Ellis et al v. Fidelity Management Trust Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-14128
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 1:19 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Ellis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Righetti & Wynne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Righetti +1 415 983 0900 +1 415 397 9005 matt@righettilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Righetti Glugoski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C Righetti +1 415 983 0900 +1 415 397 9005

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle G Bates +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 kbates@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Johnson +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 mjohnson@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason H Kim +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 jkim@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Craig McKay +1 480 607 4367 +1 480 607 4366 mmckay@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Michael Schneider +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 tschneider@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Webster Wotkyns +1 480 607 4368 +1 480 607 4366 gwotkyns@schneiderwallace.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 cmicheletti@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Gordon +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 jgordon@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather T Rankie , +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 hrankie@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Sullivan +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 psullivan@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
No Logo William Perry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Righetti & Wynne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Righetti +1 415 983 0900 +1 415 397 9005 matt@righettilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Righetti Glugoski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C Righetti +1 415 983 0900 +1 415 397 9005

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle G Bates +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 kbates@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Johnson +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 mjohnson@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason H Kim +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 jkim@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Craig McKay +1 480 607 4367 +1 480 607 4366 mmckay@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Michael Schneider +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 tschneider@schneiderwallace.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Webster Wotkyns +1 480 607 4368 +1 480 607 4366 gwotkyns@schneiderwallace.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 cmicheletti@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Gordon +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 jgordon@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather T Rankie , +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 hrankie@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Sullivan +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 psullivan@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
v.
No Logo Fidelity Management Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison V. Douglass +1 617 570 1676 +1 617 523 1231 adouglass@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Falvey, Jr. +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 jfalvey@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian David Boyle +1 202 383 5327 +1 202 383 5414 bblyle@omm.om
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F. Jacob +1 202 383 5110 +1 202 383 5414 gjacob@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meaghan VerGow +1 202 383 5504 +1 202 383 5414 mvergow@omm.com
No Logo Judge Marianne B. Bowler, Mediator
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USCA Case Number 17-1693 for 139 Notice of Appeal filed by William Perry, James Ellis. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 139 Notice of Appeal (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 139 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 138 Judgment by James Ellis, William Perry Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-6702303 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 7/27/2017. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
        LREF
        Blank 138 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
          LREF
          Blank 137 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER"For the foregoing reasons, the Court holds that thePlaintiffs have not made a sufficient showing for the Court tocontinue to entertain the claims against Fidelity. Accordingly,this Court GRANTS Fidelitys motion for summary judgment, ECFNo. 97 .SO ORDERED."(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2017 at Suffolk Law School re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. After hearing from counsel, the Court enters an Order taking under advisement 97 Motion for Summary Judgment and vacates both the final pretrial deadline and trial deadline until further notice. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Kim and Gordon for the plaintiffs, Jacob and Falvey for the defendant) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing held on 3/29/2017. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Micheletti, Kim, Righetti, Boyle, Falvey) (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY to Response to 105 MOTION in Limine (Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (VerGow, Meaghan) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 129 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Response by Fidelity Management Trust Company to 120 Response, to Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Material Facts. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Leave to File A Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz)(VerGow, Meaghan) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2017.Court discloses possible conflict of interest. Counsel concur that no conflict exists. Mediation to proceed as scheduled. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Boyle, Falvey, Schneider, Bates, Kim, Micheletti, Righetti) (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 3/23/2017 03:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Counsel may participate by calling 888-675-2535 and entering Access Code - 6641794 and Security Code 10932. Counsel are advised to dial in to the teleconference number five to ten minutes before the hearing. