Milton v. Johnson
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-08046
District Judge Paul G. Gardephe, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2017 at 11:14 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Milton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Amy Jane Agnew, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Jane Agnew +1 973 600 1724 aj@ajagnew.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "New York City"
No Logo New York City Police , Defendant
No Logo Police Officer Phillip Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Bridge +1 212 356 2347 +1 212 356 3509 mbridge@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Brustein +1 212 356 2651 +1 212 356 3509 ebrustei@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYS Commission of Investigation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ferrari +1 212 356 5058 dferrari@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2016 Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO ACCEPT CLOTHING FOR TRIAL granting 129 Letter Motion to Expedite. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the METROPOLITAN CORRECTIONAL CENTER accept two (2) sets of trial clothes from Amy Jane Agnew, Esq. and deliver them to inmate Robert Milton #14A4359. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/31/2017) (cf) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Evan Brustein dated January 31, 2017 re: 123 FIRST MOTION in Limine to Suppress Evidence. . Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Brustein, Evan) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      LETTER MOTION to Expedite Order for Acceptance of Trial Clothes addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated January 31, 2017. Document filed by Robert Milton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        LETTER MOTION to Expedite Testimony by Telephone of Dr. Milord addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated January 31, 2017. Document filed by Robert Milton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-mail Exhibit)(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Robert Milton.(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the trial of this matter presently scheduled for February 6, 2017 is adjourned to February 7, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. It is further ORDERED that there shall be a conference in this matter on February 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Jury Trial set for 2/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe., Status Conference set for 2/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/30/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 123 FIRST MOTION in Limine to Suppress Evidence. . Document filed by Robert Milton. (Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DECLARATION of Amy Jane Agnew in Support re: 123 FIRST MOTION in Limine to Suppress Evidence.. Document filed by Robert Milton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, part 2)(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  FIRST MOTION in Limine to Suppress Evidence. Document filed by Robert Milton. Return Date set for 2/2/2017 at 09:00 AM.(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT (Jointly Submitted Proposed Verdict Sheets). Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Exhibit List and Scanned Exhibits. Document filed by Robert Milton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Numbers 1 - 14, # 2 Exhibit Numbers 15 - 22, # 3 Exhibit Numbers 23 - 27, # 4 Exhibit Numbers 28 - 41)(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Robert Milton.(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Exhibit List and Copies of Defendant's Proposed Trial Exhibits. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Disposition, # 2 Exhibit B, Sprint Report)(Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Brustein, Evan) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 109 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File JPTO. The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LAW STUDENT APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Michael Sheflin):(a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (As further set forth in this Form.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LAW STUDENT APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Annabel Pollioni):(a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (As further set forth in this Form.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Mary Speight on behalf of Phillip Johnson. (Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Craig Brustein on behalf of Phillip Johnson. (Brustein, Evan) (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File JPTO addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated January 14, 2017. Document filed by Robert Milton.(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/14/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying 100 Letter Motion to Reopen. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 100) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/13/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum as to Robert Milton . Document filed by Robert Milton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying 105 Letter Motion to Stay; denying 105 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Submissions. The application is denied. Plaintiff is to provide Plaintiff's portion of the joint pretrial order forth with. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/6/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Pretrial Submission Deadlines addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Ferrari, Esq. dated January 5, 2017., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Submissions addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Ferrari, Esq. dated January 5, 2017. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Ferrari, David) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Ferrari, Esq. dated December 29, 2016 re: 100 LETTER MOTION to Reopen or Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated December 19, 2016. . Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Ferrari, David) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Ferrari, Esq. dated December 29, 2016. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Ferrari, David) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 101 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 100 LETTER MOTION to Reopen or Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated December 19, 2016. The Application is granted. (Responses due by 12/29/2016). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/23/2016) (cla) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Ferrari, Esq. dated December 21, 2016. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Ferrari, David) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER MOTION to Reopen or Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated December 19, 2016. Document filed by Robert Milton.