffs State of California, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Massachusetts, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Washington. (Chien, Marsha) Modified on 10/17/2017: edited text to correct filer's name per phone call from counsel (PM). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 198 Amended Complaint, filed on 10/16/2017 was improperly signed by Robert A. Scott, Meghan K. Casey, and Anisha Dasgupta. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." cc to counsel via ad hoc e-mail(KB) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 198 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State of Washington, State of California, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of New York, State of Oregon.(Chien, Marsha) Modified docket text to include all filers' names on 10/16/2017 (SWT). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 197 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 193 Motion to Lift the Stay; granting the States' 194 Motion to amend the complaint. The court orders the States to file their proposed third amended complaint within 5 days of this order. The court schedules a hearing on Monday, October 30, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. PDT before Judge James L. Robart on the States' 195 Motion for Temporary Restraining. Briefing schedule for the States' motion for TRO is as follows: Defendants' response due 10/23/2017, at 12:00 noon PDT; States' reply due 10/26/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 196 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 195 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2017, (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 194 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint 3rd Amended, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Index of Declarations, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Decl of Joint Former National Security Officials, # 19 Decl of Nima Ala, # 20 2nd Decl of Rabyaah Althaibani, # 21 Decl of Alireza Ayoubi, # 22 Decl of Shervin Beygi, # 23 Decl of Bahareh Bina, # 24 Decl of Ethan Devenport, # 25 Decl of Yasaman Esmaili, # 26 Decl of Mahdi Hajiaghayi, # 27 Decl of Mojdeh Jalali Heravi, # 28 Decl of Vahid Jazayeri, # 29 Decl of Mohammad Shafiei Khadem, # 30 Decl of Ahmad Moghaddam, # 31 Decl of Younes Nouri, # 32 Decl of Proshat Parsimoghadam, # 33 Decl of Emad Soroush, # 34 Decl of Tannaz Sattari Tabrizi, # 35 Decl of Seyed Danial Vaezi, # 36 Decl of Banafsheh Samareh Abolhasani, # 37 Decl of Armin Alaghi, # 38 Decl of Pegah Jalali Asheghabadi, # 39 3rd Decl of Rovy Branon, # 40 5th Decl of Asif Chaudhry, # 41 Decl of Maryam Dadkhahan, # 42 Decl of Jason Detwiler, # 43 2nd Decl of David Eaton, # 44 Decl of Kiana Ehsani, # 45 Decl of Ali Farhadi, # 46 Decl of Hoda Farhadi, # 47 Decl of Maryam Fayazi, # 48 Decl of Mohammad Ghaedi, # 49 Decl of Anne Greenbaum, # 50 Decl of Hannaneh Hajishirzi, # 51 2nd Decl of Deirdre Heatwole, # 52 Decl of Parisa Hosseinzadeh, # 53 Decl of Adam Mokhalalati, # 54 Decl of Shima Nofallah, # 55 4th Decl of Jeffrey Riedinger, # 56 Decl of Solmaz Shakerifard, # 57 Decl of Khadijeh Sheikhan, # 58 Decl of Ali Shojaie, # 59 Decl of Hema Yoganarasimhan, # 60 2nd Decl of Kathy Oline, # 61 2nd Decl of Dave Soike, # 62 2nd Decl of Rita Zawaideh, # 63 2nd Decl of Mitra Akhtari, # 64 2nd Decl of Melanie de Leon, # 65 Decl of Payam Fotouhiyehpour, # 66 2nd Decl of Marc Overbeck, # 67 2nd Decl of Sana Parsian, # 68 Decl of Sahar Z. Zangenah, # 69 2nd Decl of Dennis Galvan, # 70 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2017, (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2017, (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 192 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington.(Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 191 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline to file the Joint Status Report on the continued stay in this case. Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 190 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Submitting Joint Status Report by parties (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 189 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting Defendants' 175 Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump. Should circumstances change such that lifting the stay is warranted, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying Movant Lamar C. Chapman, III's 185 Motion for leave to appear as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Chapman via the USPS (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 187 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge James L Robart denying Movant Kareem Salessi's 186 Motion for Reconsideration. (PM) cc: Salessi via the USPS (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Movant Kareem Salessi. (SWT) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae, filed by Movant Lamar C Chapman, III. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Notice of correspondence from USDC Eastern District of WA) Noted by Clerk for 5/12/2017. (PM) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 175 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 176 Motion for an extension of time to file a response to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint. Defendants response to the second amended complaint is now due seven (7) days after the court's disposition of Defendants' pending motion to stay the entire case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER denying pro se movant Silver Cloud Musafir's 181 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Musafir via the USPS (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Order Striking Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Silver Cloud Musafir on behalf of Amicus Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation. (SWT) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon, to 175 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump. (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 179 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon, to 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 177 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 176 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/7/2017, (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 175 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Bennett Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/14/2017, (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO INTERVENE by David A. Golden 121 , Kareem Salessi, Ann Dawson 167 and Rick Satcher 173 . Further, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by any of these pro se litigants on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Golden, Salessi, Dawson, Satcher via the U.S. Mail (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant Rick Satcher. Noted by Clerk for 4/14/2017.