United States v. Chandler
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Western District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00025

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 8, 2019 at 12:33 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Approve Deed/Confirm Sale
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike and Substitute
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Strike and Substitute
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Leave to
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Approve Deed/Confirm Sale
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment and Order of Sale
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment and Order of Sale
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Case Assignment
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order - Text Only
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?