Zlozower v. Vice Media LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00843

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 17, 2017 at 5:47 PM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Neil Zlozower, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Liebowitz +1 516 233 1660 +1 516 706 7919 rl@liebowitzlawfirm.com
v.
Vice Media LLC Vice Media LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Henry Rosenthal +1 212 980 0120 +1 212 593 9175 erosenthal@fkks.com
Space Andrew J Ungberg +1 212 705 4868 +1 347 438 2195 aungberg@fkks.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Vice Media LLC. (Ungberg, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 2/15/2017 (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Summons Issued as to Vice Media LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?