ROVER PIPELINE LLC v. ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-001.000T
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00170

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 2, 2020 at 4:37 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROVER PIPELINE LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson PLLC-Charleston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon C. Beckman +1 814 333 4913 +1 814 336 6570 jon.beckman@steptoe-johnson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori A. Dawkins +1 304 933 8141 +1 304 933 8183 lori.dawkins@steptoe-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. Pulito +1 814 333 4900 Brian.Pulito@Steptoe-Johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zabel Freeman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Alan Zabel +1 713 802 9117 +1 713 802 9114 tzabel@zflawfirm.com
v.
No Logo ANY HEIRS, SUCCESSORS, AND ASSIGNS OF THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANTS, Defendant
No Logo ANY UNKNOWN OWNERS, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA MINGES SHEPERD, Defendant
No Logo CAPITAL C ENERGY OPERATIONS, LP, Defendant
No Logo Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant
No Logo DAVID J. RHEINLANDER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by First Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter N. Georgiades +1 412 381 5190 +1 412 381 5191 peterg@pnglaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Walker +1 317 575 9942 +1 317 575 9943 jordan@landownerattorneys.com
No Logo DOUGLAS EMERGY MINGES, Defendant
No Logo ELYSIA ORISON SMITH, Defendant
No Logo EMERY J. MINGES, Defendant
No Logo FIRSTENERGY CORP., Defendant
No Logo FRED C. STROUD, Defendant
No Logo GRETCHEN RHEINLANDER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by First Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter N. Georgiades +1 412 381 5190 +1 412 381 5191 peterg@pnglaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Walker +1 317 575 9942 +1 317 575 9943 jordan@landownerattorneys.com
No Logo HARMON CREEK COAL COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo JAMES M. BUCHANAN AND DIANE ZACK BUCHANAN FARM #4 LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trent A. Echard +1 412 281 5423 +1 412 281 8264 techard@smgglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry F. Kunselman +1 412 281 5423 +1 412 281 8264 hkunselman@smgglaw.com
No Logo JILL ZAGARI, Defendant
No Logo JUSTIN D. SMITH, Defendant
No Logo LAREINA ORISON GEORGE, Defendant
No Logo LAVERNE D. MEDINA, Defendant
No Logo LUCILLE D. FROATS, Defendant
No Logo MCDONALD ROD & GUN CLUB, Defendant
No Logo MULLETT COAL COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo PATRICIA R. SHOOP MINGES, Defendant
No Logo Peoples Natural Gas Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter H. Schnore +1 412 394 5433 +1 412 394 6576 pschnore@babstcalland.com
No Logo Pnc Mortgage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KML LAW GROUP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren R. Berschler +1 412 837 1164 +1 412 837 2648 lkarl@kmllawgroup.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. McClelland +1 412 430 3589 +1 412 430 3553 mmcclelland@kmllawgroup.com
No Logo RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC, Defendant
No Logo ROCCO ZAGARI, JR., Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-001.000T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-002.000T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-003.000T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-004.500T, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trent A. Echard +1 412 281 5423 +1 412 281 8264 techard@smgglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry F. Kunselman +1 412 281 5423 +1 412 281 8264 hkunselman@smgglaw.com
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-008.000T, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trent A. Echard +1 412 281 5423 +1 412 281 8264 techard@smgglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry F. Kunselman +1 412 281 5423 +1 412 281 8264 hkunselman@smgglaw.com
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-018.510T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-020.000T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-023.110T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-023.120T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-026.000T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-040.000T, Defendant
No Logo ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-045.000T, Defendant
No Logo Talisman Energy Usa Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF CONCETTA CIAFFONI, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF DEAN R. STROUD, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF DENVER J. COULTER, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF DON M. STROUD, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF GLENN DEVITT, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF MABLE J. DOLLE, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF MARGARET COULTER, Defendant
No Logo THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF PAUL CIAFFONI, Defendant
No Logo THE MURDOCKSVILLE INDEPENDENT TELEPHONE CO, Defendant
No Logo THE OLD WILSON FARM LAND TRUST, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr. +1 724 695 8620 +1 724 695 8621 bolindlaw@verizon.net
No Logo Valvoline Oil Company, Defendant
Verizon Pennsylvania LLC Verizon Pennsylvania LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Joseph Coles +1 412 515 1528 +1 844 368 4326 acoles@blankrome.com
No Logo WCM PROPERTIES LLC, Defendant
No Logo WENDY J. SMITH, Defendant
No Logo WEST PENN POWER COMPANY, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 717
Nature of Suit Condemnation
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Amend
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Leave to File
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Amend
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Amend
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Extend Time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Order of Distribution of Funds
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion & Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Leave to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Leave to File
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None order on motion to enforce
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Enforce
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION re 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Possession and 43 Plaintiff's Renewed MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Possession. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/8/2017. (lmt)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Opt Out of Arbitration
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Opt Out of Arbitration
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Appendix to 7 Brief in Support of Motion, 6 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 8 Concise Statement of Material Facts by ROVER PIPELINE LLC. (Pulito, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re 7 Brief in Support of Motion, 6 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ROVER PIPELINE LLC. (Pulito, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                BRIEF in Support re 6 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROVER PIPELINE LLC. (Pulito, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 3 Motion for Thomas A. Zabel, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/7/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jon C. Beckman on behalf of ROVER PIPELINE LLC. (Beckman, Jon) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION against ANY HEIRS, SUCCESSORS, AND ASSIGNS OF THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANTS, ANY UNKNOWN OWNERS, JAMES M. BUCHANAN, CAPITAL C ENERGY OPERATIONS, LP, COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION, LLC, FIRSTENERGY CORP., LUCILLE D. FROATS, LAREINA ORISON GEORGE, HARMON CREEK COAL COMPANY, MCDONALD ROD & GUN CLUB, LAVERNE D. MEDINA, DOUGLAS EMERGY MINGES, EMERY J. MINGES, PATRICIA R. SHOOP MINGES, MULLETT COAL COMPANY, INC., PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY LLC, PNC MORTGAGE, RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC, DAVID J. RHEINLANDER, GRETCHEN RHEINLANDER, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-001.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-002.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-003.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-004.500T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-008.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-018.510T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-020.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-023.110T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-023.120T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-026.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-040.000T, ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-045.000T, BARBARA MINGES SHEPERD, ELYSIA ORISON SMITH, JUSTIN D. SMITH, WENDY J. SMITH, FRED C. STROUD, TALISMAN ENERGY, USA INC., THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF CONCETTA CIAFFONI, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF DEAN R. STROUD, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF DENVER J. COULTER, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF DON M. STROUD, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF GLENN DEVITT, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF MABLE J. DOLLE, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF MARGARET COULTER, THE HEIRS, SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF PAUL CIAFFONI, THE MURDOCKSVILLE INDEPENDENT TELEPHONE CO, THE OLD WILSON FARM LAND TRUST, VALVOLINE OIL COMPANY, VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, WCM PROPERTIES LLC, WEST PENN POWER COMPANY, DIANE ZACK, JILL ZAGARI, ROCCO ZAGARI, JR (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4230220), filed by ROVER PIPELINE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D-1, # 6 Exhibit D-2, # 7 Exhibit D-3, # 8 Exhibit D-4, # 9 Exhibit D-5) (jsp) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?