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Jason H. Kim re trial scheduling. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Jason H. Kim (Erratum) in Opposition re 105 MOTION in Limine (Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) & Exhibit K filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 105 MOTION in Limine (Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason H. Kim in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs Expert Steve Pomerantz, # 2 Exhibit A through L to Declaration of Jason H. Kim in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs Expert Steve Pomerantz, # 3 Exhibit M through R to Declaration of Jason H. Kim in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs Expert Steve Pomerantz)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        EXHIBIT re 121 Declaration,,,, (Exhibits AQ-BR to the Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Fidelity Management Trust Company's Motion for Summary Judgment) by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AQ, # 2 Exhibit AR, # 3 Exhibit AS, # 4 Exhibit AT, # 5 Exhibit AU, # 6 Exhibit AV, # 7 Exhibit AW, # 8 Exhibit AX, # 9 Exhibit AY, # 10 Exhibit AZ, # 11 Exhibit BA, # 12 Exhibit BB, # 13 Exhibit BC, # 14 Exhibit BD, # 15 Exhibit BE, # 16 Exhibit BF, # 17 Exhibit BG, # 18 Exhibit BH, # 19 Exhibit BI, # 20 Exhibit BJ, # 21 Exhibit BK, # 22 Exhibit BL (part 1 of 2), # 23 Exhibit BL (part 2 of 2), # 24 Exhibit BM, # 25 Exhibit BN, # 26 Exhibit BO, # 27 Exhibit BP, # 28 Exhibit BQ, # 29 Exhibit BR (part 1 of 2), # 30 Exhibit BR (part 2 of 2))(Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DECLARATION re 119 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Fidelity Management Trust Company's Motion for Summary Judgment) by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W (part 1 of 2), # 24 Exhibit W (part 2 of 2), # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit AB, # 30 Exhibit AC, # 31 Exhibit AD, # 32 Exhibit AE, # 33 Exhibit AF, # 34 Exhibit AG, # 35 Exhibit AH, # 36 Exhibit AI, # 37 Exhibit AJ (part 1 of 2), # 38 Exhibit AJ (part 2 of 2), # 39 Exhibit AK, # 40 Exhibit AL, # 41 Exhibit AM, # 42 Exhibit AN, # 43 Exhibit AO, # 44 Exhibit AP)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Response by James Ellis, William Perry to 99 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 (Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition to Defendant Fidelity Management Trust Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Plaintiffs' Responses to Fidelity's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment). (Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Opposition re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 113 Cross MOTION to Compel Testimony of Daniel Mulvey. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Opposition re 113 Cross MOTION to Compel Testimony of Daniel Mulvey filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re 112 Joint Motion and Stipulation Concerning Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Responses due by 3/10/2017; Replies due by 3/24/2017. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      DECLARATION of Jason H. Kim in Support re 113 Cross MOTION to Compel Testimony of Daniel Mulvey filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 113 Cross MOTION to Compel Testimony of Daniel Mulvey filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Cross MOTION to Compel Testimony of Daniel Mulvey by James Ellis, William Perry. (Bates, Kyle) (Modified on 2/23/2017 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Joint Motion and Stipulation Concerning Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion by James Ellis, William Perry. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Modified on 2/23/2017 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2017 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Suffolk Law School, 120 Tremont Street, 4th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 102 Declaration, 106 Declaration, 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 109 Declaration,, 104 Declaration, 101 Declaration, 98 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 103 Declaration 99 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, 100 Declaration, 108 Declaration. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine Docket Clerk Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Gregory F. Jacob In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exclude The Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, Part 1, # 9 Exhibit H, Part 2, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Vincent Walsh In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exclude The Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 105 MOTION in Limine (Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (VerGow, Meaghan) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Stephen Kolocotronis In Support) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION in Limine (Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(VerGow, Meaghan) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Steve Hoberman In Support) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Robin Foley In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exclude The Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Steve Pomerantz) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW, # 50 Exhibit XX, # 51 Exhibit YY, # 52 Exhibit ZZ, # 53 Exhibit AAA, # 54 Exhibit BBB, # 55 Exhibit CCC, # 56 Exhibit DDD)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jill De Luca In Support) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Richard P. Dahling in Support) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Robert Chan In Support) by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            DECLARATION re 91 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Daniel Mulvey of Daniel Mulvey by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              DECLARATION re 91 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Daniel Mulvey of Alton L. Gwaltney III by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                DECLARATION re 91 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Daniel Mulvey of Alison V. Douglass by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 91 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Daniel Mulvey of Brian Boyle by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 91 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Daniel Mulvey filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Daniel Mulvey by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 3/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. See prior notice of rules and rescheduling of ADR in this session. