Binstock v. Affiliated Metal Industries, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00221

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 8:13 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allen Binstock, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Binstock +1 216 522 3716 +1 216 522 2418 allen.binstock@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iva Young Choe +1 216 522 7961 +1 216 522 2418 iva.choe@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rudra Choudhury +1 216 522 8182 +1 216 522 2418 rudra.choudhury@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LerVal M. Elva +1 216 303 7360 +1 216 522 2418 lerval.elva@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly A.B. Freeman +1 216 522 3742 +1 216 522 2418 kelly.freeman@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Gleine +1 216 522 8185 +1 216 522 2418 gregory.gleine@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Affiliated Metal Industries, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J Kelly +1 216 515 1620 +1 216 515 1650 bkelly@frantzward.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order of Case Dismissal. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/13/2017. (D,M)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Allen Binstock. (Elva, LerVal) Modified capitalization on 2/10/2017 (G,CA). (Entered: 02/09/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Attorney Appearance by Brian J. Kelly filed by on behalf of Affiliated Metal Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,Jo) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
          Complaint Petition for Injunction against Affiliated Metal Industries, Inc... Filing fee exempt. Filed by Allen Binstock. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Charge 08-CA-184776, # 3 Exhibit B - Amended Charge 08-CA-184776, # 4 Exhibit C - Complaint and Notice of Hearing 08-CA-184776, # 5 Exhibit D - Order Rescheduling Hearing 08-CA-184776, # 6 Exhibit E - Answer to Complaint and Notice of Hearing 08-CA-184776, # 7 Proposed Order) (Elva, LerVal)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (W,Jo)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (W,Jo)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 12 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?