LHF Productions Inc v. Doe 1

Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-01354
District Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ricardo S. Martinez
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:52 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo LHF Productions Inc, Plaintiff

Represented by 701 Fifth Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com

Represented by Lowe Graham Jones, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com
v.
No Logo Christopher Compton, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Arias, Defendant
No Logo Doe #1, Defendant
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo Doe 4, Defendant
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
No Logo Jonathon Baugher, Defendant
No Logo Justin Bartley, Defendant
No Logo Leonard W. Harrison III, Defendant
No Logo Lucas Rasky, Defendant
No Logo Nadezh Mikityuk, Defendant
No Logo Nicolleen Bhagatram, Defendant
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Simon Delmar, Defendant
No Logo Taylor Bolton, Defendant
No Logo Woodrow Ross, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Judgment by Court
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) (cc: Nadezh Mikityuk via first class mail)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Order to participate. Defendant Nadezh Mikityuk is ordered to participate in this proceeding by participating in good faith in the required Rule 26(f) conference no later than twenty-eight (28)days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: defendant Nadezh Mikityuk via first class mail
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Plaintiff's 54 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. The Court orders Defendant Nadezh Mikityuk to file a Response to this Order to Show Cause no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order explaining why he should not be ordered to participate in good faith in the required Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Defendant Mikityuk via first class mail
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Motion for leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Add and Terminate Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Add and Terminate Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Add and Terminate Judges
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Woodrow Ross. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Nicolleen Bhagatram on 1/14/2017, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Justin Bartley on 1/22/2017, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Taylor Bolton on 1/14/2017, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Nadezh Mikityuk on 1/18/2017, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Christopher Compton mailed on 11/22/2016 (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Simon Delmar on 1/14/2017, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Daniel Arias on 1/25/2017, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Leonard W. Harrison III, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to defendant(s) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(RS) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Jonathon Baugher and Lucas Rasky, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting plaintiff's 13 Motion for Extension of Time by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/22/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Robert Bennett, Woodrow Ross, Leonard W. Harrison III, Daniel Arias, Simon Delmar, Lucas Rasky, Christopher Compton, Nadezh Mikityuk, Taylor Bolton, Justin Bartley, Nicolleen Bhagatram, Jonathon Baugher with JURY DEMAND, filed by LHF Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 16, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 12, filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 2 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(PM) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc sent via U.S. Postal Service to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Washington, DC. (DJ) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/26/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent A&T IP, Inc. for LHF Productions Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by LHF Productions Inc (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff LHF Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4579082) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party LHF Productions Inc(pty:pla), filed by LHF Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 64 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?