Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan v. Eastopen, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00547

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 10:43 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beeson Tayer & Bodine, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine E. Holzhauser +1 916 325 2100 +1 916 441 5208 cholzhauser@beesontayer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Beeson, Tayler, & Bodine, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine E. Arostegui +1 916 325 2100 +1 916 441 5208 carostegui@beesontayer.com
v.
No Logo Eastopen, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan re 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Arostegui, Catherine) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Settlement and Request for Dismissal without Prejudice by Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan (Arostegui, Catherine) (Filed on 3/8/2017) Modified on 3/9/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 6 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Arostegui, Catherine) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan.. (Arostegui, Catherine) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
          Summons Issued as to Eastopen, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Proposed Summons. (Arostegui, Catherine) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
              Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2017 01:30 PM. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/17/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CLERK'S NOTICE counsel to resubmit completed proposed summons.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Eastopen, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11125849.). Filed byTrustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Arostegui, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 80 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?