Martinez v. Veterans Administration
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-10305

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2019 at 11:15 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Dismissing 3 Amended Complaint for Failure to Pay Filing Fees. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Request - other
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Request - other
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Reassignment/Disqualification
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Request - other
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Request for Service of the Initiating Document by U.S. Marshal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Request - other
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?