USA v. Wang
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-mj-01005
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2017 at 12:21 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Songjiang Wang, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Jessica P. Thrall +1 617 223 8061 Jessica_Thrall@fd.org
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Songjiang Wang. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Appearance Bond Entered as to Songjiang Wang in amount of $ 750000.00 (Secured). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance as to Songjiang Wang held on 2/7/2017. The court informs the def't of the charges against him and of his rights. The gov't states the maximum penalties. FD Thrall indicates that she is standing in today but def't will be able to afford counsel. The gov't does not move for detention and agrees to release on a 750K secured bond with conditions. The def't has one week to file the paperwork to secure the bond with real property of sufficient equity. The court will allow more time if necessary. Preliminary hearing set for 2.27.17 at 10:30 AM. Def't released. (Attorneys present: Walters, Thrall. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Songjiang Wang. Initial Appearance set for 2/7/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order to Unseal Case as to Songjiang Wang. Upon oral motion of the Gov't. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED COMPLAINT as to Songjiang Wang (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Cirilli) (2) JS45) (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 02/06/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Songjiang Wang (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Seal Case as to Songjiang Wang by USA. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Songjiang Wang; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 164 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?