Weinstein v. Trump et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01018

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2017 at 12:46 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William R. Weinstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William R Weinstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R Weinstein +1 212 575 2205 +1 646 448 8215 wrw@wweinsteinlaw.com
individually and on behalf of the People of the United States of America William R Weinstein +1 212 575 2205 +1 646 448 8215 wrw@wweinsteinlaw.com
v.
No Logo Allen Weisselberg, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump, Jr."
No Logo Trump, Eric, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim., 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Pro se Plaintiff's request for an extension of two weeks, from August 18, 2017 to September 1, 2017, for the filing of papers in opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendants' reply is due on October 13, 2017. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the letter motion at ECF No. 26. Replies due by 10/13/2017. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/9/2017) (mro) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from William R. Weinstein dated 8/03/2017 re: Letter-Motion-Request On Consent for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Opposition Papers and Defendants Reply Papers. Document filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 08/05/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim., 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from William R. Weinstein dated 8/03/2017. Document filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg. (Rosen, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Donald J. Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg.(Rosen, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James R. Powers on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (Powers, James) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence S. Rosen on behalf of Donald J. Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg. (Rosen, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 16 Amended Complaint against Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg.Document filed by William R. Weinstein. Related document: 16 Amended Complaint filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER: granting 17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2017. Answer due by 7/7/2017. Motions due by 8/18/2017. Response due by 8/17/2017. Reply due by 9/29/2017. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/16/2017) (ap) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time - Proposed Schedule for Filing Second Amended Complaint on Consent and Extending Time to File Responsive Papers addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from William Weinstein dated 5/16/2017. Document filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg.Document filed by William R. Weinstein. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 14 Letter filed by Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Donald J. Trump, Jr answer due 5/18/2017; Donald J. Trump answer due 5/18/2017; Eric Trump answer due 5/18/2017; Allen Weisselberg answer due 5/18/2017. (Motions due by 5/18/2017., Responses due by 6/26/2017, Replies due by 7/24/2017.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/6/2017) (cf) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jean Lin dated March 3, 2017 re: Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Russell Maron on behalf of Donald J. Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg. (Maron, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean Lin on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Allen Weisselberg served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. Service was accepted by Frank Palumbo, Security. Service was made by US Mail - Postpaid. Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Eric Trump served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. Service was accepted by Frank Palumbo, Security. Service was made by US Mail - Postpaid. Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Donald J. Trump, Jr served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. Service was accepted by Frank Palumbo, Security. Service was made by US Mail - Postpaid. Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Donald J. Trump served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. Service was accepted by Haojun Li, Civil Clerk, SDNY US Atty's Office. Service was made by Certified Mail - President Trump, US Attorney General. Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg. (rch) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump. (rch) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Allen Weisselberg, as Trustees of a publicly described but not publicly named Trust, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States of America, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by William R. Weinstein. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-458 (RA). Document filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Allen Weisselberg. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13301559)Document filed by William R. Weinstein.(Weinstein, William) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Space Space

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 1,276 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?