Synopsys, Inc. v. Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-00561

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2019 at 1:32 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Synopsys, Inc. Synopsys, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Luis Uriarte +1 650 289 7105 +6507 650 650 7401 ruriarte@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 658 6460 +1 713 658 6401 cfrost@orrick.com
a Delaware corporation Kayvan Ghaffari +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 kghaffari@orrick.com
a Delaware corporation Lillian J. Mao +1 650 614 7410 lmao@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise Marie Mingrone +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 dmingrone@orrick.com
v.
No Logo Ching-Han Tsai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 268 7000 aphillips@mofo.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 jliou@mofo.com
Space Christopher L. Robinson christopherrobinson@mofo.com
Space Stacey Michelle Sprenkel +1 415 268 6040 +1 415 268 7522 ssprenkel@mofo.com
Space Jennifer Lee Taylor +1 415 268 7000 JLeeTaylor@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Charles Cooke +1 650 638 2370 +1 650 350 4333 ccooke@mckllp.com
Space Patrick Thomas Murphy +1 415 231 5761 +1 415 231 5759 patrick@mckllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bernstein Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc N. Bernstein +1 415 765 6634 +1 415 283 4804 mbernstein@blgrp.com
Space Will Barnett Fitton +1 415 765 6633 +1 415 283 4804 wfitton@blgrp.com
No Logo Ubiquiti International Holding Company Limited, Defendant
No Logo Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Bennett +1 415 268 7169 +1 415 268 7522 jbennett@mofo.com
Space Robin Lynn Brewer +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 rbrewer@mofo.com
Space Michael Jeffrey Guo +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mguo@mofo.com
Space Richard S J Hung +1 415 268 6000 +1 415 268 7522 rhung@mofo.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 268 7000 aphillips@mofo.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 jliou@mofo.com
Space Wendy J Ray +1 213 892 5446 +1 213 892 5454 wray@mofo.com
Space Christopher L. Robinson christopherrobinson@mofo.com
Space Stacey Michelle Sprenkel +1 415 268 6040 +1 415 268 7522 ssprenkel@mofo.com
Space Camila Alicia Tapernoux +1 415 268 6273 +1 415 268 7522 CTapernoux@mofo.com
Space Jennifer Lee Taylor +1 415 268 7000 JLeeTaylor@mofo.com
No Logo Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Bennett +1 415 268 7169 +1 415 268 7522 jbennett@mofo.com
Space Robin Lynn Brewer +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 rbrewer@mofo.com
Space Michael Jeffrey Guo +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mguo@mofo.com
Space Richard S J Hung +1 415 268 6000 +1 415 268 7522 rhung@mofo.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 268 7000 aphillips@mofo.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 jliou@mofo.com
Space Wendy J Ray +1 213 892 5446 +1 213 892 5454 wray@mofo.com
Space Christopher L. Robinson christopherrobinson@mofo.com
Space Stacey Michelle Sprenkel +1 415 268 6040 +1 415 268 7522 ssprenkel@mofo.com
Space Camila Alicia Tapernoux +1 415 268 6273 +1 415 268 7522 CTapernoux@mofo.com
Space Jennifer Lee Taylor +1 415 268 7000 JLeeTaylor@mofo.com
No Logo Cadence Design Systems, Inc., Miscellaneous
Unknown Role, Verisity Ltd.

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo Revulytics, Inc., Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood-Bates +1 415 275 8550 +1 415 275 8551 syoungblood@rshc-law.com
No Logo SmartFlow Compliance Solutions, LLC, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Diana M Torres +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 diana.torres@kirkland.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (466) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Objection
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Conference Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Proposed Form of Verdict
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Proposed Form of Verdict
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Proposed Form of Verdict
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 315 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 295 (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 295 filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit [FUS] [CORRECTED] 49, # 4 Exhibit [FUS] [CORRECTED] 71, # 5 Exhibit [FUS] [CORRECTED] 73, # 6 Exhibit [FUS] [CORRECTED] 79)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ERRATA re 298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Opp to Ubiquiti and UNIL Motion for Summary Judgment; Opp to Def Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment and Materials in Support Thereto, 302 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 294 Opposition/Response to Motion by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Amanda D. Phillips in Support of 298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Opp to Ubiquiti and UNIL Motion for Summary Judgment; Opp to Def Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment and Materials in Support Thereto filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 60 Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 61 Redacted, # 3 Exhibit 67 Redacted, # 4 Exhibit 69 Redacted, # 5 Exhibit 72 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 75 Redacted, # 7 Exhibit 90 Redacted)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Phillips, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Michael J. Guo in Support of 292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REPLY TO UBIQUITI AND UNIL OPPOSITION TO SYNOPSYS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 292 ) (Guo, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of K. Nisewaner in Support of 298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Opp to Ubiquiti and UNIL Motion for Summary Judgment; Opp to Def Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment and Materials in Support Thereto filed byCadence Design Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 298 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Neukom on behalf of Non-Party Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Sarah D. Youngblood-Bates in Support of 298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Opp to Ubiquiti and UNIL Motion for Summary Judgment; Opp to Def Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment and Materials in Support Thereto filed byRevulytics, Inc.. (Related document(s) 298 ) (Youngblood-Bates, Sarah) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 290 ) (Ghaffari, Kayvan) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 286 Motion to Continue. The hearing on all pending motions is reset to Monday November 26, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. If any lead counsel are unable to appear on that date and at that time due to travel delays, they shall immediately notify the Court and other counsel in this case. In that event, the hearing on all pending motions shall be continued to Wednesday November 28, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). This is a Text Only Docket Entry. Per Chambers (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 264 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI AND WILLIAM HASLER ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lillian Mao, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [Public] Redacted Version of Opp. to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 4 [FUS] Unredacted Version of Opp. to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 5 [Public] Redacted Exhibit 1, # 6 [FUS] Unredacted Exhibit 1, # 7 [FUS] Exhibit 3, # 8 [FUS] Exhibit 5, # 9 [FUS] Exhibit 8)(Mao, Lillian) (Filed on 10/25/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REPLY TO UBIQUITI AND UNIL OPPOSITION TO SYNOPSYS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Opp to Ubiquiti and UNIL Motion for Summary Judgment; Opp to Def Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment and Materials in Support Thereto (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REPLY TO UBIQUITI AND UNIL OPPOSITION TO SYNOPSYS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (CORRECTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 3 [CONFIDENTIAL] Sanctions Reply to UBNT UNIL Opp.) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 292 ) (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 241 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation [REDACTED] ) (CORRECTED VERSION OF REPLY FILED AT ECF NO. 296) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert L. Uriarte in Support of 297 Reply to Opposition/Response, 296 Reply to Opposition/Response filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Uriarte Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Uriarte Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Uriarte Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Uriarte Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Uriarte Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Uriarte Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Uriarte Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Uriarte Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Uriarte Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Uriarte Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Uriarte Declaration)(Related document(s) 297, 296 ) (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 297 Reply to Opposition/Response, 296 Reply to Opposition/Response filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-N Omnibus Decl of Kayvan Ghaffari ISO Replies)(Related document(s) 297, 296 ) (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Opp to Ubiquiti and UNIL Motion for Summary Judgment; Opp to Def Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment and Materials in Support Thereto filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Uriarte, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit [REDACTED], # 4 Exhibit [UNREDACTED], # 5 Exhibit [UNREDACTED] Exhibits 1-81, # 6 Exhibit [UNREDACTED] Exhibits 82-131)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 241 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation [REDACTED] ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 241 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation [REDACTED] ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF DENISE M. MINGRONE, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone in Support of 294 Opposition/Response to Motion, 293 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-59, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 