Steve Chambers v. Whirlpool Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-56364

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:56 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [10178383] (JFF) [Entered: 10/28/2016 02:42 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellant W. Allen McDonald response to Court order dated 10/06/2016. Date of service: 10/27/2016. [10176691] [16-56364] (Cain, Christopher) [Entered: 10/27/2016 02:59 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) Appellant W. Allen McDonald Correspondence: Notice of (1) Filing of District Court's Final Judgment and Order Entered on October 11, 2016 and (2) of Proceedings in the District Court. Date of service: 10/25/2016 [10172689] [16-56364] (Cain, Christopher) [Entered: 10/25/2016 11:20 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Charles S. Fax for Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini, Jr., Linda Sample, Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli and Lyndee Walker. Date of service: 10/21/2016. [10168885] [16-56364] (Fax, Charles) [Entered: 10/21/2016 10:32 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ELF): It appears that the orders challenged in this appeal may not constitute a final decision of the district court because the district court has not yet ruled on the pending motion for final approval of the class action settlement. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. § 1291. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [10152246] (NT) [Entered: 10/06/2016 04:41 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Received copy of District Court order filed on 09/30/2016. Order certifying appeals as frivolous [10146770] (JFF) [Entered: 10/03/2016 04:01 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher Todd Cain for Appellant W. Allen McDonald. Date of service: 09/21/2016. [10130621] [16-56364] (Cain, Christopher) [Entered: 09/21/2016 08:47 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 10/17/2016. Transcript due 01/17/2017. Appellant W. Allen McDonald opening brief due 02/27/2017. Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini Jr., Linda Sample, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc., Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli, Lyndee Walker and Whirlpool Corporation answering brief due 03/29/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10130005] (BG) [Entered: 09/20/2016 02:54 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?