PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00269

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 17, 2020 at 11:48 AM DT (11.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lawton +1 202 588 5206 nlawton@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer Glitzenstein & Crystal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A. Meyer +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 kmeyer@meyerglitz.com
No Logo BORN FREE USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lawton +1 202 588 5206 nlawton@meyerglitz.com
No Logo DELCIANNA J. WINDERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lawton +1 202 588 5206 nlawton@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer Glitzenstein & Crystal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A. Meyer +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 kmeyer@meyerglitz.com
No Logo Massachusetts Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lawton +1 202 588 5206 nlawton@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer Glitzenstein & Crystal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A. Meyer +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 kmeyer@meyerglitz.com
No Logo People For The Ethical Treatment Of Animals, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lawton +1 202 588 5206 nlawton@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer Glitzenstein & Crystal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A. Meyer +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 kmeyer@meyerglitz.com
No Logo PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lawton +1 202 588 5206 nlawton@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer Glitzenstein & Crystal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A. Meyer +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 kmeyer@meyerglitz.com
v.
No Logo ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Space Anjali Motgi +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 anjali.motgi@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Agriculture United States Department of Agriculture, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Space Anjali Motgi +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 anjali.motgi@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 47 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 45 Memorandum & Opinion, 44 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5377668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lawton, William)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Surreply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SURREPLY to re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(td) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION re 44 Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery, granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, and denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2018. (lccrc2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery, granting 24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, and denying 30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be granted, that Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery be denied as moot, that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply be granted, and that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration be denied. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2018. (lccrc2)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Authority by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS re 42 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Meyer, Katherine)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Bryce, Peter)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Report to the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS re 40 Response to Order of the Court (Meyer, Katherine) Modified event title on 12/12/2017 (znmw).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE to 38 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority and Exhibit filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) Modified to add linkage on 10/17/2017 (ztd).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Exhibit by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Recent Opinion, # 2 Exhibit Email)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 10/12/2017 (znmw).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RESPONSE re 36 to Plaintiffs' "Notice" Regarding Additional Posting of Materials filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) Modified to add link on 9/19/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE FINISHED THEIR REVIEW OF MATERIALS POSTED IN THE ELECTRONIC READING ROOM AND HENCE THERE IS NO BASIS FOR DEFENDANTS' ARGUMENT THAT THE ISSUES PRESENTED ARE NOT RIPE FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Declaration filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RESPONSE re 30 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS re 31 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Meyer, Katherine) Modified event title on 8/18/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration Regarding Additional Factual Information Recently Provided by Defendants that is Relevant to the Issues Before the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified event title on 8/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Permit a Supplemental Declaration Regarding Additional Factual Information Recently Provided by Defendants that is Relevant to the Issues Before the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 8/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Permit Filiing of Supplemental Declaration Regarding Additional Factual Information Recently Provided by Defendants That is Relevat to the Issues Before the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 8/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE re 25 to Plaintiffs' "Notice of Supplemental Authority" filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) Modified to add link on 7/31/2017 (znmw).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USDA Letter (July 18, 2017), # 2 Exhibit Recent Decision)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Proposed Surreply, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William Nicholas Lawton, :Firm- Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks, :Address- 4115 Wisconsin Ave., N.W. Suite 210. Phone No. - 202-588-5206 xt 107. Fax No. - 202-588-5049 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4997669. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified to add extension on 6/20/2017 (td).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Discovery filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Delcianna Winders, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Shea)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Discovery filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Motgi, Anjali)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Motgi on behalf of All Defendants (Motgi, Anjali)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Discovery by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Discovery by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.. (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of All Defendants (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE. (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS. (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Born Free USA. (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT. (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.. (Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4839746) filed by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J WINDERS, BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Meyer, Katherine)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          USCA Case Number 18-5074 for 47 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (td)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: In light of 36, 37 the parties' filings on the federal defendants' completion of the review of the reading room documents, the federal defendants are hereby ORDERED to file a report with the Court clarifying the current posting status of the categories of records sought by the plaintiffs by December 4, 2017. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any response to this status report within seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/4/2017 (lsj)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. Defendants' response is now due by 9/4/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/21/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries 28 MOTION to Permit 29 MOTION to Permit were entered in error as incomplete; the motion is refiled correctly as Docket Entry 30 . (znmw)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/22/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule be amended as follows: Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or by June 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/22/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2017. (lsj)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion for leave to take discovery due by 6/6/2017. (zlsj)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to file a Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion for leave to take discovery on or by June 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/17/17. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery due by 5/16/2017. (lsj)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2017. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2017. (lsj)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery on or by May 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Plaintiffs' consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule shall be amended as follows: Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or by June 1, 2017, and Defendants shall file their reply on or by June 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file an Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or by April 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2017. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/24/2017. (zlsj)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sb)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?