(SWT) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 172 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. The judgment of this Court, entered March 08, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41 (a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. DISMISSED. (SG) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ORDER re 169 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jesse M. Boodoo for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ORDER re 168 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Genevieve Nadeau for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jesse M. Boodoo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4817286 (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Genevieve C. Nadeau FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4817269 (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant Ann Dawson (filing pro se). Noted by Clerk for 4/7/2017. (Filed as a motion per direction of chambers) (PM) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene (Request for Judicial Notice of Facts and Documents), filed by Movant Kareem Salessi (filing pro se) Noted for 3/31/2017, per direction of chambers. (PM) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER of USCA (17-35106) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER staying the court's determination of Plaintiffs' 148 Motion for TRO. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove this motion from its calendar. Should circumstances change such that lifting the stay is warranted, either party may move to lift the stay. If the stay is lifted, the court will then rule on Plaintiffs' TRO motion, if appropriate, as soon as practicable. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying Plaintiff State of Washington's 119 emergency motion to enforce the court's preliminary injunction EO1 against Sections 2(c) and 6(a) of EO2. In addition, the court grants the various motions to file amicus curiae briefs (Dkt. ## 125 , 127 , 139 , 144 , 145 , 147 ), but denies one such motion 156 for the reasons stated in footnote one of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Victor Williams via the USPS (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ORDER re 161 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lourdes M. Rosado for Plaintiffs State of New York, and State of New York, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 161 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lourdes M. Rosado FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs State of New York, State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4807610 (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ORDER re 149 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth N. Dewar for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ORDER re 143 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven Obus for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER re 142 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tiffany M. Woo for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER re 140 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Terrance J Nolan for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 156 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae, filed by Amicus Victor Williams (filing pro se). (PM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2017: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief) (PM). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ORDER re 138 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Seth D. Fiur for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ORDER re 135 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven M Sullivan for State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ORDER re 134 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexandra Robert Gordon for State of California, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 152 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants John Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Rex Tillerson, filed by State of Oregon, State of New York, State of Washington, State of California, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (AD) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 151 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump (SG) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Noah Purcell and Colleen Melody for St. of WA; appearing by phone: Scott Kalpan for St. of OR; Def Counsel: Chad Readler, Stacey Young; appearing by phone: Michelle Bennett; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2017. The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt # 118 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is GRANTED. The Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 118-1) is now the operative complaint. The court hears from counsel re: the schedule of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # 148 ), and takes the matter under advisement. (AD) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth N. Dewar FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4806355 (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 148 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Purcell, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/15/2017, (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Johnson Declaration, # 3 Albright et al Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Barnard, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 146 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, to 119 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction. (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus New York University. Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Smith, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 144 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae and Brief of Amici Curiae, filed by Amicus City of Chicago. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Solomon, Benna) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 143 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven E. Obus FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804778 (Smith, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tiffany M. Woo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804769 (Smith, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Center for Law & Justice (Vander Wel, W.) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 140 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Terrance J. Nolan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804753 (Smith, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 139 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Brief Opposing Emergency Motion, filed by Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Opposing Motion, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Vander Wel, W.) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Seth D. Fiur FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804733 (Smith, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Catherine Wright Smith on behalf of Amicus New York University. (Smith, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 136 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chad A. Readler on behalf of Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Readler, Chad) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 135 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. Sullivan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4803777 (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexandra Robert Gordon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of California (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4803758 (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 130 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benna Solomon for Amicus City of Chicago, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 124 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan Hafetz for Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 123 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aaron X. Fellmeth for International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benna Ruth Solomon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus City of Chicago (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4803336 (Seu, Carlton) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 129 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carlton Wm Seu on behalf of Amicus City of Chicago. (Seu, Carlton) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 123 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 124 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Shorten Time for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs re 125 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion , filed by Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/13/2017, (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 125 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion, filed by Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/13/2017, (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan Hafetz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4802954 (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aaron X. Fellmeth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4802930 (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 122 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph M McMillan on behalf of Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant David A Golden (filing pro se) (PM) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 120 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs' 119 Emergency Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction. Response due no later than 4:30 p.m., Pacific Daylight Time, on March 14, 2017. The court will defer scheduling a hearing, if any, on Plaintiffs' emergency motion until after it has reviewed Defendants' response. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 118 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Second Amended, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Index of Declarations, # 4 Decl. of R. Althaibani, # 5 Decl. of S. Amin, # 6 Decl. of B. Callaghan, # 7 Decl. of S. Dadgari, # 8 Decl. of A. Elfgeeh, # 9 Decl. of N. Fallah, # 10 Decl. of H. Ghasemzadeh, # 11 Decl. of E. Hassett, # 12 Decl. of A. Mubarez, # 13 Decl. of S. Parsian, # 14 Decl. of Z. Rasouli, # 15 Decl. of A. Shayegan, # 16 Decl. of J. Sime, # 17 Decl. of R. Branon, # 18 Decl. of A. Chaudhry, # 19 Decl. of D. Eaton, # 20 Decl. of D. Heatwole, # 21 Decl. of S. Hemmati, # 22 Decl. of R. Lewin, # 23 Decl. of A. Mehrizi-Sani, # 24 Decl. of V. Rabinowitz, # 25 Decl. of J. Riedinger, # 26 Decl. of V. Shah, # 27 Decl. of J. Wasserheit, # 28 Decl. of J. Wasserheit, # 29 Decl. of J. Wood, # 30 Decl. of N. Zimpher, # 31 Decl. of S. Buell, # 32 Decl. of R. Fullerton, # 33 Decl. of P. Johnson, # 34 Decl. of A. Lavine, # 35 Decl. of D. Pashman, # 36 Decl. of M. Rosenn, # 37 Decl. of M. Saunders, # 38 Decl. of J. Simeone, # 39 Decl. of D. Soike, # 40 Decl. of S. Topiwala, # 41 Decl. of J. Truppman, # 42 Decl. of R. Zawaideh, # 43 Decl. of M. Akhtari, # 44 Decl. of M. de Leon, # 45 Decl. of R. Eskandari, # 46 Decl. of T. Johnson, # 47 Decl. of E. Scherzer, # 48 Decl. of W. Berkovitz, # 49 Decl. of D. Duea, # 50 Decl. of L. Warren, # 51 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/31/2017, (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF THE FILING OF A NEW EXECUTIVE ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE re 108 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying Petitioner James J. O'Hagan's 110 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: James O'Hagan via the USPS (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 115 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Petitioner Mikki the Mime's 109 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM) cc: Joseph A. Camp and Mikki the Mime via the USPS (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 114 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Plaintiff State of Minnesota re 108 Notice-Other (Campion, Jacob) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 113 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiff State of Washington re 108 Notice-Other Notice of Filing of Executive Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Purcell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting the State of Oregon's 94 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump Appellants unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. 186) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). By agreement of the parties, costs in the amount of $126.36 are taxed to appellants. DISMISSED (SG) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 83 Order on Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan (filing pro se). (PM) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 91 Order on Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Mikki the Mime (filing pro se). (PM) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Executive Order ; filed by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Colleen Melody for State of WA, Jacob Campion for Stat of MN; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett; CR: Nancy Bauer; Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2017 re: defendants' request to extend deadlines in the court's Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report (Dkt. # 87 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the court grants the request. The deadlines are extended as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline extended to 3/15/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline extended to 3/29/2017, Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2017. (AD) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. Appellants motion to hold this appeal in abeyance is denied (Docket Entry No. 178). On our own motion, we extend the briefing schedule for this appeal. The opening brief is due March 10, 2017; the answering brief is due March 31, 2017; and the optional reply brief is due April 5, 2017. (SG) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Tobias Read in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Ronald L. Adams in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Richard Birkel in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Margarett Everett in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Marc Overbeck in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 