BTIG, LLC v. Floyd Associates, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00921

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2019 at 12:38 AM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BTIG, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T Nonaka +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 snonaka@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vikram S Shah +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 vikram.shah@sidley.com
No Logo Marc Wade, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kasey Curtis +1 213 457 8089 kcurtis@reedsmith.com
No Logo Scott C. Dorey, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Bowe +1 212 506 1777 +1 212 506 1800 mbowe@kasowitz.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gavin Douglas Schryver +1 212 506 1891 +1 212 506 1800 gschryver@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brittany Jane Shugart +1 424 288 7908 +1 424 288 7901 bshugart@kasowitz.com
v.
No Logo BHP International Markets Limited, Defendant
No Logo David Hersh Connors, Defendant
No Logo Floyd Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jacques Tizabi, Defendant
No Logo Jay Martin Chapler, Defendant
No Logo Marc Wade, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kasey Curtis +1 213 457 8089 kcurtis@reedsmith.com
No Logo Mark E. Valentine, Defendant
No Logo Scott C. Dorey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Bowe +1 212 506 1777 +1 212 506 1800 mbowe@kasowitz.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gavin Douglas Schryver +1 212 506 1891 +1 212 506 1800 gschryver@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brittany Jane Shugart +1 424 288 7908 +1 424 288 7901 bshugart@kasowitz.com
No Logo BTIG, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T Nonaka +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 snonaka@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vikram S Shah +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 vikram.shah@sidley.com
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 0009
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Compel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal re Stipulation for Protective Order 137 . (see order for details) (hr)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), re Judgment 96 served on June 20, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The request to consolidate CV 17-921 DSF (SSx) and CV 17-3165 DSF (SSx) is GRANTED. The lower-numbered case, CV 17-921 DSF (SSx), is designated the master file. All documents filed hereafter shall bear the name and number of that case. Case number CV 17-3165 DSF (SSx) is closed. All further documents are to be e-filed only in the master file and the clerk shall note that no further documents are to be filed in the higher numbered case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        RESPONSE filed by Counter Defendants BTIG, LLC, BTIG, LLC, BTIG, LLC, Plaintiff BTIG, LLCto Objection 92 Response to Objections Filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey on June 15, 2017 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Nonaka, Scott)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey, re Objection 92 served on June 15, 2017. (Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging 90 / Notice Of Objection And Objection To [Proposed] Judgment filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey. (Schryver, Gavin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminated Case, 89 , Notice of Lodging 90 served on 6/14/2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Judgment re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminated Case, 89 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order GRANTING BTIG LLC's Petitions to Confirm Arbitration Award and DENYING Scott C. Dorey's Petitions to Vacate Arbitration Award by Judge Dale S. Fischer:, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), re Appendix 87 , Declaration,, 86 , Order on Motion to Enforce, Motion Hearing 85 served on June 8, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      APPENDIX filed by Counter Defendants BTIG, LLC, BTIG, LLC, BTIG, LLC, Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. Re: Declaration,, 86 APPENDIX OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shah, Vikram)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Vikram S. Shah re Order on Motion to Enforce, Motion Hearing 85 filed by Counter Defendants BTIG, LLC, BTIG, LLC, BTIG, LLC, Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Shah, Vikram)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTES OF Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award 45 Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Vikram S. Shah at sfdocket@sidley.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Respondent Scott C. Dorey for Court Reporter. Court will contact Gavin D. Schryver at Courtnotices@kasowitz.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), re Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, 26 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, 16 , Waiver of Service Executed 19 , Summons Request 15 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, 12 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 44 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), 22 , Waiver of Service Executed 18 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 31 , Order Extending Answer Due Deadline 40 , Summons Request 14 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 39 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, 29 , Summons Request 10 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Scott C. Dorey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19532130) 35 , Notice (Other) 3 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), 23 , Summons Issued 25 , Summons Request 11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 7 , Summons Request 9 , Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), 37 , Summons Issued 24 , Waiver of Service Executed 28 , Answer to Petition (case opening),, Counterclaim, 41 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 33 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 32 , Summons Issued 17 , Appendix 46 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 38 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 27 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Summons Request 21 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),, 43 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gavin D. Schryver to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Scott C. Dorey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19532317) 36 , Notice (Other) 42 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 8 , Summons Request 13 , Summons Request 20 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, 30 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 4 served on Respondents BHP International Markets, Ltd., Mark E. Valentine, and Scott C. Dorey served on April 7, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Jay Martin Chapler. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, of Reply On Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award and Opposition to Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award, Declarations of Steven A. Druskin and Scott T. Nonaka served on 05/23/2017. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        DECLARATION of SCOTT T. NONAKA IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 19, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DECLARATION of STEVEN A. DRUSKIN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            REPLY BY PETITIONER BTIG LLC ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRAL AWARD AND OPPOSITION TO DOREY'S COUNTER-PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRAL AWARD filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              EXHIBIT D to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 Exhibit D to The Declaration of Gavin D. Schryver in Support of Respondent Scott C. Dorey's Opposition to BTIG LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award and in Support of Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey. (Schryver, Gavin)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 74 filed on 5/19/17 is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 11-3.8 which requires a title page on the first page of all documents filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** EXHIBIT D to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 / Exhibit D to The Declaration of Gavin D. Schryver in Support of Respondent Scott C. Dorey's Opposition to BTIG LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbital Award and in Support of Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbiral Award filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey. (Schryver, Gavin) Modified on 5/19/2017 (dp).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Respondent Marc Wade filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,, 71 served on May 15, 2017. (Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 / Respondent Scott C. Dorey's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to BTIG LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award and in Support of Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gavin D. Schryver in Support of Respondent Scott C. Dorey's Opposition to BTIG LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award and in Support of Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Scott C. Dorey's Opposition to BTIG LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award and in Support of Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award, # 8 Proposed Order on Scott C. Dorey's Opposition to BTIG LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award and in Support of Dorey's Counter-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award)(Schryver, Gavin)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Answer to Petition (case opening),, Counterclaim, 41 , Motion to Vacate, 63 filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Curtis, Kasey) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey, (Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Petition (case opening) 64 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-03165 (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey, re Answer to Petition (case opening) 64 , Counterclaim 65 served on April 27, 2017. (Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant BTIG, LLC, filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey.(Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 /Answer And Affirmative Defenses Of Scott C. Dorey To Petition To Confirm Arbitral Award filed by Defendant Scott C. Dorey.(Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Vacate Arbitral Award filed by Respondent Marc Wade. Application set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kasey Curtis, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Curtis, Kasey)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Vacate, 59 filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Curtis, Kasey) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 58 filed on 4/26/17 is stricken. Counter-claims must be filed separately. Counsel to refile properly. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey, re Answer to Petition (case opening),, Counterclaim, 58 served on April 26, 2017 and April 27, 2017. (Schryver, Gavin) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ** WITHDRAWN** APPLICATION to Vacate Arbitral Award filed by Respondent Marc Wade. Application set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kasey Curtis, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Curtis, Kasey) Modified on 4/27/2017 (dp).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** i> ANSWER to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 /Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Scott C. Dorey to Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award and Counter-Petition to Vacate Award, COUNTERCLAIM against BTIG, LLC filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey.(Schryver, Gavin) Modified on 4/27/2017 (dp). (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Patrick Gonya of Service on Mark E. Valentine filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC, Counter Defendant BTIG, LLC (Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (L.R. 83-1.4) filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award from 06/05/2017 to 60 days after New York court rules on motions to transfer related cases Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIO 54 filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Curtis, Kasey)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ** WITHDRAWN ** EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award from 06/05/2017 to 60 days after New York court rules on motions to transfer related cases Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kasey Curtis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) (Curtis, Kasey) Modified on 4/19/2017 (dp).