Khoury et al v. FXCM Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00916
District Judge Ronnie Abrams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2021 at 6:42 PM EST (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Brian Armstrong, Plaintiff
No Logo Tony Khoury, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com
v.
No Logo Arthur Gruen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Bryan Reyhani, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo David S Sassoon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo David Sakhai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Dror Niv, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
Space Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
Space Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
Space Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Eduard Yusupov, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Eric LeGoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Fxcm Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
Space Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
Space Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo James Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Janelle G Lester, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Kenneth Grossman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Margaret Deverell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Nicola Santoro, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Ornit Niv, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Perry G Fish, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
No Logo Robert Lande, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
Space Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
Space Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
Space Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Robin E. Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Ryan Silverman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo William Ahdout, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo 683 Capital Partners, LP, Movant
Officer/Director, Onconova Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, 683 Capital Management, LLC
Officer/Director, Mccaw International Ltd
No Logo Abed Latif, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardy & Notis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Sarnelli , +1 201 567 7377 +1 201 567 7337 jsarnelli@gardylaw.com
No Logo Adi Damty, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardy & Notis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Sarnelli , +1 201 567 7377 +1 201 567 7337 jsarnelli@gardylaw.com
No Logo Gene Segalis, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Hany Sikaik, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newman Ferrara LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Alan Sachar, Jr. +1 602 751 4423 rsachar@nfllp.com
No Logo John Dearborn, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Moshe Ariel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Sergey Regukh, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Shipco Transport, Inc., Movant
No Logo Thomas Kelly, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
No Logo Timothy Black, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Wendy Howell, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
Space Evan Claire Ennis +1 212 556 2262 +1 212 556 2222 eennis@kslaw.com
Space Peter Joseph Isajiw +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 pisajiw@kslaw.com
No Logo Kathy Gray, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas James McKenna +1 212 983 1300 +1 212 983 0383 tjmlaw2001@yahoo.com
No Logo Ying Zhao, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
Space J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (231) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/9/2021, Entered: None Seal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Add Party(ies)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Add Party(ies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Proposed Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument regarding motion to strike and dismiss (ECF No. 88) the consolidated securities class action complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Israel Dahan dated October 18, 2017. Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov.(Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Israel Dahan (Supplemental) in Support re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants' Notice of Motion to Strike And Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K -Service Agreement dated 3/1/2010, # 2 Exhibit L -Service Agreement dated 5/1/2010, # 3 Exhibit M - Excerpt of FXCM's 10K for year ending 12/31/14, # 4 Exhibit N - Termination of Services Agreement)(Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants' Notice of Motion to Strike And Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Evan Baker on behalf of 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Baker, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants' Notice of Motion to Strike And Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Chelsea Jean Corey on behalf of William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. New Address: King & Spalding LLP, 100 N Tryon Street, Suite 3900, Charlotte, NC, 28202, 704-503-2575. (Corey, Chelsea) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Israel Dahan in Support re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants' Notice of Motion to Strike And Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2015 10K Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - 2014 10K Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - 2014 3rdQ 10Q Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D - NFA Decision, # 5 Exhibit E - 2016 10K Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit F - Allegations Comparison Chart, # 7 Exhibit G - Effex Complaint, # 8 Exhibit H - 2011 10K Excerpts, # 9 Exhibit I - 2012 10K Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit J - 2013 10K Excerpts)(Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants' Notice of Motion to Strike And Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants' Notice of Motion to Strike And Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. Responses due by 9/18/2017(Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Claire Ennis on behalf of William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Ennis, Evan) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chelsea Jean Corey on behalf of William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Corey, Chelsea) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Joseph Isajiw on behalf of William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Isajiw, Peter) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PERRY G. FISH WITHOUT PREJUDICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Lead Plaintiffs 683 Capital Partners, LP and Shipco Transport Inc. and named plaintiffs Sergey Regukh and Brian Armstrong (collectively, "Plaintiffs") file this notice of voluntary dismissal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), of Defendant Perry G. Fish ("Fish"). Plaintiffs have been informed that Defendant Fish is deceased. Defendant Fish has not filed an Answer or moved for summary judgment. A class has not been certified. Plaintiffs have not previously dismissed an action against Defendant Fish based on or including the same claims as presented in this instant action. This dismissal is without prejudice. Perry G Fish terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/21/2017) (rj) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Without prejudice against the defendant(s) Perry G Fish. Document filed by Sergey Regukh, Brian Armstrong, Shipco Transport, Inc., 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP. (Kim, Phillip) Modified on 7/21/2017 (km). (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: granting 81 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/19/2017) (ap) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - both parties request that page limits for the briefs on the single motion to dismiss be extended as follows: Defendants' memo in support - 50 pages, plaintiffs' opposition brief - 50 pages and defendants' reply brief 25 pages. - addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Israel Dahan dated July 18, 2017. Document filed by William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Margaret Deverell, Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Perry G Fish, Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, Jr., David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov.(Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicola Santoro, Jr.. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ornit Niv. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryan Reyhani. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eduard Yusupov. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Sakhai. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Silverman. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David S Sassoon. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robin E. Davis. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Perry G Fish. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Ahdout. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arthur Gruen. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janelle G Lester. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Margaret Deverell. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric LeGoff. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Brown. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Grossman. (pc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eduard Yusupov, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Silverman, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David S. Sassoon, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicola Santoro Jr., re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Sakhai, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bryan Reyhani, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ornit Niv, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Janelle G. Lester, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric Legoff, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arthur Gruen, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth Grossman, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Perry G. Fish, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Margaret Deverell, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robin E. Davis, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Brown, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Ahdout, re: 48 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Brian Armstrong, Sergey Regukh, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Global Brokerage, Inc. f/k/a FXCM Inc., Robert Lande, Brian Armstrong, William Ahdout, James Brown, Robin E. Davis, Magaret Deverall, Perry G Fish, Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Eric LeGoff, Janelle G Lester, Ornit Niv, Bryan Reyhani, David Sakhai, Nicola Santoro, David S Sassoon, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sergey Regukh, 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc., Brian Armstrong. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Tony Khoury. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND LEAD COUNSEL granting (26) Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting (26) Motion to Appoint; granting (26) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:17-cv-00916-RA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: CONSOLIDATION OF SECURITIES CLASS ACTIONS 1. The Securities Class Actions are consolidated for all purposes including, but not limited to, discovery, pretrial proceedings and trial proceedings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). MASTER DOCKET AND CAPTION 2. The docket in Case No. 1: 17-cv-00916-RA shall constitute the Master Docket for this action. Every pleading filed in the consolidated action shall bear the following caption (as further set forth in this Order.) Movants' choice of counsel is approved and accordingly, The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. is appointed as Lead Counsel. Pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. §78u-(a)(3)(B), Movants are appointed as Co-Lead Plaintiffs for the class as they have the largest financial interest in this litigation and otherwise satisfy the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00916-RA, 1:17-cv-00955-RA, 1:17-cv-01028-RA, 1:17-cv-02506-RA (cf) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (45 in 1:17-cv-00916-RA) Letter filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/19/2017., Motions due by 8/3/2017., Responses due by 9/18/2017, Replies due by 10/18/2017.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/2/2017) (cf) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Phillip Kim dated 5/1/2017 re: Request to Vacate May 5, 2017 Status Conference and Proposed Schedule. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc..(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of of Non Opposition to Lead Plaintiff Motion of 683 Capital Partners, LP and Shipco Transport Inc.. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND FOR LEAD COUNSEL OF 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, L.P. AND SHIPCO TRANSPORTATION re: 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by Hany Sikaik. (Norton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND FOR LEAD COUNSEL OF 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, L.P. AND SHIPCO TRANSPORTATION re: 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by Tony Khoury(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel re: 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by Thomas Kelly. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Adi Damty and Abed Latif's Motion for Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs. Document filed by Adi Damty, Abed Latif. (Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-916; 1:17-cv-955; and 1:17-cv-1028 . MOTION to Appoint Moshe Ariel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Johnson & Weaver, LLP as Lead Counsel ., 23 MOTION to Appoint Kathy Gray to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., 20 MOTION to Appoint Adi Damty, Abed Latif to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-00916 (RA); 1:17-cv-00955; 1:17-cv-01028; 1:17-cv-02506 . MOTION to Appoint Sergey Regukh to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel., 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-916; 12-cv-0955; 17-cv-01028 . MOTION to Appoint Hany Sikaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., 17 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kelly to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 1:17-cv-00916-RA; No. 1:17-cv-00955-UA; No. 1:17-cv-01028-RA; and No. 1:17-cv-02506-UA . . Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel. re: 23 MOTION to Appoint Kathy Gray to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Kathy Gray. (McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Non-Opposition of The Global Brokerage Investor Group to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel. Document filed by Timothy Black, John Dearborn, Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 34 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Before the Court are five related actions: Khoury v. FXCM Inc. (No. 17-cv-916), Zhao v. FXCM Inc. (No. 17-cv-955), Blinn v. FXCM Inc. (No. 17-cv-1028), Raul v. Sakhai (No. 17-cv-2035), and 683 Capital Partners, LP v. Global Brokerage, Inc. (No. 17-cv-2506). A conference in these actions shall be held on May 5, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. At this conference, the Court shall address the pending motions to consolidate the related actions, to appoint lead plaintiff(s), and to appoint lead plaintiffs' counsel. The initial pretrial conferences presently scheduled for April 21, 2017 in Khoury (No. 17-cv-916), Blinn (No. 17-cv-1028), and Raul (No. 17-cv-2035) are hereby adjourned until further notice from the Court. Status Conference set for 5/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/18/2017) (cf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FXCM Inc..(Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Phillip Kim dated April 13, 2017. Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Tony Khoury(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tony Khoury(individually), Shipco Transport, Inc..(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-00955 and 17-cv-01028 . MOTION to Appoint Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis, John Dearborn, and Timothy Black to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Timothy Black, John Dearborn, Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-00955 and 17-cv-01028 . MOTION to Appoint Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis, John Dearborn, and Timothy Black to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Timothy Black, John Dearborn, Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-00955 and 17-cv-01028 ., MOTION to Appoint Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis, John Dearborn, and Timothy Black to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Wendy Howell, Gene Segalis, John Dearborn, Timothy Black. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-916; 1:17-cv-955; and 1:17-cv-1028 . MOTION to Appoint Moshe Ariel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Johnson & Weaver, LLP as Lead Counsel .. Document filed by Moshe Ariel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - first notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Ariel certification, # 3 Exhibit C - loss chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume, # 5 Exhibit E - Johnson & Weaver, LLP firm resume)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-916; 1:17-cv-955; and 1:17-cv-1028 . MOTION to Appoint Moshe Ariel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Johnson & Weaver, LLP as Lead Counsel . . Document filed by Moshe Ariel. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-916; 1:17-cv-955; and 1:17-cv-1028 ., MOTION to Appoint Moshe Ariel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Johnson & Weaver, LLP as Lead Counsel . Document filed by Moshe Ariel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm., MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs., MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Document filed by 683 CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP, Shipco Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas J. McKenna in Support re: 23 MOTION to Appoint Kathy Gray to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Kathy Gray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 23 MOTION to Appoint Kathy Gray to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Kathy Gray. (McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Kathy Gray to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Kathy Gray. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jeffrey C. Block in Support re: 20 MOTION to Appoint Adi Damty, Abed Latif to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Adi Damty, Abed Latif. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B- Movant Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Movant Certification, # 4 Exhibit D - Loss Calculation, # 5 Exhibit E - Loss Calculation, # 6 Exhibit F - Joint Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G - Firm Resume)(Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Appoint Adi Damty, Abed Latif to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Adi Damty, Abed Latif. (Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Adi Damty, Abed Latif to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Adi Damty, Abed Latif. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: 17 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kelly to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 1:17-cv-00916-RA; No. 1:17-cv-00955-UA; No. 1:17-cv-01028-RA; and No. 1:17-cv-02506-UA .. Document filed by Thomas Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kelly to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 1:17-cv-00916-RA; No. 1:17-cv-00955-UA; No. 1:17-cv-01028-RA; and No. 1:17-cv-02506-UA . . Document filed by Thomas Kelly. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kelly to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 1:17-cv-00916-RA; No. 1:17-cv-00955-UA; No. 1:17-cv-01028-RA; and No. 1:17-cv-02506-UA . Document filed by Thomas Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Norton in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-916; 12-cv-0955; 17-cv-01028 . MOTION to Appoint Hany Sikaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Hany Sikaik. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Sachar, Roger) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-916; 12-cv-0955; 17-cv-01028 . MOTION to Appoint Hany Sikaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Hany Sikaik. (Sachar, Roger) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-916; 12-cv-0955; 17-cv-01028 ., MOTION to Appoint Hany Sikaik to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Hany Sikaik. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sachar, Roger) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Matthew M. Guiney in Support re: 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-00916 (RA); 1:17-cv-00955; 1:17-cv-01028; 1:17-cv-02506 . MOTION to Appoint Sergey Regukh to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Sergey Regukh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 - part 2)(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-00916 (RA); 1:17-cv-00955; 1:17-cv-01028; 1:17-cv-02506 . MOTION to Appoint Sergey Regukh to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Sergey Regukh. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-00916 (RA); 1:17-cv-00955; 1:17-cv-01028; 1:17-cv-02506 ., MOTION to Appoint Sergey Regukh to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by Sergey Regukh. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel Dahan on behalf of Dror Niv, FXCM Inc., Robert Lande. (Dahan, Israel) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams, and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/10/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Lande. (rch) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dror Niv. (rch) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FXCM Inc.. (rch) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROBERT LANDE, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by TONY KHOURY(On behalf of all others similarly situated), TONY KHOURY(Individually). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DROR NIV, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by TONY KHOURY(On behalf of all others similarly situated), TONY KHOURY(Individually). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FXCM INC., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by TONY KHOURY(On behalf of all others similarly situated), TONY KHOURY(Individually). (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against FXCM INC., ROBERT LANDE, DROR NIV. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13290156)Document filed by TONY KHOURY(On behalf of all others similarly situated), TONY KHOURY(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 PSLRA Certification)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?