99 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lee Po Cha in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Janet Billups in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Howard N. Kenyon in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Dennis Galvan in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David G. Ellis in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene) Noting Date 3/17/2017, (Kaplan, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 93 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION in Opposition to Position Taken by State of Washington and in Continued Representation by Washington Attorney General by Amicus Harry E. Ries (filing pro se) (swt) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. The United States has represented to the Court that the President intends to issue a new Executive Order and has urged the Court to hold its consideration of the case until the President issues the new Order. The United States has further represented that it will inform the Court of any new developments. En banc proceedings before this Court are stayed pending further Order of this Court. (SG) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 91 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying Mikki the Mime's 88 Motion to Intervene. Further, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by Ms. Mime on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Mikki the Mime via the USPS (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 90 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER striking 85 amicus brief filed by Silver Cloud Masufir. Mr. Masufir filed it in violation of the court's order regarding the filing the amicus curiae briefs. (Order (Dkt. # 84 ).) Mr. Masufir may re-file his brief if he does so in conformity with the court's order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Silver Cloud Masufir with copy of Dkt. 84 , Order via the USPS (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 89 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James L. Robart striking James J. O'Hagan's additional documents 86 and directing the Clerk to refrain from placing any further filings of Mr. O'Hagan on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration of a notice of appeal of the court's order denying Mr. OHagan's motion to intervene. (PM) cc: O'Hagan via the USPS (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Mikki the Mime (filing pro se). (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (PM) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/1/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/15/2017. (AD) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REAL PARTY OF INTEREST JOINING OR INTERVENING AND NOTICE OF COUNTER CLAIM FOR DAMAGES filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan (filing pro se). (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Real Party of Interest James O'Hagan, # 2 Declaration of Process Server) (PM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STRICKEN PER ORDER, DKT. 90 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in response to Judge Robart's TRO by Amicus Parties Northern Cheyenne Nation, Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation, Sec Am Tek Tek Tribe, Washitaw Nation (PM) Modified on 2/16/2017 to indicate this document is stricken. (PM). (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFS by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying James J. O'Hagan's 79 Motion to Intervene. (PM) cc: O'Hagan via the USPS (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the telephone conference held on 2/13/2017 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017, (NB) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily Chiang on behalf of Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU). (Chiang, Emily) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 80 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM/DECLARATION filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan re 79 MOTION to Intervene (filing pro se). (PM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene and Notice of Counter Claim for Damages, filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan (filing pro se). (PM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court concludes that the Ninth Circuit has construed the court's TRO (Dkt. # 52 ) as an appealable preliminary injunction and that further briefing or the submission of evidence concerning a preliminary injunction would not be appropriate in this court during the pendency of Defendants' appeal. However, the court ORDERS the parties to continue with other aspects of this litigation in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's Local Civil Rules. If issues or motions subsequently arise that either party believes are inextricably bound up with the injunctive order, the court will address those motions or issues on a case-by-case basis in accordance with the case law set forth above. Finally, the court VACATES the briefing schedule set forth in its February 7, 2017, order (Dkt. # 57 ). (PM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Colleen Melody for State of WA; Alan Gilbert and Jacob Campion for State of MN; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett; CR: Nancy Bauer; Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2017. The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Memorandum (Dkt. # 75 ) and Defendants' Memorandum (Dkt. # 76 ). An oral ruling is made by the court with a written order to follow. (AD) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 76 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re 74 Minute Order,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,,,,, by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 75 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM Re: NInth Circuit Construal of TRO as Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Minnesota, State of Washington (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. At Defendants' request, the court held a telephone conference concerning the Order Regarding the State of Washington's February 9, 2017, Letter ("Order"). (Order (Dkt. # 71 ).) Colleen M. Melody of the Washington State Attorney General's Office appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Michelle R. Bennett of the United States Department of Justice, Civil Division of Federal Programs, appeared on behalf of Defendants. During the telephone conference, Defendants asked the court for additional time to respond to the court's Order. The court heard from counsel for both Plaintiffs and Defendants on this issue. The court GRANTS Defendants' request and MODIFIES its Order as follows: (1) Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each file a separate memorandum no later than 12:00 p.m., Pacific Standard Time ("PST") on Monday, February 13, 2017. (2) Each side's memorandum shall discuss whether the Ninth Circuit has construed the court's temporary restraining order ("TRO") (TRO (Dkt. # 52 )) as a preliminary injunction, such that additional briefing and possible evidence on a motion for preliminary injunction is no