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Withdraw APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award from June 5, 2017 to 60 days after New York court rules on pending transfer motions Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Pe 49 filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Curtis, Kasey)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Scott C. Dorey, 3280 Thompson Crescent, West Vancouver, BC V7V3E7 Canada on April 7, 2017 (bp) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Mark E. Valentine, 120 Dunvegan Rd. Toronto, ON M4V 2RS Canada on April 7, 2017 (bp) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to BHP International Markets, Ltd., No. 10 Caves Professional Centre Caves Village West Bay Street PO Box SP 64133 Nassau, NP, The Bahmas on 4/7/17 (bp) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award from June 5, 2017 to 60 days after New York court rules on pending transfer motions Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kasey Curtis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) (Curtis, Kasey)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Appendix 46 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 served on Respondent David Hersh Connors served on April 10, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Appendix 46 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 served on Respondents Floyd Associates, Inc. and Jacques Tizabi served on April 7, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC, Counter Defendant BTIG, LLC. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award 45 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities (Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott T. Nonaka, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Proposed Order) (Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by RESPONDENT Marc Wade, (Curtis, Kasey) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Petition (case opening),, Counterclaim, 41 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Firm Name Change filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey. (Shugart, Brittany) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          [WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL DOCKET ENTRY #70] OPPOSITION/ ANSWER to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 COUNTERAPPLICATION/, COUNTERCLAIM against BTIG, LLC filed by Respondent Marc Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kasey Curtis, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Kasey J Curtis added to party Marc Wade(pty:dft))(Curtis, Kasey) (bp). Modified on 5/17/2017 (bp). (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL PETITION BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS 37 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting 35 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Specially Appearing Respondent Scott C. Dorey, designating Brittany J. Shugart as local counsel. (pso)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting 36 Non-Resident Attorney Gavin D. Schryver APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Specially Appearing Respondent Scott C. Dorey, designating Brittany J. Shugart as local counsel. (pso)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 26, 2017 re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brittany J. Shugart, # 2 Proposed Order)(Shugart, Brittany) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gavin D. Schryver to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Scott C. Dorey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19532317) filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Or der) (Shugart, Brittany)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Scott C. Dorey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19532130) filed by Respondent Scott C. Dorey. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Orde r) (Attorney Brittany Jane Shugart added to party Scott C. Dorey(pty:dft)) (Shugart, Brittany)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 27 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer served on March 3, 2017. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 27 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 27 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer served on March 3, 2017. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 27 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer served on March 2, 2017. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Summons Issued 24 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice (Other) 3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 7 on Scott C. Dorey served on February 28, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice (Other) 3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 8 , Summons Issued 25 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 7 on BHP International Markets Limited served on February 28, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Waiver of the Service of Summons WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. upon Marc Wade waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2017, answer due 4/4/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Kasey Curtis. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASESSTANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (ah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Summons Issued 17 , Notice (Other) 3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, 8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 7 served on served on Respondent Mark E. Valentine served on February 24, 2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant BHP International Markets Limited. (bp) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Scott C. Dorey. (bp) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 7 served on Respondents Floyd Associates, Inc., Jacques Tizabi, Marc Wade, David Hersh Connors, and Jay Martin Chapler served on 02/8/2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice (Other) 3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 4 served on Respondents Floyd Associates, Inc., Jacques Tizabi, Marc Wade, David Hersh Connors, and Jay Martin Chapler served on 2/3/2017. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. upon David Hersh Connors waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2017, answer due 4/4/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Liam O'Brien. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. upon Jay Martin Chapler waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2017, answer due 4/4/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Liam O'Brien. (Shah, Vikram) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition 1 as to Respondent Mark E. Valentine. (lom) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 14 , Summons Request 13 . The following error(s) was found: See : To: (Defendants name and address). The name must appear as in the caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 9 , Summons Request 10 , Summons Request 11 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Petitioner BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BTIG, LLC, (Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION to Confirm Arbitral Award Receipt No: 0973-19309730 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff BTIG, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vikram Shah, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E) (Attorney Scott T Nonaka added to party BTIG, LLC(pty:pla))(Nonaka, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?