Wood v. Trump Casino Services LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-00422
District Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 5:31 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joyce B Wood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Ruff +1 219 718 1158 nathanielruff@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by James T Nyeste PHV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T Nyeste PHV +1 312 223 8549
v.
No Logo Liberty Life Assurance Company Of Boston, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Amy Weinberg +1 312 775 1752 +1 312 372 6085 sara.weinberg@dinsmore.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D McCarthy +1 312 986 0300 +1 312 986 9192
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Wood +1 864 232 7000 +1 864 235 1381 woodr@jacksonlewis.com
Trump Casino Services, LLC Trump Casino Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belgrade and O'Donnell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY John Andrew O'Donnell +1 312 422 1700 +1 312 422 1717 jodonnell@bodpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Amy Weinberg +1 312 775 1752 +1 312 372 6085 sara.weinberg@dinsmore.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Weinberg, Sara) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE re 40 . By agreement of parties and court dismissal papers deadline extended to 10/1/2007 due to plaintiff being out of state to take care of ailing mother. (plm) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE by Joyce B Wood, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston re 39 . Attys Nyeste and Weinberg inform court that this matter has been resolved. Dismissal papers due w/in 30 days. Status Conference set for 8/10/2007 is VACATED. (plm) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/3/2007 before Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty James Nyeste. Dft appeared by atty Sara Weinberg. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/10/2007 01:00 PM (CST) before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the conference call. (plm) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen for all further proceedings. Judge Rudy Lozano no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller Jr on 7/27/2007. (rmn) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/2/2007 before Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty James Nyeste. Dft appeared by atty Sara Weinberg. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/3/2007 01:00 PM (CST) before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the conference call. (plm) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/31/2007 before Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty James Nyeste. Dft appeared by atty Sara Weinberg. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/2/2007 10:00 AM (CDT) before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the conference call. (plm) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE re 31 : Status Conference set for 05/31/2007 10:30 AM will be telephonic. Court to initiate the conference call. (plm) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by James T Nyeste PHV on behalf of Joyce B Wood (Nyeste PHV, James) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 32 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James T Nyeste PHV for Joyce B Wood. Signed by Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/16/07. (kjp) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPLICATION for Attorney James T Nyeste to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joyce B Wood ; Receipt #2209398. (kjp) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/7/2007 before Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared w/o Atty. Dft appeared by atty Sara Weinberg. Ms. Wood conveyed to courtroom deputy before hearing that Atty Ruff's estate is being handled by Atty Margaret Galvin Administrator. Court contacted Atty Galvin who conveyed she will turn over file to Ms. Wood. She will need two weeks to retrieve file and Ms. Wood may pick it up at her office (5253 Hohman Ave., Hammond, IN) with proper identification. Status Conference set for 5/31/2007 10:30 AM in Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. If atty enters an appearance on behalf of Plaintiff the status can be conducted by telephone if court is notified. Ms. Wood would not have to appear at status conference.(Digitally Recorded.) (plm) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Hearing: regarding 28 : Due to death of Atty Ruff, Status Conference reset for 3/7/2007 10:30 AM in Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich to allow Plaintiff to retain new counsel. (Conference will be done telephonic if atty represents plaintiff.) Court to initiate the conference call. PLEASE NOTE: Previous setting of 02/16/2007 9:30 AM is VACATED. (plm) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing . Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 8/15/06. (kjp, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 2/16/2007 09:30 AM in Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich due to illness to Atty Ruff and by agreement of defendant's counsel 27 . Atty Weinberg to initiate the conference call. PLEASE NOTE: The previous setting of 9/15/2006 is VACATED.(plm, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Exemption from Electronic Filing by Nathaniel Ruff on behalf of Joyce B Wood. (kjp, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting 25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert M Wood PHV for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston . Signed by Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 7/31/2006. (rmn) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    APPLICATION for Attorney Robert M Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Co of Boston ; Receipt #2207674. (kjp, ) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      OPINION AND ORDER, granting 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Trump Casino Services LLC. Trump Casino Services LLC is dismissed from this case. This case remains pending as to dft, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Long Term Liability Plan. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 7/14/06. (kjp, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Hearing: regarding 10 . Telephonic Status Conference reset for 9/15/2006 10:30 AM in Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Atty Weinberg to initiate the conference call.(plm, ) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sara A Weinberg on behalf of all defendants; replacing Attorney Brian D. McCarthy (Weinberg, Sara) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 11 Motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing . COUNSEL FOR PLTF WILL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR SCANNING ALL MANUAL FILINGS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 5/18/06. (kjp, ) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 19 2nd Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Trump is ordered to produce a copy of its benefits plan by 5/29/06. Pltf's Response to be filed by 6/12/2006. Signed by Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/17/06. (kjp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                2nd MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss and to compel production of group benefits plan of Trump Casino Services LLC by Joyce B Wood. (kjp, )Docket text modified on 5/15/2006 (kjp, ). (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D McCarthy on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (McCarthy, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DISCLOSURE of pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) filed by Trump Casino Services LLC.(O'Donnell, John) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Weinberg, Sara) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference regarding Motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing reset for 5/3/2006 03:30 PM in Hammond before Judge Rudy Lozano. Previous setting of 5/2/06 is stricken. Only Atty Nathaniel Ruff is require to be in attendance at conference.(imr, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference regarding plf's motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing set for 5/2/2006 10:00 AM in Hammond before Judge Rudy Lozano. (imr, ) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Pltf's Response to Motion to Dismiss to be filed by 5/15/2006. Signed by Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/5/06. (kjp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joyce B Wood. (kjp, ) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Exemption from Electronic Filing by Nathaniel Ruff on behalf of Joyce B Wood. (kjp, ) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/3/2006 before Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Nathaniel Ruff. Defendants appeared by attorneys Patrick Cullinan and Sara Weinberg. Plaintiff waives jury demand. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/1/2006. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 4/3/2006. A motion to dismiss has been filed by Defendant Trump. Response to be filed by 4/3/2006. Reply to be filed by 4/17/2006. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/14/2006 01:30 PM in Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Atty Weinberg to initiate the conference call. (plm, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cullinan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sara A Weinberg on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Weinberg, Sara) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trump Casino Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Donnell, John) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MAGISTRATE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (plm, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2006 01:30 PM in Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. (plm, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Trump Casino Services LLC answer due 2/12/2006. Signed by Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/24/06. (kjp, ) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Uncontested) by Trump Casino Services LLC. (O'Donnell, John) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Trump Casino Services LLC, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (knk, ) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants (Filing fee $ 250.) Receipt #2206081, filed by Joyce B Wood. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knk, ) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?