Raymundo Landeros, et al v. Pinnacle Recovery, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-11975

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2017 at 12:43 AM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109385252 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 03/08/2017 at 11:59 pm filed by Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros. Motion is Unopposed. [8037564-1] (ECF: Earl Underwood)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109356642 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Cout Appointed Amicus Supporting Judgment Below. (ECF: John Neiman)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109327479 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER: "Amicus Curiae's Amended Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Amicus Curiae's Brief" is GRANTED, up to and including January 23, 2017. [8002713-2] (EEC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 01109327023 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Amended Motion for extension to file Amicus Brief [8002713-2] filed by Amicus Curiae John Cowles Neiman, Jr.. (ECF: John Neiman)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109326788 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file Amicus brief to 01/23/2017 at 11:59 pm filed by John Cowles Neiman, Jr.. Motion is Unopposed. [8002713-1] (ECF: John Neiman)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109279782 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER: The Court has determined that oral argument is warranted . . . To assist the Court in resolving this issue, the Court hereby appoints John Neiman of Maynard Cooper & Gale, Birmingham, Alabama, to file an amicus curiae brief and orally argue this matter. Amicus curiae should defend the district court’s order denying class certification. Amicus’ duties are exclusively to the Court, not to the parties. Once the Court decides this case, amicus’ duties in the matter will end. The brief of amicus curiae is due within forty (40) days of the date of this order…. EEC
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109116854 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Pinnacle Recovery, Inc.. (ECF: Neal Moore)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109061503 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellants Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros. (ECF: Earl Underwood)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109061477 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Appellant's brief filed by Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros. (ECF: Earl Underwood)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108978420 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/12/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108978338 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Appellate fee was paid on 05/26/2016 as to Appellants Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros.
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108966414 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108966409 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Melanie Wilkins, Filer: Diana Landeros, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/17/2016, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 01/21/2016.
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108951042 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Diana Landeros, Court Reporter: Melanie Wilkins, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 01/21/2016.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108941847 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Neal D. Moore, III for Appellee Pinnacle Recovery, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Neal Moore)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108941834 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Neal D. Moore, III for Appellee Pinnacle Recovery, Inc.. (ECF: Neal Moore)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108941830 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Pinnacle Recovery Inc. Neal D. Moore, III for Pinnacle Recovery, Inc.. (ECF: Neal Moore)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108939749 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Earl Price Underwood, Jr. for Appellants Raymundo Landeros and Diana Landeros. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Earl Underwood)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108939698 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Earl Price Underwood, Jr. for Appellants Raymundo Landeros and Diana Landeros. (ECF: Earl Underwood)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108927066 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Earl Price Underwood, Jr. for Raymundo Landeros and Diana Landeros. (ECF: Earl Underwood)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108926601 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros on 04/28/2016. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 05/16/2016 as to Appellants Diana Landeros and Raymundo Landeros
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?