Barrigas v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-10232

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2019 at 8:17 AM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judith Barrigas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Sales

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sol J. Cohen +1 617 621 1151 +1 617 494 0084 soljcohen@cohenandsales.com
v.
No Logo Howard Stern, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Appling +1 212 957 7600
Space Daniel Hershel Tabak +1 212 957 7606 +1 212 957 4514 dtabak@cohengresser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monica R. Shah +1 617 742 6020 mshah@zalkindlaw.com
No Logo The Howard Stern Production Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Appling +1 212 957 7600
Space Daniel Hershel Tabak +1 212 957 7606 +1 212 957 4514 dtabak@cohengresser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monica R. Shah +1 617 742 6020 mshah@zalkindlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annapurna Balakrishna +1 617 748 3111 annapurna.balakrishna@usdoj.gov
Space Rayford A. Farquhar +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3971 rayford.farquhar@usdoj.gov
Space Austin L. Furman, Esq. +1 202 307 2007 +1 202 616 5200 Austin.L.Furman@usdoj.gov
Space Jordan Andrew Konig +1 202 305 7917 +1 202 514 5238 jordan.a.konig@usdoj.gov
Space Beatriz T. Saiz +1 202 307 6585 +1 202 514 6866 beatriz.t.saiz@usdoj.gov
Space Shelby D. Wright +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3967 Shelbey.Wright@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Settlement Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Scheduling Conference held on 6/7/2018. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cohen, Konig) (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/13/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Discovery to be completed by 2/8/2019 Status Report due by 2/8/2019(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by United States of America.(Konig, Jordan) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by United States of America.(Konig, Jordan) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2018 03:15 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Konig, Jordan) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, the Stern Defendants motion to dismiss ECF No. 30 isGRANTED, and the United States motion to dismiss ECF No. 34 is GRANTED as to Count I. Plaintiffs case may proceed with respect to Count II against the United States. SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Entered in error by Court Staff. NEF Regenerated. (Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 2/20/2018 (Montes, Mariliz). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to Response to 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue filed by United States of America. (Furman, Austin) (Entered: 08/12/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Reply Memorandum Of Law Of The Howard Stern Production Company and Howard Stern In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss The Complaint) filed by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Tabak, Daniel) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 51 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief)(Tabak, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Brief)(Furman, Austin) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue filed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue filed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Opposition re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue filed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Opposition re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of United States of America (Farquhar, Rayford) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Shelbey D. Wright (Wright, Shelbey) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 38 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 08/01/2017 to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue. (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/01/2017 to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue by Judith Barrigas.(Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Exhibit
                                                            EXHIBIT re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue, Call Transcript by United States of America. (Furman, Austin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Denise Spallholtz in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue filed by United States of America. (Furman, Austin)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue filed by United States of America. (Furman, Austin)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, alternatively, for improper venue by United States of America.(Furman, Austin)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Declaration of Jeremy Coleman with attached Exhibit 1 (Filed with Clerk's Office) filed by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Tabak, Daniel)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Declaration of Daniel H. Tabak with attached Exhibit 1) filed by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Tabak, Daniel)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Tabak, Daniel)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company.(Tabak, Daniel)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Sol J. Cohen (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                              Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in memorandum in support of motion to dismiss. (York, Steve)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in memorandum in support of motion to dismiss by United States of America.(Furman, Austin)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Austin L. Furman on behalf of United States of America (Furman, Austin)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to June 12, 2017 to Respond to Amended Complaint. (York, Steve)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction and Notice Setting Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Luke Appling. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel Tabak. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to June 12, 2017 to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Saiz, Beatriz)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to June 12, 2017 to Respond to Amended Complaint by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company.(Shah, Monica)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Shah, Monica)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Luke Appling Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6632613 by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appling Declaration)(Shah, Monica)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel Tabak Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6632583 by Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Tabak Declaration)(Shah, Monica)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Shah on behalf of Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company (Shah, Monica)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 11 Summons Returned Executed Corrected Because: The Summons Returned Executed As to the US Attorney for the District of Massachusetts and the US Attorney General, Should Have Been Filed As Separate Docket Entries Under the Correct Filing Events in CM/ECF By Counsel Cohen. Please See Enteries 13 and 14. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeff Sessions - United States Attorney General by Judith Barrigas. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Judith Barrigas. United States of America served on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan A. Konig on behalf of United States of America (Konig, Jordan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judith Barrigas. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz T. Saiz on behalf of United States of America (Saiz, Beatriz)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Shelbey D. Wright on behalf of Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company, United States of America (Wright, Shelbey)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of Howard Stern, The Howard Stern Production Company, United States of America (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judith Barrigas. Howard Stern waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judith Barrigas. The Howard Stern Production Company waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Judith Barrigas.(Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re 1 Complaint by Judith Barrigas. (Attachments: # 1 Cateory sheet)(Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6492017 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Judith Barrigas.(Cohen, Sol) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?