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 87 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING THE INDIVIDUAL DEPOSITION OF FIDELITY WITNESS ROBIN FOLEY filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING THE INDIVIDUAL DEPOSITION OF FIDELITY WITNESS ROBIN FOLEY, 84 Declaration,, 85 Exhibit. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT re 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING THE INDIVIDUAL DEPOSITION OF FIDELITY WITNESS ROBIN FOLEY Exhibit 16 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17 (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit 17 (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 25 (Part 1 of 6), # 11 Exhibit 25 (Part 2 of 6), # 12 Exhibit 25 (Part 3 of 6), # 13 Exhibit 25 (Part 4 of 6), # 14 Exhibit 25 (Part 5 of 6), # 15 Exhibit 25 (Part 6 of 6), # 16 Exhibit 26, # 17 Exhibit 27, # 18 Exhibit 28, # 19 Exhibit 29, # 20 Exhibit 30, # 21 Exhibit 31)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING THE INDIVIDUAL DEPOSITION OF FIDELITY WITNESS ROBIN FOLEY by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING THE INDIVIDUAL DEPOSITION OF FIDELITY WITNESS ROBIN FOLEY by James Ellis, William Perry.(Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by James Ellis, William Perry Notice of Issuance and Service of Subpoena; Exhibit A of Dan Mulvey (Bates, Kyle) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION Plaintiffs' to be available by telephone for ADR Conference . Unopposed Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Attendance at Alternative Dispute Resolution Conference by James Ellis, William Perry.(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered as to Class Certification. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2016 re 64 MOTION to Certify Class filed by William Perry, James Ellis. The parties notify the Court they agree and have submitted a proposed order. The Court enters an Order granting 64 Motion to Certify Class. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Micheletti and Gordon for the plaintiffs, Falvey and Jacob for the defendant) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 64 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by James Ellis, William Perry of Subpoena of Dan Mulvey, Trinity Fiduciary Partners LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 64 MOTION to Certify Class : Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/8/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. See prior notice for rules re: ADR.(Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rory D. Zamansky. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rory D. Zamansky Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6369287 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 66 Declaration, 67 Declaration, 68 Declaration, 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 69 Declaration, 71 Declaration, 70 Declaration, 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine, Docket Clerk, Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI by James Ellis, William Perry. (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER T. MICHELETTI by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion DECLARATION OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE WILLIAM PERRY by James Ellis, William Perry. (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion DECLARATION OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE JAMES ELLIS by James Ellis, William Perry. (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion DECLARATION OF STEVE POMERANTZ, PH.D. by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 64 MOTION to Certify Class , 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion DECLARATION OF JASON H. KIM by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Attachment 1)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 64 MOTION to Certify Class filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class by James Ellis, William Perry.(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by James Ellis, William Perry of Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B to Notice of Subpoenas)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE: Discovery to be completed by 2/8/2017 Motions due by 2/17/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS MODIFIED (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Motion allowed as modified 59 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of an Order for the Protection and Exchange of Confidential Information (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of an Order for the Protection and Exchange of Confidential Information by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fidelity Management Trust Company. Document received: Proposed Amended Consolidated Case Management Schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 1/2/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Counsel and parties are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority. Parties presence shall ONLY be excused by order of the COURT. A brief mediation memorandum addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via facsimile to (617) 204-5833 or via email as an attachment to Christine_Patton@mad.uscourts.gov THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the hearing. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time contact the Courtroom Deputy. But if the date poses a serious conflict, please do NOT contact the Courtroom Deputy directly regarding mediation scheduling. Counsel are to confer with opposing counsel and FILE AN ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO CONTINUE the mediation, including therein several proposed dates for which all counsel and principals are available. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Marianne B. Bowler appointed.(Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution as of January 2017.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2016. The Court explains the requirements of the session. The parties do not wish to proceed before a magistrate judge. the case is to go to ADR as of January 2017. The case is placed on the running trial list for May 2017. A final pretrial conference will be set for the month of April 2017. A joint pretrial memo is due the first Monday of the month preceding trial month. