Steve Chambers v. Whirlpool Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-56436

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:54 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3385 - Property Damage: Product Liability
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [10246643] (RR) [Entered: 12/27/2016 11:00 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Streamlined request by Appellant Patrick S. Sweeney to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. This appeal was closed on 10/20/2016, docket #2.. [10242319] (KM) [Entered: 12/21/2016 02:20 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MANDATE ISSUED. (WAF, RMG and JSB) [10196691] (CW) [Entered: 11/15/2016 09:21 AM]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Charles S. Fax for Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini, Jr., Linda Sample, Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli and Lyndee Walker. Date of service: 10/21/2016. [10168605] [16-56436] (Fax, Charles) [Entered: 10/21/2016 07:46 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RONALD M. GOULD and JAY S. BYBEE) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. § 1291; Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [10168057] (NT) [Entered: 10/20/2016 03:30 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 10/26/2016. Transcript due 01/24/2017. Appellant Patrick S. Sweeney opening brief due 03/06/2017. Appellees Susan Bathon, W. David Beal, George Bliss, James Cashman, Steve Chambers, Joseph Cicchelli, Kurt Himler, Zila Koswener, Gary LeBlanc, Shirl Mederlet, Maureen Meneghetti, Susan Milicia, Kevin O'Donnell, Raymond Paolini Jr., Linda Sample, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co., Inc., Jackie Steffes, Lynn Van Der Veer, Pamela Walchli, Lyndee Walker and Whirlpool Corporation answering brief due 04/04/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10143104] (DJW) [Entered: 09/29/2016 04:23 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 68 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?