60-85, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 86-131)(Related document(s) 294, 293 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED ) Synopsys' Opposition to Defendant Tsai's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 256 MOTION for Summary Judgment Correction to Docket No. 252 ) Synopsys' Opposition to Ubiquiti and UNIL's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REPLY TO UBIQUITI AND UNIL OPPOSITION TO SYNOPSYS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari ISO Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [CONFIDENTIAL] Sanctions Reply to UBNT UNIL Opp, # 4 Exhibit A-N (Confidential), # 5 [PUBLIC] Sanctions Reply to UBNT UNIL Opp, # 6 Exhibit [Public] Exs A-N Omnibus Decl of Kayvan Ghaffari ISO Replies)(Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. re 290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Opposition - Redacted, # 4 Opposition - Unredacted, # 5 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum - Redacted, # 6 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum - Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit J - Unredacted, # 8 Exhibit K - Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit 11 - Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit 12 - Unredacted, # 12 Exhibit 13 - Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit 14 - Unredacted, # 14 Exhibit 15 - Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit 16 - Unredacted, # 16 Exhibit 17 - Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit 18 - Unredacted, # 18 Exhibit 19 - Unredacted, # 19 Exhibit 20 - Unredacted, # 20 Exhibit 21 - Unredacted, # 21 Exhibit 22 - Unredacted, # 22 Exhibit 23 - Unredacted, # 23 Exhibit 24 - Unredacted, # 24 Exhibit 25 - Unredacted, # 25 Exhibit 26 - Unredacted, # 26 Exhibit 27 - Unredacted, # 27 Exhibit 28 - Unredacted, # 28 Exhibit 38 - Unredacted)(Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 249 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Vicarious Liability And Counterclaim Abandonment ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum, # 2 Exhibit J - Redacted, # 3 Exhibit K - Redacted, # 4 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11 - Redacted, # 16 Exhibit 12 - Redacted, # 17 Exhibit 13 - Redacted, # 18 Exhibit 14 - Redacted, # 19 Exhibit 15 - Redacted, # 20 Exhibit 16 - Redacted, # 21 Exhibit 17 - Redacted, # 22 Exhibit 18 - Redacted, # 23 Exhibit 19 - Redacted, # 24 Exhibit 20 - Redacted, # 25 Exhibit 21 - Redacted, # 26 Exhibit 22 - Redacted, # 27 Exhibit 23 - Redacted, # 28 Exhibit 24 - Redacted, # 29 Exhibit 25 - Redacted, # 30 Exhibit 26 - Redacted, # 31 Exhibit 27 - Redacted, # 32 Exhibit 28 - Redacted, # 33 Exhibit 29, # 34 Exhibit 30, # 35 Exhibit 31, # 36 Exhibit 32, # 37 Exhibit 33, # 38 Exhibit 34, # 39 Exhibit 35, # 40 Exhibit 36, # 41 Exhibit 37, # 42 Exhibit 38 - Redacted, # 43 Exhibit 39, # 44 Exhibit 40)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 286 MOTION to Continue /Change Hearing Date on Motion for Sanctions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of James E. Malackowski and William Hasler ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 286 MOTION to Continue /Change Hearing Date on Motion for Sanctions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of James E. Malackowski and William Hasler ) Declaration of Christopher In Support of Opposition filed byChing-Han Tsai. (Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue /Change Hearing Date on Motion for Sanctions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of James E. Malackowski and William Hasler filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Claudia Wilson Frost, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 279 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Michael J. Guo in Support of 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Guo, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Sarah D. Youngblood-Bates in Support of 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRevulytics, Inc.. (Related document(s) 279 ) (Youngblood-Bates, Sarah) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Unredacted) Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. and Ubiquiti Networks International Limited's Opposition to Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation)(Related document(s) 279 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Murphy (Murphy, Patrick) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. re 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Guo, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Kevin Faulkner - Unredacted, # 4 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum - Redacted, # 5 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum - Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. J - Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. K - Unredacted, # 8 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor - Redacted, # 9 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor - Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 5 - Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 6 - Unredacted, # 12 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 7 - Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 8 - Unredacted, # 14 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 11 - Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 13 - Unredacted, # 16 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 15 - Unredacted)(Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 241 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation [REDACTED] ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Faulkner, # 2 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum, # 3 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. A, # 4 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. B, # 5 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. C, # 6 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. D, # 7 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. E, # 8 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. F, # 9 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. G, # 10 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. H, # 11 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. I, # 12 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. J - Redacted, # 13 Exhibit Nisenbaum Decl. Ex. K - Redacted, # 14 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor, # 15 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 1, # 16 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 2, # 17 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 3, # 18 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 4, # 19 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 5 - Redacted, # 20 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 6 - Redacted, # 21 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 7 - Redacted, # 22 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 8 - Redacted, # 23 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 9, # 24 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 10, # 25 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 11 - Redacted, # 26 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 12, # 27 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 13 - Redacted, # 28 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 14, # 29 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Ex. 15 - Redacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ching-Han Tsai re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Cooke In Support of Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion, # 3 Redacted Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, # 4 Unredacted Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, # 5 Exhibit A to Cooke Declaration In Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, # 6 Exhibit C to Cooke Declaration In Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions)(Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 241 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation [REDACTED] ) filed byChing-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Cooke In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, # 2 Exhibit A to Cooke Declaration_REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit B to Cooke Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Cooke Declaration_REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit D to Cooke Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Hun-Luh "James" Lian in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, # 7 Declaration of Ya-Chua Yang in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions)(Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Sarah D. Youngblood-Bates in Support of 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRevulytics, Inc.. (Related document(s) 265 ) (Youngblood-Bates, Sarah) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Michael J. Guo in Support of 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Vicarious Liability and Counterclaim Abandonment filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 250 ) (Guo, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Alex Fields in Support of 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 264 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI AND WILLIAM HASLER filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 265, 264 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants Motion to Exclude (Dkt. 264) filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Fields, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ray Declaration Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Non-Redacted Ray Declaration Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ray Declaration Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Non-Redacted Version of Ray Declaration Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ray Declaration Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Non-Redacted Version of Ray Declaration Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ray Declaration Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Non-Redacted Version nof Ray Declaration Exhibit I, # 10 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Sarah D. Youngblood-Bates in Support of 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRevulytics, Inc.. (Related document(s) 255 ) (Youngblood-Bates, Sarah) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 255 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 247 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion hearings reset for 11/21/2018 at 9:30 a.m. for 241 MOTION for Sanctions, 256 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 264 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI AND WILLIAM HASLER, and 248, 249, 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. re 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda D. Phillips ISO Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Motion Redacted, # 4 Motion Unredacted, # 5 Exhibit A Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit B Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit C Redacted, # 8 Exhibit C Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit G Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit H Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit I Unredacted, # 12 Exhibit J Unredacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI AND WILLIAM HASLER filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wendy J. Ray ISO Motion to Exclude, # 2 Exhibit A Redacted, # 3 Exhibit B Redacted, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G Redacted, # 9 Exhibit H Redacted, # 10 Exhibit I Redacted, # 11 Exhibit J Redacted, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 262 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Dkt. No. 255-3 should be removed from the docket as incorrectly filed. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document No. 255-3 filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 257 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Dkt. No. 252 shall be removed from the docket as incorrectly filed. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ching-Han Tsai re 247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Version of Docket No. 255-3 filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 255 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. re 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits in Support of Same (Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document No. 252 filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Correction to Docket No. 252 filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/1/2018. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** ATTACHMENT 3 FILED IN ERROR DOCUMENT REMOVED BY ORDER OF COURT,REFER TO DOCKET ENTRY 263 *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Motion, # 4 Unredacted Motion, # 5 Exhibit D Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit J Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit K Unredacted, # 8 Exhibit L Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit O Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit Q Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit R Unredacted, # 12 Exhibit S Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit T Unredacted, # 14 Exhibit U Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit V Unredacted, # 16 Exhibit W Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit Z Unredacted, # 18 Exhibit AA Unredacted)(Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/11/2018) (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/11/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Wendy J. Ray in Support of 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D Redacted, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J Redacted, # 11 Exhibit K Redacted, # 12 Exhibit L Redacted, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O Redacted, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q Redacted, # 18 Exhibit R Redacted, # 19 Exhibit S Redacted, # 20 Exhibit T Redacted, # 21 Exhibit U Redacted, # 22 Exhibit V Redacted, # 23 Exhibit W Redacted, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z Redacted, # 27 Exhibit AA Redacted, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II)(Related document(s) 252 ) (Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** DOCUMENT REMOVED BY ORDER OF COURT, REFER TO ENTRY 261 . *** MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/24/2018. Replies due by 10/31/2018. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/10/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 252 replaced on 10/11/2018) (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/11/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Vicarious Liability and Counterclaim Abandonment [Proof of Service of Sealed Documents] (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Vicarious Liability and Counterclaim Abandonment filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Uriarte, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit [REDACTED] Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit [UNREDACTED] Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit 1 [REDACTED], # 6 Exhibit 1 [UNREDACTED], # 7 Exhibit 3 [REDACTED], # 8 Exhibit 3 [UNREDACTED], # 9 Exhibit 5 [REDACTED], # 10 Exhibit 5 [UNREDACTED], # 11 Exhibit 6 [REDACTED], # 12 Exhibit 6 [UNREDACTED], # 13 Exhibit 7 [REDACTED], # 14 Exhibit 7 [UNREDACTED], # 15 Exhibit 8 [REDACTED], # 16 Exhibit 8 [UNREDACTED], # 17 Exhibit 9 [REDACTED], # 18 Exhibit 9 [UNREDACTED], # 19 Exhibit 10 [REDACTED], # 20 Exhibit 10 [UNREDACTED], # 21 Exhibit 11 [REDACTED], # 22 Exhibit 11 [UNREDACTED], # 23 Exhibit 12 [REDACTED], # 24 Exhibit 12 [UNREDACTED], # 25 Exhibit 13 [REDACTED], # 26 Exhibit 13 [UNREDACTED], # 27 Exhibit 14 [REDACTED], # 28 Exhibit 14 [UNREDACTED], # 29 Exhibit 15 [REDACTED], # 30 Exhibit 15 [UNREDACTED], # 31 Exhibit 17 [REDACTED], # 32 Exhibit 17 [UNREDACTED], # 33 Exhibit 18 [REDACTED], # 34 Exhibit 18 [UNREDACTED], # 35 Exhibit 19 [REDACTED], # 36 Exhibit 19 [UNREDACTED], # 37 Exhibit 25 [REDACTED], # 38 Exhibit 25 [UNREDACTED], # 39 Exhibit 26 [REDACTED], # 40 Exhibit 26 [UNREDACTED], # 41 Exhibit 29 [REDACTED], # 42 Exhibit 29 [UNREDACTED], # 43 Exhibit 32 [REDACTED], # 44 Exhibit 32 [UNREDACTED], # 45 Exhibit 34 [REDACTED], # 46 Exhibit 34 [UNREDACTED], # 47 Exhibit 37 [REDACTED], # 48 Exhibit 37 [UNREDACTED], # 49 Exhibit 43 [REDACTED], # 50 Exhibit 43 [UNREDACTED], # 51 Exhibit 45 [REDACTED], # 52 Exhibit 45 [UNREDACTED])(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment On Vicarious Liability And Counterclaim Abandonment filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/24/2018. Replies due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone, # 2 Exhibit 1 [Redacted], # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 [Redacted], # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 [Redacted], # 7 Exhibit 6 [Redacted], # 8 Exhibit 7 [Redacted], # 9 Exhibit 8 [Redacted], # 10 Exhibit 9 [Redacted], # 11 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], # 12 Exhibit 11 [Redacted], # 13 Exhibit 12 [Redacted], # 14 Exhibit 13 [Redacted], # 15 Exhibit 14 [Redacted], # 16 Exhibit 15 [Redacted], # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17 [Redacted], # 19 Exhibit 18 [Redacted], # 20 Exhibit 19 [Redacted], # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25 [Redacted], # 27 Exhibit 26 [Redacted], # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29 [Redacted], # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32 [Redacted], # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34 [Redacted], # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37 [Redacted], # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43 [Redacted], # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45 [Redacted], # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED filed by Ching-Han Tsai. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/24/2018. Replies due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher Cooke, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Summary Judgment)(Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Motion for Summary Judgment_UNREDACTED, # 4 Motion for Summary Judgment_REDACTED, # 5 Declaration of Christopher Cooke ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cooke Dec ISO Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cooke Dec_COVER, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Cooke Dec_SEALED, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit B to Cooke Dec_COVER, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit C to Cooke Dec ISO Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit D to Cooke Dec ISO Summary Judgment_SEALED, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit D to Cooke Dec ISO Summary Judgment_COVER, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit E to Cooke Dec ISO Summary Judgment_SEALED, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit E to Cooke Dec ISO Summary Judgment_COVER)(Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Amanda D. Phillips in Support of 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 242 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USB Manual Filing Received Document re 240 Notice (Other) by Synopsys, Inc. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 9/27/2018. Settlement Conference set for 11/30/2018 11:00 AM. Total Time in Court: 33 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2018) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation [PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEALED DOCUMENTS] (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Uriarte ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit [UNREDACTED] Motion for Sanctions, # 3 Exhibit [REDACTED] Motion for Sanctions, # 4 Declaration of Daniel Roffman [UNREDACTED], # 5 Declaration of Daniel Roffman [REDACTED], # 6 Exhibit A [REDACTED], # 7 Exhibit A [UNREDACTED], # 8 Exhibit B [REDACTED], # 9 Exhibit B [UNREDACTED], # 10 Exhibit C [REDACTED], # 11 Exhibit C [UNREDACTED], # 12 Exhibit D [REDACTED], # 13 Exhibit D [UNREDACTED], # 14 Exhibit E [REDACTED], # 15 Exhibit E [UNREDACTED], # 16 Exhibit G [REDACTED], # 17 Exhibit G [UNREDACTED], # 18 Exhibit H [REDACTED], # 19 Exhibit H [UNREDACTED], # 20 Exhibit I [REDACTED], # 21 Exhibit I [UNREDACTED], # 22 Exhibit J [REDACTED], # 23 Exhibit J [SYNOPSYS' REDACTED], # 24 Exhibit J [UNREDACTED], # 25 Exhibit K [REDACTED], # 26 Exhibit K [UNREDACTED], # 27 Exhibit M [REDACTED], # 28 Exhibit M [UNREDACTED], # 29 Exhibit P [REDACTED], # 30 Exhibit P [UNREDACTED], # 31 Exhibit S [REDACTED], # 32 Exhibit S [UNREDACTED], # 33 Exhibit T [REDACTED], # 34 Exhibit T [UNREDACTED], # 35 Exhibit U [REDACTED], # 36 Exhibit U [UNREDACTED], # 37 Exhibit Z [REDACTED], # 38 Exhibit Z [UNREDACTED], # 39 Exhibit AA [REDACTED], # 40 Exhibit AA [UNREDACTED], # 41 Exhibit BB [REDACTED], # 42 Exhibit BB [UNREDACTED], # 43 Exhibit CC [REDACTED], # 44 Exhibit CC [UNREDACTED], # 45 Exhibit DD [REDACTED], # 46 Exhibit DD [UNREDACTED], # 47 Exhibit EE [REDACTED], # 48 Exhibit EE [UNREDACTED], # 49 Exhibit FF [REDACTED], # 50 Exhibit FF [UNREDACTED], # 51 Exhibit II [REDACTED], # 52 Exhibit II [UNREDACTED], # 53 Exhibit JJ [REDACTED], # 54 Exhibit JJ [UNREDACTED], # 55 Exhibit KK [REDACTED], # 56 Exhibit KK [UNREDACTED], # 57 Exhibit ZZ [REDACTED], # 58 Exhibit ZZ [UNREDACTED], # 59 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation [REDACTED] filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/17/2018. Replies due by 10/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel E. Roffman [REDACTED], # 2 Exhibit A to D. Roffman Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone, # 4 Exhibit A [REDACTED], # 5 Exhibit B [REDACTED], # 6 Exhibit C [REDACTED], # 7 Exhibit D [REDACTED], # 8 Exhibit E [REDACTED], # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G [REDACTED], # 11 Exhibit H [REDACTED], # 12 Exhibit I [REDACTED], # 13 Exhibit J [REDACTED], # 14 Exhibit K [REDACTED], # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M [REDACTED], # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P [REDACTED], # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S [REDACTED], # 23 Exhibit T [REDACTED], # 24 Exhibit U [REDACTED], # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Exhibit Z [REDACTED], # 30 Exhibit AA [REDACTED], # 31 Exhibit BB [REDACTED], # 32 Exhibit CC [REDACTED], # 33 Exhibit DD [REDACTED], # 34 Exhibit EE [REDACTED], # 35 Exhibit FF [REDACTED], # 36 Exhibit GG, # 37 Exhibit HH, # 38 Exhibit II [REDACTED], # 39 Exhibit JJ [REDACTED], # 40 Exhibit KK [REDACTED], # 41 Exhibit LL, # 42 Exhibit MM, # 43 Exhibit NN, # 44 Exhibit OO, # 45 Exhibit PP, # 46 Exhibit QQ, # 47 Exhibit RR, # 48 Exhibit SS, # 49 Exhibit TT, # 50 Exhibit UU, # 51 Exhibit VV, # 52 Exhibit WW, # 53 Exhibit XX, # 54 Exhibit YY, # 55 Exhibit ZZ [REDACTED], # 56 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Synopsys, Inc. of Manual Filing Notification (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Telephonic Scheduling Conference, previously set for September 27, 2018, at 3:00 p.m., is moved up to September 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Call-in information remains the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2018. Matter referred to Magistrate Judge for settlement conference to occur in December 2018. FTR Time: 2:03-2:09. Plaintiff Attorney: Claudia Frost. Defendant Attorneys: Jennifer Taylor and Christopher C. Cooke. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Report on Parties' Settlement Efforts filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 9/4/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Bennett (Bennett, James) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING SYNOPSYS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick denying 231 Motion to Continue. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone in Support of 231 MOTION to Continue [Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order to Attend Mediation] [Supplemental Decl. of D. Mingrone ISO Motion to Extend CMC] filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 231 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 231 MOTION to Continue [Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order to Attend Mediation] ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor In Support of Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. and Ubiquiti Networks International Limiteds Opposition to Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc.s Motion to Extend Time for Case Management Conference)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue [Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order to Attend Mediation] filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order to Attend Mediation, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO 211 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; by Ching-Han Tsai. (Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 223 Administrative Motion to Substitute Counsel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO FILE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL REQUEST AS A MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF by Judge William H. Orrick granting 222 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kayvan Ghaffari for Synopsys, Inc. (Ghaffari, Kayvan) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lillian J. Mao for Synopsys, Inc. (Mao, Lillian) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Cooke CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 224 (Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUNBER 225 FOR THE CORRECTION NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Cooke (Cooke, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/23/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Substitute Counsel re 222 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Substitution of Counsel Request as Motion for Admin Relief filed by Ching-Han Tsai. Responses due by 6/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc N. Bernstein, # 2 Declaration of Ching-Han Tsai, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fitton, Will) (Filed on 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Substitution of Counsel Request as Motion for Admin Relief filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Will B. Fitton)(Fitton, Will) (Filed on 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UBIQUITI NETWORKS, INC. AND UBIQUITI NETWORKS INTERNATIONAL LIMITEDS ANSWER TO 211 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/21/2018) Modified on 6/22/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 219 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of MNB iso Stipulation & [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Respond to TAC)(Bernstein, Marc) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 217 Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Revised Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery: 7/27/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modified Schedule filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deleted - filed in error. (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Camila Alicia Tapernoux (Tapernoux, Camila) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Joy Ray (Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S.J. Hung (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/06/18, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 208 Transcript Order, 209 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2018. (Related documents(s) 208, 209 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(1); (2) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(2); (3) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(b); (4) VIOLATION OF 18 U.S.C. 2318; (5) FRAUD; (6) CIVIL RICO, 18 U.S.C. 1964; and (7) NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti International Holding Company Limited, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 6/7/2018) Modified on 6/8/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON PENDING 187, 196, 197 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 6, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion hearing and Case Management Conference held on 6/6/2018. The motion for leave to file third amended complaint is GRANTED. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor.Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2018. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 11/15/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Jury Selection set for 2/19/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Jury Trial set for 2/19/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo-Hebel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct -Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) [to Ching-Han Tsai's Opposition-Dkt. 193] filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct -Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Discovery Letter Brief, Supporting Declaration, and Exhibit filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Redacted Joint Letter Brief)(Related document(s) 199 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/22/2018) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE re 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Ubiquiti has filed a motion to file under seal certain documents Synopsys has designated as confidential or highly confidential under the protective order in this case. Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) provides that "[w]ithin 4 days of the filing of the Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, the Designating Party [i.e., Synopsys] must file a declaration as required by subsection 79-5(d)(1)(A) establishing that all of the designated material is sealable." Synopsys has not filed a declaration. The court extends it until Wednesday, May 23, 2018 at noon to file one if it wishes to do so. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 198 Discovery Letter Brief.As set forth in the attached order, the court declines to order Synopsys to produce printouts of the source code in question. This denial is without prejudice to a future request for source-code printouts, upon a proper showing that such printouts "are reasonably necessary for the preparation of court filings, pleadings, expert reports, or other papers, or for deposition or trial."The court also reminds the parties that discovery letter briefs must be filed under the Civil Events category of "Motions and Related Filings > Motions General > Discovery Letter Brief," not as "Letters," on ECF. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on May 21, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 194 Stipulation re: Supplemental Inspection Protocol and Protective Order. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Discovery Letter Brief, Supporting Declaration, and Exhibit filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Discovery Letter Brief, Supporting Declaration, and Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Discovery Letter Brief, Supporting Declaration, and Exhibit, # 3 [REDACTED] Letter Brief Re Discovery Dispute, # 4 [UNREDACTED] Letter Brief Re Discovery Dispute, # 5 Declaration [REDACTED] of Stuart G. Stubblebine In Support of Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Source Code Printouts, # 6 Declaration [UNREDACTED] of Stuart G. Stubblebine In Support of Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Source Code Printouts, # 7 Exhibit A [UNREDACTED])(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Denise Mingrone and Jennifer Lee Taylor [Joint Letter] Re Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart G. Stubblebine In Support of Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Source Code Printouts, # 2 Declaration of Steve Waldbusser In Support of Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Source Code Printouts, # 3 Declaration of Michael J. Guo In Support of Discovery Letter Brief, # 4 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit In Support of Ubiquitis Opposition to Synopsys, Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit In Support of Ubiquitis Opposition to Synopsys, Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Brewer, Robin) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits ISO Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brewer, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A Unredacted, # 4 Exhibit B Redacted, # 5 Exhibit B Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit D Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit E Unredacted, # 8 Exhibit F Unredacted)(Brewer, Robin) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct -Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor ISO Opposition to Motion to Amend, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Declaration of Hartley Nisenbaum ISO Opposition to Motion to Amend, # 10 Exhibit 1, # 11 Exhibit 2)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 144 Order on Stipulation, 94 Order on Stipulation Supplemental Inspection Protocol and Protective Order filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Fitton, Will) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct -Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) Conditional Statement of Opposition filed byChing-Han Tsai. (Bernstein, Marc) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 190 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached order, the court orders that (subject to the terms of the Protective Order) Ubiquiti's expert Dr. Vojin Oklobdzija can view the call-home data, SNPS00000001, but not the other Synopsys user manuals/technical documents at issue in the discovery letter brief. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 22, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Vojin Oklobdzija, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Robin L. Brewer in Support of 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion to File Third Amended Complaint and Supporting Materials filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 187 ) (Brewer, Robin) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Robin L. Brewer (Brewer, Robin) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Synopsys, Inc.'s Motion to File Third Amended Complaint and Supporting Materials filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Olivier Sinoncelli, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1_Redacted Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 1_Under Seal Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 2_Redacted-Redline Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 2_Under Seal Redline of Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 3_Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 4_Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 5_Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit 6_Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit 7_Under Seal Motion to Amend, # 12 Exhibit 7_Redacted Motion to Amend)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct -Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/16/2018. Replies due by 5/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert Uriarte, # 2 Exhibit 1_Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2_Redline of Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3_Slip Sheet, # 5 Exhibit 4_Slip Sheet, # 6 Exhibit 5_Slip Sheet, # 7 Exhibit 6_Slip Sheet, # 8 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Jennifer Lee Taylor, Stacey M. Sprenkel, Joyce Liou, Christopher Robinson, and Amanda D. Phillips. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Discovery Letter Brief filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 178 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying without prejudice 177 Motion for Reconsideration.As set forth in the attached order, the court denies without prejudice Ubiquiti's motion for reconsideration. The court orders Ubiquiti and SCS to meet and confer for no less than three hours on the issues raised in Ubiquiti's motion. This meet and confer must take place within three business days. If the parties are unable to resolve their dispute, they may submit a joint letter brief to the court. The joint letter brief must contain every argument, and response to the other side's arguments (and to the questions the court raised in its prior order), the parties wish the court to consider. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari in Support of 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Discovery Letter Brief filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 172 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Unredacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/5/2018) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 168 Order, filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor ISO Letter Regarding Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/5/2018) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 171 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached order, the court adopts Synopsys's proposal to identify redacted customer and third-party identities by numerical aliases. The parties should meet and confer to discuss a process whereby Synopsys will provide Ubiquiti with numerical aliases promptly and without undue burden on Ubiquiti. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration 174 of Robert L. Uriarte filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert L. Uriarte, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re 171 Joint Discovery Letter Brief [R. Uriarte Declaration re Ltr. Brief on Redactions Issue] by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor, # 2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit in Support of Discovery Letter Brief, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Unredacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo in Support of Discovery Letter Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C - Redacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Kayvan Ghaffari Decl. in Support re 164 Adm. Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Decl. of M.J. Guo ISO Discovery Letter Brief] filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 158 Discovery Letter Brief.For the reasons set forth in the attached order, the court denies Ubiquiti's motion to compel. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on March 30, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed in error - please disregard and see ECF 168 .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler regarding 163 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached order, the court orders Synopsys to provide Ubiquiti with its response to Ubiquiti's proposed letter brief, ECF No. 163-1, by noon today. The parties may thereafter submit a joint letter brief as set out in the attached order. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Unredacted, # 4 Exhibit I - Unredacted, # 5 Exhibit J - Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit O - Unredacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/28/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Joint Discovery Letter Brief, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit O)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/28/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Discovery Letter Brief and 157 filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 148 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Ted Miracco in Opposition to 158 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre SmartFlow Production - Opposition to Defendant Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.'s Position filed bySmartFlow Compliance Solutions, LLC. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 158 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre SmartFlow Production Exhibit A filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE TO PARTIES. The court has received Ubiquiti's and SmartFlow's joint letter brief, 158 . The letter brief refers to an Exhibit A, but no Exhibit A was attached. The court asks the parties to file Exhibit A on the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Briefre SmartFlow Production filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER.Ubiquiti has filed a motion to file under seal certain documents Synopsys has designated as confidential or highly confidential under the protective order in this case.Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) provides that "[w]ithin 4 days of the filing of the Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, the Designating Party [i.e., Synopsys] must file a declaration as required by subsection 79-5(d)(1)(A) establishing that all of the designated material is sealable." Synopsys has not filed a declaration. The court extends it until Wednesday, March 28, 2018 at noon to file one if it wishes to do so. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on March 27, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on March 22, 2018, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 154 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (Related documents(s) 154 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Discovery Hearing held on 3/22/2018. Court to issue order. FTR Time: 12:58-1:21. Plaintiff's Attorney: Robert Uriarte. Defendants' Attorneys: Jennifer Taylor and Joyce Liou. Also appearing: Marc Bernstein and Will Fitton. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2018) Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. Modified on 3/26/2018 (notewarelS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/22/2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 146 Letter filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. As set forth in the attached order, the court orders the parties to meet and confer regarding the issue of saving forensic inspection results from Ubiquiti's servers. The relevant individuals who have the technical knowledge to solve this problem and who have the authority to agree to any such solution must attend. The court prefers that this meet and confer take place today (i.e., March 23 Taiwan time) but to accommodate the parties, sets an outside deadline of March 23 at 11:59 p.m. Pacific time. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on March 22, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Synopsys 3/18/2018 email, # 2 Synopsys 3/21/2018 email)(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 151 Declaration in Support Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel Roffman filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 151 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Daniel Roffman in Support of 150 Clerk's Notice,,, Setting Discovery Hearing re Request for Emergency Discovery Order filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING: The court sets a hearing on the parties' discovery dispute at 11:00 a.m. The court orders lead trial counsel to confer in person starting at 9:00 a.m. in the witness room located across from Courtroom C on the 15th Floor. The court will call the case last on its calendar. The parties must confer until the court's courtroom deputy retrieves them from the witness room (and should not wait in the courtroom for their case to be called because that is time better spent conferring). Discovery Hearing set for 3/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying without prejudice 147 Discovery Letter Brief.The court has received a discovery letter brief from Ubiquiti. ECF No. 147. The letter brief is not a joint letter brief in accordance with the court's standing order. The parties apparently dispute whether prior discussions constituted a "meet-and-confer" for the purposes of triggering the discovery-dispute letter-briefing process. The court orders the parties to meet and confer for no less than one hour on the issues raised in Ubiquiti's letter brief. This meet and confer must take place within the next 48 hours. If plaintiffs' counsel is outside the Northern District for the next 48 hours, the meet and confer may be by phone; otherwise, the meet and confer must be in person. If the parties are unable to resolve their dispute, the parties may submit a joint letter brief to the court. The court repeats, the letter brief must be joint. Ubiquiti's letter brief is denied without prejudice in lieu of the procedure described above. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit B - Unredacted, # 4 Exhibit D - Unredacted, # 5 Exhibit E - Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit F - Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit G - Unredacted, # 8 Exhibit H - Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit J - Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit K - Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit L - Unredacted, # 12 Exhibit M - Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit N - Unredacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Guo ISO Discovery Letter Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B - Redacted, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D - Redacted, # 6 Exhibit E - Redacted, # 7 Exhibit F - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit G - Redacted, # 9 Exhibit H - Redacted, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J - Redacted, # 12 Exhibit K - Redacted, # 13 Exhibit L - Redacted, # 14 Exhibit M - Redacted, # 15 Exhibit N - Redacted)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Jennifer Lee Taylor . (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick denying 77 Motion for Leave to File, granting 79 Motion to Dismiss, and denying 80 Motion to Strike. Defendants' further motions to amend, if any, should be filed within twenty days of the date below. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler entering 140 Stipulated Protocol Concerning Forensic Inspection of Defendants' Devices. The court enters the parties' stipulation and proposed order regarding their forensic inspection protocol, filed redacted at ECF No. 140 and filed unredacted and under seal at ECF No. 139-4. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 141 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Synopsys has filed a motion to seal portions of the parties' forensic inspection protocol, ECF No. 139. The defendants have not opposed this motion. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 138 filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone in Support of Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protocol Concerning Forensic Inspection of Defendants' Devices filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulated Protocol Concerning Forensic Inspection of Defendants' Devices filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** STIPULATION -Stipulated Protocol Concerning Forensic Inspection of Defendants' Devices filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/6/2018) Modified on 3/6/2018 (wv, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 138 replaced on 3/14/2018) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 133 Stipulation. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 7/18/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/19/2018 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 130 Discovery Letter Brief. The court has the parties' latest joint letter brief, ECF No. 130. As set forth in the attached order, Ubiquiti's objections are overruled. Ubiquiti must make its servers and storage array and the twelve desktops and laptops to which Synopsys refers in the joint letter brief available for forensic inspection (whether through a live inspection, imaging, or some other process as the parties may agree). (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 131 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The defendants have filed a motion to seal portions of the proposed forensic inspection protocol, ECF No. 131. Synopsys has not opposed this motion. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jeffrey Guo (Guo, Michael) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Request For Order Changing Time Of Certain Deadlines Set Forth in Pre-Trial Order filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Claudia Frost, # 2 Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ching-Han Tsai re 131 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Draft Forensic Inspection Protocol (Fitton, Will) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Draft Forensic Inspection Protocol filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit (Public), # 4 Exhibit (Sealed))(Fitton, Will) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Forensic Inspection Protocol filed by Ching-Han Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fitton, Will) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 127 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 128 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.The court has the parties' latest joint letter brief, ECF No. 127. The letter contains the parties' complaints against one another about the discovery negotiation process. What the letter does not contain, however, is any argument by the defendants that Synopsys's forensic inspection requests would impose an undue burden. While the defendants state that Synopsys submitted its latest revision to its forensic protocol only on February 1, 2018, Synopsys has previously provided the defendants a forensic protocol proposal on January 24. More broadly, the defendants have been aware for months of the need to address any burdens associated with forensic inspection generally. See, e.g., Order - ECF No. 104 at 2, 5-6. If the defendants have objections to Synopsys's forensic inspection protocol, including any arguments based on burden, they must meet and confer with Synopsys and, if they are unable to resolve their dispute, must submit a joint letter brief no later than February 12, 2018. The parties may extend this date by stipulation. Given the timing, the parties may meet and confer over the phone instead of in person.Synopsys filed a separate motion to seal portions of its proposed forensic inspection protocol, ECF No. 128. The defendants have not opposed this motion. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Synopsys' Proposed Forensic Protocol filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert L. Uriarte, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Joint Letter- SEALED Proposed Forensic Protocol, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Joint Letter- PUBLIC REDACTED Proposed Forensic Protocol, # 4 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Synopsys' Version of Proposed Forensic Protocol filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Placeholder for Proposed Forensic Protocol Provisionally Filed Under Seal)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on January 25, 2018, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 121 Transcript Order, 122 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2018. (Related documents(s) 121, 122 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR, IN WRONG CASE. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on January 10, 2018, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 121 Transcript Order, 122 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2018. (Related documents(s) 121, 122 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/1/2018) Modified on 2/1/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying without prejudice 114 Discovery Letter Brief; 117 Discovery Letter Brief; 118 Discovery Letter Brief; 119 Discovery Letter Brief.The parties have submitted a number of individual letter briefs regarding their negotiations on a forensic-inspection protocol. The court terminates the letter briefs in favor of the joint letter process required in the court's standing order for discovery disputes, ECF No. [104-1]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 109 Discovery Letter Brief.As set forth in the attached order, the court holds that Ubiquiti's Taiwanese computers are not per se outside the scope of relevant discovery merely because they are located outside the United States.As the court previously advised the parties, discovery, including any forensic inspections of the computers, must comply with the standard discovery factors, including proportionality, burden, and the defendants' legitimate interests in maintaining the integrity of their systems and the confidentiality of their data. If the parties have not yet reached an agreement, they must meet and confer regarding an appropriate inspection protocol. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/25/2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 25, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2018. Matter is argued and submitted. Court will issue order. FTR Time: 9:40-10:08. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Robert Uriarte and Denise Mingrone. Attorneys Jennifer Taylor and Joyce Liou appearing for Defendants Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., et al.Attorneys Marc Bernstein and Will Fitton appearing for Defendant Ching-Han Tsai. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Denise M. Mingrone counsel for Synopsys, Inc., to Judge Beeler addressing Defendants unilateral letter briefs. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/24/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Beeler, Laurel).