longer required in the district court, see Washington v. Trump, No. 17-35105, slip op. at 7-8, Dkt. # 134 (9th Cir. 2017) ("[W]e believe... that the TRO should be considered to have the qualities of a reviewable preliminary injunction."); or whether the parties should submit additional briefing and evidence in the district court concerning the issue of a preliminary injunction, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(3). (3) The parties shall limit the length of their memoranda to eight pages. (4) The court RESCHEDULES the telephonic hearing previously set at 11:00 a.m., PST, on Monday, February 13, 2017 (see Order at 2), to 3:00 p.m., PST, on Monday, February 13, 2017. (AD) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. A judge on this Court has made a sua sponte request that a vote be taken as to whether the order issued by the three judge motions panel on February 9, 2017, should be reconsidered en banc. A sua sponte en banc call having been made, the parties are instructed to file simultaneous briefs setting forth their respective positions on whether this matter should be reconsidered en banc. The briefs should be filed on or before 11:00 a.m., Pacific time, on Thursday, February 16. The supplemental briefs shall be filed electronically and consist of no more than 14,000 words. See General Order 5.4(c)(3). (RE) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The telephone conference scheduled for Monday, February 13, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. PST will be conducted in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. (AD) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING THE STATE OF WASHINGTON'S FEBRUARY 9, 2017, LETTER dkt 70 ; the parties are directed to submit a joint status report no later than Sunday, 2/12/17 at 11:59pm, Pacific Standard Time. The court also schedules a telephone conference on Monday, 2/13/2017 at 11:00 AM, PST, to discuss the parties' JSR by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from Plaintiffs re Briefing (Purcell, Noah) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Order of USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. The motions for leave to file amicus curiae briefs, to file a substitute or amended amicus curiae brief, and for an extension of time to file an amicus curiae brief, are granted. (SG) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Order of USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. For The foregoing reasons, the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal is DENIED.(SG) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT A. Chaudhry filed by Plaintiff State of Washington (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT R. Branon filed by Plaintiff State of Washington (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Seungchul Chang on behalf of Amicus Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Chang, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melissa R Lee on behalf of Amicus Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Lee, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alan I. Gilbert for State of Minnesota, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John R Tyler on behalf of Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Tyler, John) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 2/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alan Isaac Gilbert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Minnesota (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4759158 (Campion, Jacob) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 2/4/2017, Entered: 2/4/2017 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re [52] Temporary Restraining Order by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction no later than 11:59pm Pacific Standard Time on 2/9/17; defendants shall file their opposition to plaintiffs' motion no later than 11:59pm PST on 2/15/17; plaintiffs to file their reply in support of their motion no later than 11:59pm PST on 2/17/17 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) Modified on 2/7/2017 to cc Ninth Circuit. (RE) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 TRO HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Noah Purcell, Colleen Melody, Jacob Campion; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett, John Tyler; CR: Debbie Zurn; TRO Hearing held on 2/3/2017. Opening remarks from the court. The court grants the following motions: Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by ACLU (Dkt. # [26]); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Service Employees International Union (Dkt. # [42]); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Amicus Law Professors (Dkt. # [45]); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Washington State Labor Council (Dkt. # [46]); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State (Dkt. # [48]). The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs State of Washington and State of Minnesota's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # [3]) and Plaintiffs' Amendment to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # [19]). For the reasons stated on the record, the court grants Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A written order will follow. (AD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiff Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle. (Bergman, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney Claire Loebs Davis,Tiffany Scott Connors,Jessica Walder for Law Professors added; per [44] Notice-Other. (PS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Notice of Filing of Official TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion for TRO held on 2/3/2017 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2017, (DZ) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Defendants John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, to [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Authoritative Guidance)(Bennett, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State (Silverman, Kristin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Americans United for Separation of Church and State. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Silverman, Kristin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jeff Johnson filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council re [46] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief (Robbins, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Robbins, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Law Professors. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Davis, Claire)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance ; filed by Amicus Law Professors. (Davis, Claire)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Trisha Pande filed by Amicus Service Employees International Union re [42] MOTION for Leave to File Service Employees Internationsl Union's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Berman, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Service Employees Internationsl Union's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Service Employees International Union. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A (SEIU's Amicus Brief)) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Berman, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [40] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jacob Campion for State of Minnesota, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(vb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jacob Campion FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4756187 (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew M Volk on behalf of Amicus Service Employees International Union. (Volk, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve W. Berman on behalf of Amicus Service Employees International Union. (Berman, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of consent - no consent re video recording