(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated December 12, 2016. Document filed by Robert Milton.(Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Amy Jane Agnew on behalf of Robert Milton (Agnew, Amy) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for interested party City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Attorney Morgan David Kunz terminated) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2016) (cla) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Morgan D. Kunz to Withdraw as Attorney for interested party City of New York. Document filed by City of New York.(Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the joint pretrial order, motions in limine, proposed voir dire, and requests to charge in this matter are due on January 17, 2017. Any responsive papers are due January 31, 2017. Motions due by 1/17/2017. Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/17/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 93 Letter Motion to Expedite. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/16/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Expedite Counsel Calls addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amy Jane Agnew dated November 15, 2016. Document filed by Robert Milton.(Agnew, Amy) Modified on 11/28/2016 (ldi). (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for the appointment of pro bono counsel is granted. The Pro Se Office is directed to seek pro bono counsel for Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that due to a scarcity of volunteer attorneys, a lengthy period of time may pass before counsel is identified, and he must continue to diligently prosecute his case in the interim. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time For the Parties to Submit a Joint Pretrial Order addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Ferrari, Esq. dated October 25, 2016. Document filed by Phillip Johnson.(Ferrari, David) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for October 13, 2016 is adjourned to October 27, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiff, who cannot be present due to his incarceration, is directed to call chambers at (212) 805-0224. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to Robert Milton, 14-A-4359, Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001 Main, Dannemora, NY 12929. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 10/27/2016 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/13/2016) (ama) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. No. 79). It is further ORDERED that trial in this matter will begin on February 6, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse. There will be a conference in this matter on October 13, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/28/2016) (kl) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        LETTER from Robert Milton dated 7/25/16 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court inform him as to the status of his case. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          LETTER from Robert Milton dated 4/19/2016 re: My reason for writing the Court is to inquire about the status of the Courts stand on the case. Document filed by Robert Milton.(rdz) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Ferrari on behalf of Phillip Johnson. (Ferrari, David) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              LETTER from Robert Milton dated 2/9/16 re: Plaintiff writes to the Court to inquire about the status of this case and his Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and to present to the Court the Plaintiff's Pro Se Appellant Brief presented to the Honorable Aprilanne Agostino, Clerk of the Court, on 11/17/15(see attached as indicated). Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 12/1/15 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court order the N.Y.P.D. to turn over the digital video footage of the plaintiff entering the 101 Precinct on 9/22/12 at approximately 2:45 to 3:35 etc. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton. dated 11/30/15 re: PLAINTIFF'S REBUTTAL TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Ashanti, Karl) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Ashanti, Karl) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Karl J. Ashanti in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Ashanti, Karl) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Phillip Johnson. Responses due by 12/24/2015(Ashanti, Karl) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            LETTER from Robert Milton dated 11/2/15 re: Plaintiff submits this letter to support his opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment and his motion for cross-summary judgment; and he informs the Court that the attached medical records(as indicated) establish a material fact to support both of his motions. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karl Joseph Ashanti on behalf of City of New York, Phillip Johnson. (Ashanti, Karl) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                (Affirmation)PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CROSS JUDGMENT. Document filed by Robert Milton. (sc) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 73 Letter filed by Phillip Johnson. Defendant respectfully requests that the Court endorse the following briefing schedule for his motion: Motion due November 24, 2015; Plaintiff's Opposition due December 24, 2015; Defendants' reply due January 7, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: The briefing schedule proposed in this letter is adopted by the Court. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 11/24/2015., Responses due by 12/24/2015, Replies due by 1/7/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/07/2015) (ama) (Main Document 75 replaced on 10/7/2015) (ama). (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton dated 9/25/15 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that the defendant sent him a copy of his medical record after he sent his authorization as ordered; and that the defendant attorney stated previously that they could not release the names of the officers who were assigned to keep him secured in the hospital on 9/22/12. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated September 25, 2015 re: Close of Discovery and Defendant's Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 71 Letter request regarding Plaintiff's Refusal to Provide a Medical Release, filed by Phillip Johnson. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is directed to provide defense counsel with a new original release for his medical records by Sept. 11, 2015. The Clerk will send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the address listed on page 2 of this letter. