Parshall v. CoLucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-10197
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 20, 2017 at 12:29 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul Parshall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Matorin Law Office LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell J. Matorin +1 781 453 0100 +1 888 628 6746 mmatorin@matorinlawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Alison Lawton, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Pappas, Defendant
No Logo Colucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey P. Justman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey P. Justman

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew Kilby

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Kilby

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel V. McCaughey +1 617 951 7681 +1 617 235 9507 Daniel.McCaughey@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendy J. Wildung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy J. Wildung
Eli Lilly and Company Eli Lilly and Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr. +1 617 772 8365 +1 617 772 8333 patrick.otoole@weil.com
No Logo Luc Marengere, Defendant
No Logo Mark Corrigan, Defendant
No Logo Martin, Edward S., Defendant
No Logo Marvin White, Defendant
No Logo Procar Acquisition Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr. +1 617 772 8365 +1 617 772 8333 patrick.otoole@weil.com
No Logo Thomas P. Mathers, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Parshall (Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE: The Clerk will set a 16(b) Scheduling Conference once ANSWERS to Complaint are filed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Wendy J. Wildung. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew Kilby. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey P. Justman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS : 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Paul Parshall, 8 MOTION to Expedite filed by Paul Parshall. PURSUANT TO 20 Notice filed by Plaintiff. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE by Paul Parshall re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 8 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Withdrawal Of Motions for Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Briefing Schedule (Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SET DEADLINES AS TO : Objections re 18 Order due by Friday, 2/17/2017 - 11:00AM. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re Parshall v. CoLucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al as to an ORDER OF RECUSAL. Objections due by Friday, 2/17/2017 by 11:00AM. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eli Lilly and Company, Procar Acquisition Corporation identifying Corporate Parent No Parent for Eli Lilly and Company; Corporate Parent Elly Lilly and Company for Procar Acquisition Corporation.. (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Eli Lilly and Company, Procar Acquisition Corporation. (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 USC sec. 455(b)(4), I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk forthwith to reassign the case randomly to another District Judge.(Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company, Procar Acquisition Corporation (O'Toole, Patrick) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Wendy J. Wildung Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6493718 by CoLucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(McCaughey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew Kilby Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6493711 by CoLucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(McCaughey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey P. Justman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6493693 by CoLucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(McCaughey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel V. McCaughey on behalf of CoLucid Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (McCaughey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Paul Parshall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr added. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6483901 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Paul Parshall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Civil Category Sheet)(Matorin, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?