U.S. Premium Beef, LLC v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-00112

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2019 at 2:14 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark R. Gardiner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angus White Dwyer +1 816 292 8338 adwyer@spencerfane.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas M Weems +1 816 292 8264 +1 816 474 3216 dweems@spencerfane.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark J Hanson +1 612 373 8823 mark.hanson@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory F Jenner +1 202 398 1794 greg.jenner@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Per A. Ramfjord +1 503 294 9257 +1 503 220 2480 per.ramfjord@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam D Schurle +1 612 373 8814 adam.schurle@stoel.com
No Logo U.S. Premium Beef, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angus White Dwyer +1 816 292 8338 adwyer@spencerfane.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas M Weems +1 816 292 8264 +1 816 474 3216 dweems@spencerfane.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark J Hanson +1 612 373 8823 mark.hanson@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory F Jenner +1 202 398 1794 greg.jenner@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Per A. Ramfjord +1 503 294 9257 +1 503 220 2480 per.ramfjord@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam D Schurle +1 612 373 8814 adam.schurle@stoel.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James F. Bresnahan, II +1 202 616 9067 +1 202 514 6770 james.f.bresnahan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory E. Van Hoey +1 202 307 6391 +1 202 514 6770 gregory.van.hoey@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 6532
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER extending stay to 8/20/18. Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2018 unless motion for stipulated judgment filed by this date. Signed on 6/5/18 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Status report
        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Ramfjord, Per)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 28 motion to stay. Signed on 2/7/18 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
            Joint MOTION to stay Case for Settlement Purposes filed by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dwyer, Angus)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of United States' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Admissions, and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Gregory E. Van Hoey on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Van Hoey, Gregory)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC "Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to United States' First Set of Request for Production of Document" filed by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC.(Dwyer, Angus)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of United States' Responses to Plaintiff's First Sets of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Gregory E. Van Hoey on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Van Hoey, Gregory) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 9/6/2017. Case did not settle. Time in court: 11:00 a.m. to 3:00 p.m.. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC (Plaintiffs' First Set of Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents) filed by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC.(Dwyer, Angus) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re United States' First Request for Production of Documents filed by James Francis Bresnahan, II on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Bresnahan, James)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Please see order for additional deadlines. Signed on 7/25/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC.(Dwyer, Angus)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /Discovery Plan by U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Dwyer, Angus)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James Francis Bresnahan, II on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Bresnahan, James)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 9/6/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. Signed on 6/26/2017 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/24/2017. Signed on 6/19/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, on behalf of United States of America.(Van Hoey, Gregory)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 13 Motion for extension of time to file answer and proposed scheduling order. The United States has until June 16, 2017, to file and serve an answer to the complaint or a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. The parties have until July 17, 2017, to file a proposed scheduling order. Signed on April 7, 2017 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Jones, Robin)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, and for extension of time to file proposed scheduling order, filed by Gregory E. Van Hoey on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Attorney Gregory E. Van Hoey added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Van Hoey, Gregory)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Dwyer, Angus)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. Internal Revenue Service served on 3/1/2017. (Dwyer, Angus)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. U.S. Attorney General served on 2/21/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Dwyer, Angus)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ORDER granting 8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Gregory F Jenner for Mark R. Gardiner,Gregory F Jenner for U.S. Premium Beef, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed ECF Registration Form to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Russel, Jeri) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Motion to allow Gregory F. Jenner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5195067) filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Weems, Douglas)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORDER granting 4 5 6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Mark J Hanson, Per A Ramfjord, and Adam D. Schurle for Mark R. Gardiner & U.S. Premium Beef, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed ECF Registration Form to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106 This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Russel, Jeri) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Motion to allow Adam D. Schurle to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5183884) filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Weems, Douglas)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion to allow Per A. Ramfjord to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5183877) filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Weems, Douglas)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            Motion to allow Mark J. Hanson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5183849) filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of Mark R. Gardiner, U.S. Premium Beef, LLC. (Weems, Douglas)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by U.S. Premium Beef, LLC, Mark R. Gardiner. United States of America served on 2/15/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (Weems, Douglas)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of U.S. Premium Beef, LLC, Mark R. Gardiner, Sole Trustee of The Mark Gardiner Revocable Trust, As Tax Matters Partner. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5176725. Service due by 5/15/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weems, Douglas)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America - U.S. Attorney. (Ellis, Lindsey)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?