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the TRO hearing on 2/3/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (AD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re [30] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew Nellis for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [29] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kelly M Percival for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [28] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric Rothschild for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second DECLARATION of Emily Chiang filed by Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU) re [26] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Lawrence, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re [26] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Lawrence, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [27] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradley Girard for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew Nellis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755570 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kelly M. Percival FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755561 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric Rothschild FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755537 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bradley Girard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755401 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Lawrence, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul J Lawrence on behalf of Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU). (Lawrence, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [23] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard B Katskee for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard B. Katskee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4754982 (Silverman, Kristin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin W Silverman on behalf of Amicus Americans United For Church and State. (Silverman, Kristin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Arjun Garg on behalf of Defendants John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Garg, Arjun)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Bennett on behalf of Defendants John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney Kymberly K. Evanson for American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU) added; per [25] Notice of Appearance. (vb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney Angelo J Calfo for Americans United For Church and State added; per [22] Notice of Appearance. (vb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDMENT TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER to [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs State of Minnesota, State of Washington (Attachments: # (1) Citation Notice of Amended Citations)(Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Exhibit, # (13) Exhibit, # (14) Exhibit, # (15) Exhibit, # (16) Exhibit, # (17) Exhibit)(Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT BRIEF RE STANDING by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Kathy Oline, # (2) Exhibit Second Declaration of Jeffrey Riedinger, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of John Boesenberg, # (4) Exhibit Second Declaration of Asif Chaudhry, # (5) Exhibit Declaration of David Schumacher, # (6) Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Strus)(Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marsha J. Chien on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Chien, Marsha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricio A. Marquez on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Marquez, Patricio)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Elizabeth Egeler on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Egeler, Anne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Defendants on 1/31/2017, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Melody, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summonses electronically issued as to defendant(s) John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons)(CDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # (1) Summons President Trump, # (2) Summons US Dep't of Homeland Security, # (3) Summons Secretary John Kelly, # (4) Summons Acting Secretary Tom Shannon, # (5) Summons United State of America)(Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez (for Judge James L Robart)- Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Noah Percell, Colleen Melody; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett, John Tyler, Arjun Garge; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 11:30 AM; Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2017. Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff supplemental brief re issue of standing (limit 6 page) due 2/1/17 by 6:00 PM PST; Defendants' brief (limit 30 pages) due 2/2/17 by 12:00 midnight PST. TRO Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. (LC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION OF JEFFREY RIEDINGER of Jeffrey Riedinger re [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF EMILY CHIANG of Emily Chiang re [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION OF ROBERT DZIELAK of Robert Dzielak re [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION AYESHA BLACKWELL-HAWKINS of Ayesha Blackwell-Hawkins, ESQ. re [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION OF ASIF CHAUDHRY of Asif Chaudhry re [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION OF NOAH PURCELL re [3] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/30/2017, (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET re [1] Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4751332), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit)(Purcell, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Filer: ATTACHMENT FILED SEPARATELY: In the future, please remember the Civil Cover Sheet, the Summons(es) (if applicable) and the Report Regarding Trademarks and Patents (if applicable) MUST be attachments to your initiating document. Thank you. (DJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 2,310 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?