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed atleast three months prior to trial month. (Ready for Trial on 5/1/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 as to Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 as to james Ellis. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference and Proposed Agenda. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Modified on 6/2/2016 to Correct Docket Text and Remove Attachements. The 16.1 Statements Should Have been Filed As Separate Docket Entries By Counsel) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by James Ellis, William Perry of Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A to H to Notice of Subpoenas)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re 46 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE February 8, 2017 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE Febraury 17, 2017. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fidelity Management Trust Company. Document received: Joint [Proposed] Case Management Schedule. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on March 9, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 5/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2016 as Suffolk Law School re 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. After hearing from counsel, the Court takes the matter under advisement. An Order will enter at the Court's earliest convenience. Once Order enters, counsel shall file a joint proposed case management schedule. The proposed schedule shall include a trial month up to one year and one month out from the month the Order enters. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Kim for the plaintiffs, Jacob for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jason H. Kim. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jason H. Kim Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6005238 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gordon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 38 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim (Unopposed) by James Ellis, William Perry.(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 35 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kyle G. Bates. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyle G. Bates Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5950820 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Kyle G. Bates)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Garrett W. Wotkyns, Michael C. McKay, Todd Schneider and Mark T. Johnson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Matthew Righetti and Michael Righetti. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Christopher T. Micheletti and Heather T. Rankie. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew Righetti and Michael Righetti Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-5947481 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Matthew Righetti, # 2 Exhibit B-Certification of Michael Righetti)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Garrett W. Wotkyns, Michael C. McKay, Todd Schneider and Mark T. Johnson Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5947411 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Garrett W. Wotkyns, # 2 Exhibit B-Certification of Michael C. McKay, # 3 Exhibit C-Certification of Todd Schneider, # 4 Exhibit D-Certification of Mark T. Johnson)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher T. Micheletti and Heather T. Rankie Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-5947341 by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Christopher T. Micheletti, # 2 Exhibit B-Certification of Heather T. Rankie)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2016 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be held at Suffolk Law School, 120 Tremont Street, 4th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 23 Declaration, 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(VerGow, Meaghan) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Jacob, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Gordon on behalf of James Ellis, William Perry (Gordon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Paul T. Sullivan (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T. Sullivan on behalf of James Ellis, William Perry (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Falvey, Jr on behalf of Fidelity Management Trust Company (Falvey, John) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Brian Boyle, Gregory Jacob, and Meaghan VerGow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian Boyle, Gregory Jacob, and Meaghan VerGow Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-5910260 by Fidelity Management Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Brian Boyle, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Gregory Jacob, # 3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Meaghan VerGow)(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 12 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The defendant is granted a two week extension to file a responsive pleading, up to and including January 20, 2016. Plaintiff shall file their response to a motion within two weeks. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 12, 2016 to Respond To Complaint by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Fidelity Management Trust Company re 7 MOTION Defendant's Partially Assented-To Motion To Extend The Briefing Schedule And Expand Page Limits Notice Of Withdrawal Of Defendant's Partially Assented-To Motion To Extend The Briefing Schedule And Expand Page Limits (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Defendant's Partially Assented-To Motion To Extend The Briefing Schedule And Expand Page Limits by Fidelity Management Trust Company.(Douglass, Alison) Modified on 12/31/2015 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity Management Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent FMR LLC for Fidelity Management Trust Company.. (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alison V. Douglass on behalf of Fidelity Management Trust Company (Douglass, Alison) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Fidelity Management Trust Company served on 12/15/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. (Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Fidelity Management Trust Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Fidelity Management Trust Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5886020 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by James Ellis, William Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Sullivan, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?