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Will B. Fitton Re Negotiation of Forensic Inspection Protocol. (Fitton, Will) (Filed on 1/24/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Beeler, Laurel).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Jennifer Lee Taylor Re Negotiation of Forensic Inspection Protocol. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/24/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Beeler, Laurel).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Will Barnett Fitton for Defendant, Ching-Han Tsai (Fitton, Will) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Marc N. Bernstein for Defendant (Bernstein, Marc) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Regarding Status of Forensic Protocol Negotiations. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/18/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Beeler, Laurel). (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Claudia Wilson Frost. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The court has received the parties' joint letter of January 11, 2018, ECF No. 111 . In light of the letter, the court reschedules the hearing currently set for January 18 to January 25, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. and instructs the parties to submit a joint letter by January 18 updating the court on their negotiations regarding a forensic inspection protocol. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on January 16, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from the Parties re Status of Joint Forensics Protocol for Inspection of Devices in Taiwan. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief re 109 Brief, Defendants' Reply ISO Supplemental Brief Re Synopsys' Requests for Inspection filed byChing-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 109 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief re 108 Order, 105 Brief,,,, Synopsys' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief re Extraterritoriality of 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(1) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Related document(s) 108, 105 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/8/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Beeler, Laurel). (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER.The briefing schedule in this discovery dispute is as follows: Defendant's opening brief: 12/29/2017; Plaintiff's opposition: 1/8/2018; Defendant's reply 1/11/2018. The court asks that the reply be filed by 2 p.m. on 1/11/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 102 Transcript Order, 103 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2018. (Related documents(s) 102, 103 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11990021.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/2/2018 filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief re 104 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,, Defendants Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, and Ching-Han Tsai's Brief in Opposition to Synopsys' Requests for Inspection filed byChing-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nazarian, # 2 Declaration of Taylor, # 3 Exhibit A to Taylor Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Taylor Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Tsai, # 6 Exhibit A to Tsai Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Chang Ching Yang, # 8 Declaration of Cheng Ming Chen, # 9 Declaration of Cheng Yu Wang, # 10 Declaration of Chih Hsueh Huang, # 11 Declaration of Chih Wei Fan Chiang, # 12 Declaration of Hayley Nivelle, # 13 Declaration of Hua Lin Hsu, # 14 Declaration of Hui Pin Cheng, # 15 Declaration of Hung Lun Lian, # 16 Declaration of I Feng Lin, # 17 Declaration of Ken Wu, # 18 Declaration of Sheng Feng Wang, # 19 Declaration of Shu Hsun Wu, # 20 Declaration of Ya Chau Yang, # 21 Declaration of Yao Po Wang, # 22 Declaration of Yi Te Lee, # 23 Declaration of Yuchi Chen)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler addressing 99 Discovery Letter Brief. Discovery Hearing set for 1/18/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. As set forth in the attached order, the undersigned is currently inclined to rule that the defendants' computers in Taiwan are not excluded from the scope of discovery. The parties may submit further briefing on the extraterritoriality issue if they wish (although there is no obligation to do so). If they do so, briefing must be complete by January 11, 2018, and a hearing will be set for January 18, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should also meet and confer on the specifics of an appropriate forensic inspection protocol and, if they cannot agree on a solution, may raise issues with the protocol in a joint discovery-dispute letter brief that complies with the undersigned's standing order (attached) by January 11, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/19/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2017.Counsel directed to consider with Magistrate Judge Beeler whether the forensic discovery of computers is more appropriately decided in a motion to compel discovery or in a separate motion for summary judgment. If the parties think that a further case management conference would be useful prior to the hearing on dispositive motions, they should contact deputy clerk Jean Davis for scheduling.FTR Time: 2:01 - 2:10. Plaintiff Attorney: Denise Mingrone; Robert Uriarte. Defendant Attorney: Jennifer Lee Taylor; Amanda Phillips. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2017) Modified on 12/20/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for discovery purposes. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/15/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Synopsys' Motion to Compel Forensic Inspection filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Joint Case Management Statement for Further Case Management Conference] filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/29/17, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 96 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2018. (Related documents(s) 96 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 11/29/2017 re 80 MOTION to Strike, 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims, 79 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated Protective Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 93 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information And/Or Trade Secrets] filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE DOCKET NUMBER 92 FOR THE CORRECT ATTACHMENT ORDER granting 90 STIPULATION to continue hearing as to 79 MOTION to Dismiss, 80 MOTION to Strike, and 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims. Motion Hearing reset for 11/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/8/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017) Modified on 11/14/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 89 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Denise Mingrone ISO of Stipulated Request to Reschedule Hearing Date)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING DATE - Hearing as to 79 MOTION to Dismiss, 80 MOTION to Strike, and 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims reset for 11/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 80 MOTION to Strike 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims, 76 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 79 MOTION to Dismiss UNIL's Counterclaims 2-8 ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 79 MOTION to Dismiss UNIL's Counterclaims 2-8 ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2017) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 80 MOTION to Strike 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims, 76 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ching-Han Tsai, # 2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2017) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims ) filed byUbiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor In Support of Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.s Reply to Synopsys, Inc.s Opposition to Defendant Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to file reply to 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims. Reply due by 10/13/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE - Hearing as to 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims reset for 11/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims, 76 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/17/2017. Replies due by 10/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Norman F. Kelly, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit of Anthony Tartaglio, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Affidavit of Elizabeth Walker, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2017) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss UNIL's Counterclaims 2-8 filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/17/2017. Replies due by 10/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anthony Tartaglio, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2017) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Norman F. Kelly, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit of Anthony Tartaglio, # 5 Exhibit 1)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/3/2017) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lee Taylor In Support of Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Counterclaimant Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.s Motion for Leave yo File Amended Counterclaims)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANTS UBIQUITI NETWORKS, INC., UBIQUITI NETWORKS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, AND CHING-HAN TSAIS ANSWER to 73 Second Amended Complaint AND UBIQUITI NETWORKS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED'S, COUNTERCLAIM against Synopsys, Inc. byChing-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2017) Modified on 9/20/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 74 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(1); (2) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(2); (3) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201 (b); (4)VIOLATION OF 18 U.S.C. 2318; (5) FRAUD; (6) CIVIL RICO, 18 U.S.C. 1964; (7) NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;-Synopsys, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint against Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti International Holding Company Limited, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Filed bySynopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 9/5/2017) Modified on 9/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Hon. William H. Orrick; granting 71 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 54 Motion to Strike. If Synopsys wishes to file a further Amended Complaint, it must do so within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT re ADR by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT re ADR by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION EFFORTS; filed by Synopsys, Inc.