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/28/2015) (kl) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated August 26, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Refusal to Provide a Medical Release. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's August 17th Letter))(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 69 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is granted. (Discovery due by 9/24/2015.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated August 7, 2010. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                LETTER from Robert Milton dated 6/16/15 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that the reason for writing this letter is to remind the Court of his discovery request for the names of the officers who were assigned to stand as security while he was in the hospital,and the names of the officers who transported him to and from the hospital. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Robert Milton, dated 6/29/15 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that, on 6/29/15, he received a letter from the defendant, Phillip Johnson, requesting another 45-day extension of discovery to acquire the plaintiff's medical records; that they also falsefully stated that the plaintiff requested a copy of his own medical records from them; and that they are again using stall tactics to try and get around giving him the discovery request of the E.M.S. Transport Manifest. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 64 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 65 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is Granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. Nos. 64 and 65. SO ORDERED. Discovery due by 8/10/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/01/2015) (ama) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated July 1, 2015. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Matthew Bridge dated June 24, 2015. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          LETTER from Matthew Bridge, Assistant Corporation Counsel dated 4/15/15 re: Defendant Phillip Johnson informs the Court that he is not aware of any incident involving the plaintiff which occurred at the 101st Precinct on 9/22/12; and that this defendant has conducted a search for a Precinct Supervisor or Desk Sergeant Report and for any video from that place on 9/22/12, but has determined that no such docments exist. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 61 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Insofar as plaintiff seeks additional discovery from defendants (see Doc. 59), that request is denied for reasons summarized in defendant's response (Doc. 61).Discovery is extended until June 26, 2015 to allow defendant to obtain medical records and, if needed, arrange for a physical exam of plaintiff. SO ORDERED.Discovery due by 6/26/2015. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/23/2015) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Matthew Bridge dated April 22, 2015. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 4/11/15 re: PLAINTIFF'S NOTIFICATION OF BEING TESTED FOR NERVE DAMAGE VIA AN "ELECTROMYOGRAM". Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 2/6/15 re: Plaintiff writes to the Court in response to the defendant's letter received on 4/6/15; and the plaintiff requests that the Court mandate the defendant to provide the Court with aforementioned discovery. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Deeming plaintiff's letter dated April 2, 2015 and filed with the court on April 8, 2015 to be a motion to compel, we hereby DENY plaintiff's motion except insofar as our order dated April 7, 2015 requires defendant to conduct a specific search related to the alleged incident at the 101st precinct. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/13/2015) Copies Sent By Chambers. (kko) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Matthew Bridge dated April 10, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Letter Dated April 2, 2015. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 4/2/15 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he received on 4/2/15, via the facility package room, the same box which was sent to him by the City of New York Law Department; but it only contained a copy of his trial transcript etc. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: We address below plaintiff's complaints about discovery (see letter from Robert Milton dated March 23, 2015): Defendant's counsel has resent the box of documents rejected by plaintiff's prison authorities. The E.M.S. Transport manifest cannot be produced unless plaintiff signs and returns an F.D.N.Y. medical records release form. He has not yet done so despite defendant's having sent him the form. Defendant is to determine by April 14, 2015 whether the N.Y.P.D. has any documents or video pertaining to an alleged incident involving plaintiff at the 101st precinct, and is to advise plaintiff in writing by April 15, 2015. Defendant appears to have complied with all other discovery objections to date, and has justified the redactions made by his counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/07/2015) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton dated 3/25/2015 re: My reason for writing is to inform the court that I had received two things of legal documents from the Corporation Counsel City of New York Law Department. Document filed by Robert Milton.(ama) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute:* Dkt. Nos. 51, 52. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to pro se Plaintiff Robert Milton, 14-A-4359, Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001 Main, Dannemora, NY 12929. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/03/2015) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (ama) Modified on 4/6/2015 (ama). (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated April 3, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Demands. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 3/23/15 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he received two things in the mail from Mr. Matthew Bridge from the City of New York Law Department, but he was not allowed to receive the box which which came through the facility package because it did not have official letter heads and was not stenciled; and the other envelope did not contain that which he was requesting(the E.M.S. transport manifest). Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defense counsel mail a copy of Defendant's discovery disclosures to Plaintiff at the address listed below. If Plaintiff believes that he is entitled to additional documents after reviewing Defendant's disclosures, he must write a letter to this Court by April 2, 2015 indicating what is still outstanding. Any response by Defendant is due by April 9, 2015. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to prose Plaintiff Robert Milton. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/19/2015) (kko) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from R. Milton dated 3/11/15 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he has read the foregoing record of his testimony taken at the time and place noted in the heading hereof, and he does acknowledge it to be a true and correct transcript of same. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for March 19, 2015, at 12:30 p.m. will take place on March 19, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/13/2015) (ama) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated March 12, 2015 re: Defendant's Intention to Move for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard A. Brown, dated 2/17/15 re: Plaintiff submits this letter to request the following Brody and Rosario material etc.: Copy of E.M.S. Transport Manifest (E.M.T. - Jacob Elliot), Unredacted Memo Book of Officers Johnson and Areskog, Precinct Supervisor Report on Incident in Precinct(101 Pct.), Identificaton of Hospital Transport Officers, Hospital's Identification of Officers Assigned to Security etc. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton re: Plaintiff requests that the Court grant an extension of discovery in this matter for forty-five days, until 3/19/15; and the plaintiff informs the Court that he has enough evidence and still more to obtain from the defendant to warrant this case to go forward and present to a jury. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 40 Letter filed by Robert Milton. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Denied. Plaintiff has not explained why the transcripts of this trial on criminal charges is necessary for him to proceed with this Secion 1983 Claim. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/10/2015) (ama) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from Robert Milton dated 1/21/15 re: Plaintiff submits this letter to the Court to request the following discovery: a copy of E.M.S. Transport Manifest, the unredacted memo book of officers Johnson and partner, the Precinct Supervisor Report of Incident in Lobby, Video from Precinct Lobby - Inside/Outside etc. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is granted. Pre-motion letters are due on March 12, 2015. The Jan. 26, 2015 telephone conference is adjourned to March 19, 2015 at 12:30 p.m. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 41. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2015) (kl) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated January 15, 2015. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 1/5/15 re: Plaintiff requests the assistance of the Court in obtaining the complete file transcript from his criminal case in order to prepare his civil trial strategy and offense. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 Letter filed by Phillip Johnson. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant is directed to provide a pre-motion letter to this Court with the proposed briefing schedule. That letter will be submitted by Jan. 23, 2015. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/13/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated January 12, 2015 re: Defendant's Intention to Move for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED UPON THE CONSENT OF THE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND COMMUNITY SUPERVISION: (1) that the Superintendent or other official in charge of Clinton Correctional Facility transport and produce inmate ROBERT MILTON, Inmate No. 14 A 4359, from Clinton Correctional Facility,located in Dannemora, New York, to Downstate Correctional Facility, located in Fishkill, New York, for the taking of his deposition on Friday, January 16, 2015, at 11:00 A.M., and for so long thereafter, from day to day, as the deposition continues; (2) that inmate Robert Milton appear in such place as designated by the Superintendent or other official in charge of Downstate Correctional Facility so his deposition may be taken; (3) that also present at the deposition will be Matthew Bridge, attorney for Defendant, and a court reporter to be designated by Defendant; and (4) that the Superintendent or other official in charge of Downstate Correctional Facility permit the court reporter to bring into the facility such equipment as is necessary for the recording and transcription of Plaintiff's deposition. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/31/2014) (ama) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 35 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Conference is adjourned to Jan. 26, 2015 at 12:30 p.m. and will proceed telephonically. Defendant will make the necessary arraignments. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 35. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2015 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/31/2014) (ama) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for Martin Luther King, Jr. Day, and Request that the Court Endorse the Attached Order Regarding the Transfer of Plaintiff for his Deposition addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated December 30, 2014. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    **Plaintiff informs the Court that he would like to participate in the conference via telephone on 1/19/15; and he requests that arrangements be made with the facility administration to allow him to do so via the counseling staff. PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 12/23/14 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Milton. New Address: DIN#14A4359, Clinton Corr. Facility, P.O. Box 2001 Main, Dannemora, New York, 12929. (sc) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated December 22, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Requests for Medical Records. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 12/10/14 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Milton. New Address: DIN#14A4359, Sing Sing Corr. Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, New York, 10562. *Plaintiff requests that the Court provide him with a copy of his medical record.* (sc) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from Robert Milton dated 11/24/14 re: Plaintiff requests that Clerk's Office send him a copy of lost medical record which he sent to the Pro Se Office on 9/21/14. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 11/14/14 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Milton. New Address: DIN#14A4359, Sing Sing Corr. Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, New York, 10562. ** (Docket Sheet Request: Mailed) (sc) Modified on 11/19/2014 (sc). (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              (LETTER) PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 11/1/2014 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Milton. New Address: 14-A-4359, Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562. (vn) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 10/8/14 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Milton. New Address: DIN#14A4359, Downstate Corr. Facility, Box F, Red Schoolhouse Road, Fishkill, New York, 12524-0445. (sc) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton re: Plaintiff informs the Court that the reason for this communication is to give the defending attorneys and the Court the medical records from his visit with the neurologist on 9/18/14. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from Robert Milton re: Plaintiff submits this communication with attached "Progress Note" from Dr. Olga Segal,MD to the Court in order to give the defending attorneys and the Court his medical records from his 9/18/14 visit with the neurologist. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 9/22/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 9/22/2014. Deposition due by 1/21/2015. Fact Discovery due by 1/21/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 3 to 5 days. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order by certified mail to pro se Plaintiff Robert Milton, B&C# 4411209431, George R. Vierno Center, 09-09 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/21/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER from Robert Milton dated 8/10/2014 re: I am writing to inform the court that I am and will be incarcerated on the scheduled conference date. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sac) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Milton, dated 8/10/14 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court grant him the right to participate in the pretrial conference scheduled for 8/21/14 by telephone, due to his incarceration. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Main Document 23 replaced on 8/21/2014) (sc). (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated August 14, 2014 re: Pre-Conference Letter. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service, # 2 Exhibit A (Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order))(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/21/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 705 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to pro se Plaintiff Robert Milton, B&C# 4411209431, George R. Vierno Center, 09-09 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/1/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 18 Letter filed by Phillip Johnson. ENDORSEMENT: The stay in this matter is lifted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/1/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated July 24, 2014 re: Status of Plaintiff's Criminal Case. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from Robert Milton dated 7/7/2014 re: Due to the request by motion of the defending attorney the hearing was adjourned. My reason for now writing is to inquire about a new scheduled date for said pretrial conference. Document filed by Robert Milton. (vn) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER from Robert Milton dated 7/7/14 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court inform him of any and all future court dates and hearings, especially the newly scheduled date for the pretrial conference.(Docket Sheet Request: Mailed). Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Phillip Johnson. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/26/14. Document filed by Robert Milton. (sc) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Defendant will advise the law every 90 days as to the status of the related criminal case. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No 13. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/24/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Stay the Matter in its Entirety Pending the Outcome of Plaintiff's New York State Criminal Case addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Matthew Bridge dated 4/14/14. Document filed by Phillip Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service, # 2 Exhibit A (Queens Supreme Court Case Summary), # 3 Exhibit B (Queens Supreme Court Case Appearance History), # 4 Exhibit C (Queens Supreme Court Charges))(Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from Robert Milton dated 3/13/14 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he will be incarcerated on the scheduled confernce date and requests to be permitted to participate by telephone. Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from Robert Milton dated 2/24/14 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he was instructed to contact the Court in order to find out whether or not Police Officer Phillip Johnson has been served with the Summons yet; and so he requests that the Court contact him concerning this matter.(Docket Sheet Request: Mailed) Document filed by Robert Milton.(sc) Modified on 3/4/2014 (sc). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/24/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. This Court reminds the parties that the Pro Se Office is a valuable resource in assisting litigants who proceed in federal court without the assistance of counsel. The Pro Se Office may be reached at: Pro Se Clerk's Office, Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, (212) 805-0175. Defendant is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/28/2014) (ft) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is granted. Defendant Johnson's time to answer is extended to April 15, 2014. The Clerk will terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 8) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/28/2014) (ft) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to complete 50-k investigation addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Morgan D. Kunz dated February 14, 2014. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF SERVICE: For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's application for the Court to seek pro bono counsel is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion. (Dkt. No.3) In addition, for the reasons stated above, the claims against Defendants New York City Police Department and the City of New York are dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate these defendants. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438,444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a non-frivolous issue). The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff Robert Milton, B&C # 4411209431, GRVC, 09-09 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2013) (cd) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/15/2013) (vj) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Robert Milton.(msa) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Phillip Johnson, New York City, New York City Police. Document filed by Robert Milton.(msa) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert Milton.(msa) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?