(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 6/29/2017) Modified on 6/30/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/14/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 64 Transcript Order, 63 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 7/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2017. (Related documents(s) 64 , 63 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/20/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 14, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 14, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re 34 . 35 Motions to Dismiss and 54 MOTION to Strike held on 6/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2017). Close of Fact Discovery: 2/16/2018. Dispositive Motions to be heard 5/16/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/20/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick.Total Time in Court 1 hour, 3 minutes. Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2017) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leonard Robinson (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 54 MOTION to Strike Synopsys, Inc.'s Amended Affirmative Defenses in Their Entirety); -Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Synopsys' Amended Affirmative Defenses filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/30/2017) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER 60 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Synopsys' Amended Affirmative Defenses filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/30/2017) Modified on 6/2/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 47 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 54 MOTION to Strike Synopsys, Inc.'s Amended Affirmative Defenses in Their Entirety ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A - MNDA, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B - Evaluation License, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C - Download Click-Through Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Attachment D - Privacy Policy)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA RE 50 Part 2; by Ubiquiti Networks International (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Reply) of Ching-Han Tsai In Support of Defendant Ubiquiti Networks International Limited (UNIL)s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/11/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing CMC and motion hearing. Hearing continued as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims and 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2017, 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Synopsys, Inc.'s Amended Affirmative Defenses in Their Entirety filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/23/2017. Replies due by 5/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re 50 Reply to Opposition/Response, Objection to Improper Reply Evidence by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed byChing-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2017) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) or Alternatively for Failure to State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed byUbiquiti Networks International Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of S. Wang, # 2See Docket Number 56 Notice of Errata Declaration of C. Tsai)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 48 Administrative Motion seeking additional pages for Reply. The motion is DENIED. The Reply shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER.(wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Excess Pages filed by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Responses due by 5/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jennifer Lee Taylor, # 2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Synopsys, Inc. and Defendants [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 46 ] filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER 47 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Synopsys, Inc. and Defendants filed by Synopsys, Inc.(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/26/2017) Modified on 4/27/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ubiquiti Networks International Limited) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ching-Han Tsai) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 38 Stipulation. The Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses 32 is DENIED as moot. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document image associated with this order. (COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/25/2017) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) or Alternatively for Failure to State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED 28 ANSWER TO UBIQUITI NETWORKS, INC.'S 19 COUNTERCLAIMS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; bySynopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/18/2017) Modified on 4/19/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference continued to 5/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (to coincide with hearing on motions). Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) or Alternatively for Failure to State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/25/2017. Replies due by 5/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ching-Han Tsai, # 2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/25/2017. Replies due by 5/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Michelle Sprenkel (Sprenkel, Stacey) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Synopsys, Inc.'s Fifteen Affirmative Defenses filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/25/2017. Replies due by 5/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 27 Amended Complaint,, [Notice of Errata] (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER TO 19 COUNTERCLAIM [Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Ubiquiti Network, Inc.'s Counterclaims] bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/28/2017) Modified on 3/29/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(1); (2) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(a)(2); (3) VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201(b); (4) VIOLATION OF 18 U.S.C 2318; (5) FRAUD; (6) CIVIL RICO, 18 U.S.C. 1964; (7) NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks International Limited, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/28/2017) Modified on 3/29/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement (Disclosure Statement) by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ubiquiti Networks International Limited. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/30/2017. Replies due by 4/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grace Chen, # 2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 22 Case Management Scheduling Order, served on defendant Ubiquiti Networks International Limited (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 22 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/8/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Synopsys, Inc. byChing-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ching-Han Tsai, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc... (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/20/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synopsys, Inc.. Ubiquiti Networks International Limited served on 2/28/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Danielle Phillips (Phillips, Amanda) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Liou (Liou, Joyce) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee Taylor (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION [Joint] To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synopsys, Inc... (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synopsys, Inc.. Ching-Han Tsai served on 2/7/2017, answer due 2/28/2017. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synopsys, Inc.. Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. served on 2/6/2017, answer due 2/27/2017. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/3/17. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/17/2017. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Synopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT For (1) Violation of Digital Millennium Copyright Act 17 U.S.C. Sections 1201, et seq.; and (2) Aiding and Abetting Violations of Digital Millennium Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. Section 1201, et seq. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11128738.). Filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Hearing Date as to 241 MOTION for Sanctions, 256 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 264 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI AND WILLIAM HASLER, 249 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for 11/26/2018 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to 249 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for 11/21/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset hearing as to 249 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 11/21/2018 to special time of 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Remark: Regarding the order granting Synopsys's motion to remove ECF No. 138 from the docket, the clerk clarifies that the document cannot be removed from the docket but that it will remain locked. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing re 112 Order,, Discovery Hearing set for 1/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines omitted in the docketing of 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims. Response due by 10/3/2017. Reply due by 10/10/2017. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 67 Stipulation filed by Synopsys, Inc. Correct Event is Status Report not Stipulation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Deadline as to 54 MOTION to Strike Synopsys, Inc.'s Amended Affirmative Defenses in Their Entirety. Motion Hearing reset for 6/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Initial docket entry errantly indicated the hearing date as 6/14/2018.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?